Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Full Fat Productions Ltd.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00464
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 6:32 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Full Fat Productions Ltd., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Campbell Centre II

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelsey Weir Johnson +1 214 367 6000 +1 214 367 6001 kelsey.weir@kk-llp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Griffith Bates Champion & Harper Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Austin Smith Champion +1 214 238 8400 +1 214 238 8401 austin.champion@griffithbates.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Casey L Griffith casey.griffith@griffithbates.com
v.
No Logo Full Fat Productions Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Campbell Centre II

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelsey Weir Johnson +1 214 367 6000 +1 214 367 6001 kelsey.weir@kk-llp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Griffith Bates Champion & Harper Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Austin Smith Champion +1 214 238 8400 +1 214 238 8401 austin.champion@griffithbates.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Casey L Griffith casey.griffith@griffithbates.com
No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims and counterclaims between pltf and deft are DISMISSED with prejudice, pursuant to the parties' confidential License and Settlement Agreement. Each party shall bear their own fees and expenses. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/07/13. cc:attys 3-08-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:12cv462 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The Clerk shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated lead case. A uniform Docket Control, Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order shall govern the consolidated case, regardless of whether the same have previously been entered in individual actions. All parties to the consolidated case are ORDERED to meet-and-confer and, if necessary, file objections to the previously agreed to Docket Control and Discovery Orders filed in the lead case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/01/13. cc:attys 2-04-13(mll, ) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelsey Weir Johnson on behalf of Full Fat Productions Ltd. (Johnson, Kelsey) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER setting Status Conference for 2/25/2013 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/25/13. cc:attys 1-25-13(mll, ) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None
            RESPONSE to 11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Full Fat Productions Ltd. filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
              NOTICE by Uniloc USA, Inc. Of Request For Scheduling Conference (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Austin Smith Champion on behalf of Full Fat Productions Ltd. (Champion, Austin) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Full Fat Productions Ltd. (Griffith, Casey) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Full Fat Productions Ltd..(Griffith, Casey) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                      Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Full Fat Productions Ltd..( Griffith, Casey) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                        Return of Service Executed as to Full Fat Productions Ltd. on 10/3/2012, by personal service through the Hague Convention process. (Attachments: # 1 Summons/Complaint)(mll, ) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Full Fat Productions Ltd..( Griffith, Casey) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                  SUMMONS Issued as to Full Fat Productions Ltd., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                      Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                        COMPLAINT against Full Fat Productions Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3690087.), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 6,857,067)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 49 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?