Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00266
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 6:44 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 332 7788 +1 817 332 7789 casey.oneill@wickphillips.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1260

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Russell Maynard +1 949 885 6084 scott@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 332 7788 +1 817 332 7789 casey.oneill@wickphillips.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1260

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Russell Maynard +1 949 885 6084 scott@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Solarwinds Worldwide, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Klein Ayers +1 214 939 5497 +1 214 939 5849 jennifer.ayers@klgates.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan J Sinclair +1 650 798 6700 +1 650 798 6701 bryan.sinclair@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin E. Weed +1 312 781 7166 +1 312 345 1843 benjamin.weed@klgates.com
No Logo Solarwinds, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Klein Ayers +1 214 939 5497 +1 214 939 5849 jennifer.ayers@klgates.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan J Sinclair +1 650 798 6700 +1 650 798 6701 bryan.sinclair@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin E. Weed +1 312 781 7166 +1 312 345 1843 benjamin.weed@klgates.com
v.
No Logo Solarwinds Worldwide, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Klein Ayers +1 214 939 5497 +1 214 939 5849 jennifer.ayers@klgates.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan J Sinclair +1 650 798 6700 +1 650 798 6701 bryan.sinclair@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin E. Weed +1 312 781 7166 +1 312 345 1843 benjamin.weed@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Twelfth Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara N. Kerrane +1 949 253 0900 +1 949 253 0902 jill.adair@klgates.com
No Logo Solarwinds, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Klein Ayers +1 214 939 5497 +1 214 939 5849 jennifer.ayers@klgates.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan J Sinclair +1 650 798 6700 +1 650 798 6701 bryan.sinclair@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin E. Weed +1 312 781 7166 +1 312 345 1843 benjamin.weed@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Twelfth Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara N. Kerrane +1 949 253 0900 +1 949 253 0902 jill.adair@klgates.com
No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 332 7788 +1 817 332 7789 casey.oneill@wickphillips.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 332 7788 +1 817 332 7789 casey.oneill@wickphillips.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims between Plaintiffs and Defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear their own attorneys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/07/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Change of Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Nelson, III on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott R Maynard on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Maynard, Scott) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The Court ORDERS that the above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial purposes only. Individual cases remain active for venue determinations. The earliest filed civil action 6:13cv256 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. A single ESI, Discovery, Protective, and Docket Control Order shall govern the consolidated case. All parties to the consolidated case are ORDERED to meet-and-confer and submit a uniform Docket Control Order by 6-14-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/03/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
            ANSWER to 13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 5/29/2013. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheets) (rlf) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC served on 4/29/2013, answer due 5/20/2013. (mjc, ) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Sara N Kerrane on behalf of SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4148958. (Kerrane, Sara) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Request for Scheduling Conference (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin E Weed on behalf of SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4146330. (Weed, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Bryan J Sinclair on behalf of SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4145890. (Sinclair, Bryan) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Scott R Maynard on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4144996. (Maynard, Scott) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                            Return of Service Executed as to SolarWinds, Inc. on 4/29/2013, by cert mail; answer due: 5/20/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SolarWinds, Inc. (Ayers, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC identifying Other Affiliate SolarWinds, Inc. for SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC. (Ayers, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                  Defendant's ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by SolarWinds, Inc., SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC.(Ayers, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Regarding May 21, 2013 Case Management Conference (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Casey O'Neill on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward E Casto, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                SUMMONS Issued as to SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es))(klb) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                    Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                          COMPLAINT against SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4056745.), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 5,490,216)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 57 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?