Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. Honda North America, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00279
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 6:35 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
v.
Honda North America, Inc. Honda North America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Matthew Beauchamp +1 832 239 3935 +1 832 239 3600 jbeauchamp@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Paul Biddinger +1 650 617 4000 +1 212 596 9090 bbiddinger@fishneave.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyotaro Hemmi +1 212 596 9590 kyotaro.hemmi@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesse J. Jenner +1 212 596 9019 +1 212 596 9090 jesse.jenner@ropesgray.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julian Moore +1 212 596 9820 +1 212 728 2574 julian.moore@ropesgray.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT that the parties take nothing and that all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED with prejudice in their entirety. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims between Plaintiff and Defendant are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Parties shall bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/10/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kyotaro Hemmi on behalf of Honda North America, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4162419. (Hemmi, Kyotaro) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Jesse J Jenner on behalf of Honda North America, Inc. (Jenner, Jesse) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Julian Moore on behalf of Honda North America, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4140496. (Moore, Julian) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Brian P Biddinger on behalf of Honda North America, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4140486. (Biddinger, Brian) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jesse J Jenner on behalf of Honda North America, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4139967. (Jenner, Jesse) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. Honda North America, Inc. served on 4/1/2013, answer due 4/22/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                  ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC Return of Service (DiNovo, Andrew) Modified on 5/3/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Honda North America, Inc.( Beauchamp, Joseph) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:13cv278 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for trial. All motions shall be filed in the consolidated case. The Clerk of the Court shall add all consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as each defendants Lead and Local Counsel only. Should additional attorneys wish to appear in the consolidated case, they should file a Notice of Appearance in the lead case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/17/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                          SUMMONS Issued as to Honda North America, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                            Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                              COMPLAINT against Honda North America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4063315.), filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 40 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?