Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. v. Aptela, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:11-cv-00460
District Judge Robert G. Doumar, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 9:53 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BEAR CREEK TECHNOLOGIES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley Manion Jones Hake Kurowski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer B. Furey +1 617 737 3100 +1 617 737 0374 jfurey@cmjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MIELE LAW GROUP, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony L. Miele +1 617 818 2692 tony@mielelawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ventker & Warman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marissa Marriott Henderson +1 757 625 1192 mhenderson@ventkerlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David N. Ventker +1 757 625 1192 +1 757 625 1476 dventker@ventkerlaw.com
v.
No Logo Aptela, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Swidler Berlin, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Christian Bertin +1 202 373 6672 +1 202 373 6001 r.bertin@bingham.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 281
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
MDL TRANSFER ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.c. § 1407, the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the District of Delaware are transferred to the District of Delaware and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Gregory M. Sleet for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 5/3/2012. (bnew) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 22 Motion to Stay - The Court ORDERS that all proceedings in this matter are hereby STAYED and that all deadlines in this action are VACATED pending a transfer decision by the JPMDL. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar and filed on 1/31/2012. (bnew) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
      NOTICE by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. re 23 Memorandum in Support to Attach Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Miele, Anthony) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
        Memorandum in Support re 22 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Unopposed) filed by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.. (Miele, Anthony) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
          MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Unopposed) by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miele, Anthony) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None
            NOTICE by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. of Filing Motion for Multi-District Litigation in Related Cases (Miele, Anthony) (Entered: 01/26/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              Rule 16(b) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2012 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk Grand Jury Courtroom; Jury Trial set for 7/31/2012 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Grand Jury Courtroom; Markman Hearing set for 3/28/2012 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Grand Jury Courtroom, all before District Judge Robert G. Doumar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller on 12/12/11 and filed 12/16/11. (lbax, ) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                CERTIFICATE of Service re 18 NOTICE by Anthony L. Miele on behalf of Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. (Miele, Anthony) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                  NOTICE by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. Joint Statement Regarding Claim Construction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Miele, Anthony) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                    RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2011 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk Conference Room 3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller on November 22, 2011 and filed on November 23, 2011. (sche) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER that the parties to confer in an effort to prepare and submit a joint statement by Monday, December 5,2011, at 12:00p.m. to apprise this Court of the portions of the '722 patent, if any, that are actually in dispute. The Court DIRECTS both parties to contact the Courtroom Deputy by Monday, November 21, 2011, to schedule an Initial Pretrial Conference in this matter. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 11/1/2011 and filed on 11/2/2011. (rsim) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Jeffrey Thomas Hantson to appear Pro hac vice by Aptela, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(mwin, ) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Aptela, Inc.. (Bertin, Robert) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                            Opposition to 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.. (Miele, Anthony) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting 6 Motion for Jennifer Bush Furey to appear Pro hac vice for Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar and filed on 9/29/11. (mwin, ) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                                BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 10 Motion to Dismiss by Aptela, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Bertin, Robert) Modified on 9/28/2011 to change "MOTION" TO "BRIEF" and to link to the motion. (mwin, ) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                                  MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Aptela, Inc.. (Bertin, Robert) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                                    FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aptela, Inc. Rule 7.1 Statement (Bertin, Robert) Modified on 9/28/2011 to change event from "Notice" to "Financial Disclosure Statement" (mwin, ). (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Christian Bertin on behalf of Aptela, Inc. (Bertin, Robert) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Aptela, Inc. served on 9/6/2011 (ecav, ) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                          Corrected MOTION for Jennifer Bush Furey to appear Pro hac vice on behalf of Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. (Corrected Motion was filed as directed. Fee was paid 8/29/11 with original motion, document #5.) (mwin, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Jennifer Bush Furey to appear Pro hac vice for Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(mwin, ) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                              Report on the filing of an action regarding patent 7,889,722.. (ldab, ) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                One Summons with two copies issued as to Aptela, Inc. and mailed to counsel (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information)(ldab, ) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                  Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.. (ldab, ) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                    COMPLAINT against Aptela, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 24683012578.), filed by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. with Jury Demand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Receipt, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Letter)(ldab, ) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 109 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?