Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00523
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 29, 2016 at 8:25 PM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenyon & Kenyon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Lennon +1 212 425 7200 +1 212 425 5288 mlennon@kenyon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Ainsworth +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 charley@pbatyler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan A. Smith +1 408 975 7500 +1 408 975 7501 ssmith@kenyon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Dacus Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deron R Dacus +1 903 705 1117 +1 903 705 1117 ddacus@dacusfirm.com
v.
Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenyon & Kenyon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Lennon +1 212 425 7200 +1 212 425 5288 mlennon@kenyon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan A. Smith +1 408 975 7500 +1 408 975 7501 ssmith@kenyon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Dacus Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deron R Dacus +1 903 705 1117 +1 903 705 1117 ddacus@dacusfirm.com
No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., ThirdParty Defendant
Officially listed as "Advanced Micro Devices"
Officer/Director, Spansion Inc.
Officer/Director, Amd Investments, Inc.
Officer/Director, Amd (u.s.) Holdings, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Coghlan Crowson et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rickey Lawrence Faulkner +1 903 758 5543 +1 903 753 6989 rfaulkner@ccfww.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reeves & Brightwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kim Brightwell +1 512 334 4500 +1 512 334 4492 kbrightwell@reevesbrightwell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Pierce +1 512 334 4503 +1 512 334 4492 rpierce@reevesbrightwell.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT that the parties take nothing and that all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings LLC and Defendant Volkswagen Group of America Inc are DISMISSED with prejudice in their entirety. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/31/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 7/9/2013 re 7 MOTION to Strike or Alternatively, Sever Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Claim Against AMD filed by Advanced Micro Devices. (Court Reporter Jill McFadden.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (mjm, ) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER denying without prejudice 7 Motion to Strike or Sever Volkswagen's Third Party Claim. As directed from the bench, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Claim against Advanced Mico Devices is hereby STAYED until further ruling from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/10/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 7 MOTION to Strike or Alternatively, Sever Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Claim Against AMD filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
          REPLY to Response to Motion re 7 MOTION to Strike or Alternatively, Sever Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Claim Against AMD filed by Advanced Micro Devices. (Brightwell, Kim) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rickey Lawrence Faulkner on behalf of Advanced Micro Devices (Faulkner, Rickey) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 7 MOTION to Strike or Alternatively, Sever Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Claim Against AMD; Responses due by 6/21/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/11/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 MOTION to Strike or Alternatively, Sever Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Claim Against AMD by Advanced Micro Devices. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pierce, Ryan) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 7 MOTION to Strike or Alternatively, Sever Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Claim Against AMD filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 7 MOTION to Strike or Alternatively, Sever Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Claim Against AMD; Responses due by 6/4/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/24/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 MOTION to Strike or Alternatively, Sever Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Claim Against AMD by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                        MOTION to Strike or Alternatively, Sever Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Third-Party Claim Against AMD by Advanced Micro Devices. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Chris Jacobs, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brightwell, Kim) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/13. cc:attys 3-27-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                            ANSWER to 3 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaims by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                                ANSWER to 2 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc..(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                                  COMPLAINT against Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: (1) Exhibit 1, (2) Exhibit 2, (3) Exhibit 3, (4) Exhibit 4, (5) Exhibit 5)(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER severing defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc from Civil Action 6:11cv495 and assigning to a new case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/10/12. cc:attys 8-10-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 53 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?