Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. Belkin International, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00509
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 30, 2016 at 7:59 PM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
No Logo Belkin International, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter John Chassman +1 713 469 3885 +1 713 469 3899 PChassman@ReedSmith.com
Space Peter John Chassman +1 713 469 3885 +1 713 469 3899 PChassman@ReedSmith.com
Space Peter John Chassman +1 713 469 3885 +1 713 469 3899 PChassman@ReedSmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dustin J Edwards +1 713 651 2627 +1 713 651 2700 dedwards@winston.com
Space Dustin J Edwards +1 713 651 2627 +1 713 651 2700 dedwards@winston.com
Space Dustin J Edwards +1 713 651 2627 +1 713 651 2700 dedwards@winston.com
v.
No Logo Belkin International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter John Chassman +1 713 469 3885 +1 713 469 3899 PChassman@ReedSmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dustin J Edwards +1 713 651 2627 +1 713 651 2700 dedwards@winston.com
No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE by Belkin International, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Chassman, Peter) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims and counterclaims between pltf and deft are dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs in connection herewith. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/10/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/13. cc:attys 3-27-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Sealed Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
        Sealed Document. Original Answer to Third Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims of Defendant Belkin International, Inc. (Chassman, Peter) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
          Norman's ANSWER to 7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Belkin by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(Price, Adam) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
            Second Amended ANSWER to 2 Complaint Second Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Belkin International, Inc..(Chassman, Peter) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
              First Amended ANSWER to 2 Complaint Second Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Belkin International, Inc..(Chassman, Peter) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                ANSWER to 3 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaims by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(mll, ) (Entered: 08/11/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Belkin International, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/11/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                    ANSWER to 2 Complaint, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, and COUNTERCLAIMS against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Belkin International, Inc..(mll, ) (Entered: 08/11/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                      COMPLAINT against Belkin International, Inc., filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: (1) Exhibit 1, (2) Exhibit 2, (3) Exhibit 3, (4) Exhibit 4, (5) Exhibit 5)(mll, ) (Entered: 08/11/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER severing defendant Belkin International, Inc. from Civil Action 6:11cv495 and assigning to a new case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/10/12. cc:attys 8-10-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/11/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Space Space

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 94 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?