Abarta LLC v. Mechdyne Corporation

Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-00668
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap
Last Updated December 23, 2016 at 9:13 PM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Abarta LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Ste. 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com

Represented by Weisbrod Matteis & Copley, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A Fussell, III +1 202 499 7900 jfussell@wmclaw.com
v.
No Logo Mechdyne Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Brick Gentry, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Sean Brick +1 515 274 1450 +1 515 274 1488 matt.brick@brickgentrylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Joseph Laurenzo +1 515 271 1748 +1 515 274 1488 brian.laurenzo@brickgentrylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Robert O'Hollearn +1 515 274 1450 +2741 274 274 1488 matt.ohollearn@brickgentrylaw.com
Attributes
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 23 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Mechdyne Corporation is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/25/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Abarta LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 14 First MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 2/22/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/11/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 14 First MOTION to Dismiss by Abarta LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 14 First MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 2/8/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/1/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 14 First MOTION to Dismiss by Abarta LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 14 First MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 1/30/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/16/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 14 First MOTION to Dismiss by Abarta LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to dismiss. Responses due by 1/15/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/8/12. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 14 First MOTION to Dismiss by Abarta LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None
First MOTION to Dismiss by Mechdyne Corporation. Responses due by 1/4/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Texas Secretary of State Profile for Abartha LLC, # 2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Hoffmeister, # 3 Exhibit C - Screenshots of Mechdyne's Website, # 4 Exhibit D - Table C-5, Federal Judicial Caseload Stats, # 5 Exhibit E - Judicial Caseload Profiles)(Brick, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2012: # 6 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 12/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Brian Laurenzo on behalf of Mechdyne Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3881367. (Laurenzo, Brian) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Robert O'Hollearn on behalf of Mechdyne Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3881088. (O'Hollearn, Matthew) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mechdyne Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Bank of Montreal for Mechdyne Corporation. (Brick, Matthew) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mechdyne Corporation (Brick, Matthew) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 7 Notice of Attorney Appearance.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Brick, Matthew) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Mechdyne Corporation.( Brick, Matthew) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Sean Brick on behalf of Mechdyne Corporation (Brick, Matthew) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abarta LLC. Mechdyne Corporation served on 10/29/2012, answer due 11/19/2012. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James A Fussell, III on behalf of Abarta LLC (Fussell, James) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Abarta LLC (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE for Pretrial proceedings to Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/17/12. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Mechdyne Corporation ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3832772.), filed by Abarta LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,224,326, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 50 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?