Kickapoo Run LLC v. Nextgen HealthCare Information Systems LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-00380
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 4:46 PM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kickapoo Run, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Austin Hansley Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Austin Hansley +1 469 587 9776 +1 855 347 6329 Austin@TheTexasLawOffice.com
No Logo Nextgen Healthcare Information Systems, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Beck Redden & Secrest - Houston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Ernest Richardson +1 713 951 6284 +1 713 951 3720 mrichardson@brsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by INTRINSIC LAW Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Parker Cole +1 617 420 0081 scole@intrinsiclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by One Financial Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew D Durell +1 617 348 1615 +1 617 542 2241 mdurell@mintz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Timothy Renaud +1 617 348 1870 +1 617 542 2241 mtrenaud@mintz.com
v.
No Logo Nextgen Healthcare Information Systems, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Beck Redden & Secrest - Houston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Ernest Richardson +1 713 951 6284 +1 713 951 3720 mrichardson@brsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by INTRINSIC LAW Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Parker Cole +1 617 420 0081 scole@intrinsiclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by One Financial Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew D Durell +1 617 348 1615 +1 617 542 2241 mdurell@mintz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Timothy Renaud +1 617 348 1870 +1 617 542 2241 mtrenaud@mintz.com
No Logo Kickapoo Run, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Austin Hansley Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Austin Hansley +1 469 587 9776 +1 855 347 6329 Austin@TheTexasLawOffice.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 14 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 11/2/12. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
    MOTION to Dismiss by Kickapoo Run LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew David Durell on behalf of Nextgen HealthCare Information Systems LLC (Durell, Matthew) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
        ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Nextgen HealthCare Information Systems LLC Notice of Appearance (Durell, Matthew) Modified on 9/25/2012 (sm, ). (Entered: 09/25/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael T Renaud on behalf of Nextgen HealthCare Information Systems LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3794122. (Renaud, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Stephen P Cole on behalf of Nextgen HealthCare Information Systems LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3794041. (Cole, Stephen) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
              ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael Ernest Richardson on behalf of Nextgen HealthCare Information Systems LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3792628. (Richardson, Michael) Modified on 9/21/2012 (sm, ). (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nextgen HealthCare Information Systems LLC (Richardson, Michael) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
                  Defendant Nextgen Healthcare Information Systems, LLC's Answer and Counterclaims to Kickapoo Run, LLC's Original Complaint ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Kickapoo Run LLC by Nextgen HealthCare Information Systems LLC.(Richardson, Michael) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kickapoo Run LLC. Nextgen HealthCare Information Systems LLC served on 7/2/2012. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nextgen HealthCare Information Systems LLC.( Richardson, Michael) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                        SUMMONS REISSUED as to Nextgen HealthCare Information Systems LLC. (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/24/2012, Entered: None
                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kickapoo Run LLC (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 06/24/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/24/2012, Entered: None
                            Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 06/24/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None
                              COMPLAINT against Nextgen HealthCare Information Systems LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3647265.), filed by Kickapoo Run, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 35 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?