Abarta LLC v. NaturalPoint Inc.

Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-00672
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap
Last Updated December 23, 2016 at 9:12 PM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Abarta LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Ste. 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com

Represented by Weisbrod Matteis & Copley, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A Fussell, III +1 202 499 7900 jfussell@wmclaw.com
No Logo Naturalpoint, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Munck Wilson Mandala LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly P Chen +1 972 628 3683 +1 972 628 3616 kchen@munckwilson.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder jalibhai@munckwilson.com
v.
No Logo Naturalpoint, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Munck Wilson Mandala LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly P Chen +1 972 628 3683 +1 972 628 3616 kchen@munckwilson.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder jalibhai@munckwilson.com

Represented by Myers Andras Sherman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Christopher Andras +1 949 223 9600 +1 949 223 9610 andras@myersandras.com
No Logo Abarta LLC, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Ste. 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com

Represented by Weisbrod Matteis & Copley, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A Fussell, III +1 202 499 7900 jfussell@wmclaw.com
Attributes
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 18 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/3/2013. (sm, ) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss by Abarta LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE by Abarta LLC of Compliance with 3-1 and 3-2 (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 4/19/2013 09:45 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Honorable Roy Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/14/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Joseph C Andras on behalf of NaturalPoint Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4033868. (Andras, Joseph) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Abarta LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline is 2/11/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/1/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Abarta LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NaturalPoint Inc. (Chen, Kelly) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Abarta LLC by NaturalPoint Inc..(Chen, Kelly) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re NaturalPoint Inc..( Chen, Kelly) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/18/2012, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re NaturalPoint Inc..( Alibhai, Jamil) (Entered: 11/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abarta LLC. NaturalPoint Inc. served on 10/29/2012, answer due 11/19/2012. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
SUMMONS Issued as to NaturalPoint Inc.. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE for Pretrial proceedings to Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/19/12. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James A Fussell, III on behalf of Abarta LLC (Fussell, James) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Abarta LLC (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against NaturalPoint Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3837947.), filed by Abarta LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,224,326, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 44 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?