Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. Mazda Motor of America, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00283
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 6:56 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
v.
No Logo Mazda Motor Of America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Almasri & Marzwanian Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 efindlay@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R Barney +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 james.barney@finnegan.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rajeev Gupta +20240435 202 240 4352 raj.gupta@finnegan.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED P. Andrew Riley andrew.riley@finnegan.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas William Winland +1 202 408 4085 +1 202 408 4400 tom.winland@finnegan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/04/2013 Gary W Davis, Jr. +1 512 874 3866 +1 512 874 3801 gary.davis@bowmanandbrooke.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT that the parties take nothing and that all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED with prejudice in their entirety. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/29/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 16 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Mazda Motor of America, Inc. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant Mazda in this action are dismissed with prejudice. Each party is to bear its own costs and attorney fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/29/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
      STIPULATION of Dismissal by Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas W Winland on behalf of Mazda Motor of America, Inc. (Winland, Thomas) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James R Barney on behalf of Mazda Motor of America, Inc. (Barney, James) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by P Andrew Riley on behalf of Mazda Motor of America, Inc. (Riley, P) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rajeev Gupta on behalf of Mazda Motor of America, Inc. (Gupta, Rajeev) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gary Ward Davis, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/4/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                  Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Gary Davis, Jr. by Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of Mazda Motor of America, Inc. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. Mazda Motor of America, Inc. served on 4/1/2013, answer due 4/22/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                        ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC Return of Service (DiNovo, Andrew) Modified on 5/3/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Mazda Motor of America, Inc..( Davis, Gary) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:13cv278 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for trial. All motions shall be filed in the consolidated case. The Clerk of the Court shall add all consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as each defendants Lead and Local Counsel only. Should additional attorneys wish to appear in the consolidated case, they should file a Notice of Appearance in the lead case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/17/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                              CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                SUMMONS Issued as to Mazda Motor of America, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                  Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                    COMPLAINT against Mazda Motor of America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4063574.), filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Space Space

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 55 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?