Kickapoo Run, LLC v. INFOMC, INC.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-00379
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 6:48 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kickapoo Run, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Austin Hansley Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/21/2013 Austin Hansley +1 469 587 9776 +1 855 347 6329 Austin@TheTexasLawOffice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Haynes And Boone, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Michael Jones, II +1 214 651 5073 +1 214 200 0669 charlie.jones@haynesboone.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/05/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Carlyle Gabaeff +1 818 882 1030 +1 818 337 0383 jgabaeff@hgdlawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dara Jeffries +1 404 996 0867 djeffries@hgdlawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Whitefield Ritcheson +1 818 882 1030 +1 818 337 0383 swritcheson@hgdlawfirm.com
No Logo Infomc, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Haynes And Boone, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Russell Emerson +1 214 651 5328 +1 214 200 0884 russ.emerson@haynesboone.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Michael Jones, II +1 214 651 5073 +1 214 200 0669 charlie.jones@haynesboone.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin W. Goldstein +1 302 576 5851 kgoldstein@stradley.com
v.
No Logo Infomc, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Haynes And Boone, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Russell Emerson +1 214 651 5328 +1 214 200 0884 russ.emerson@haynesboone.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Michael Jones, II +1 214 651 5073 +1 214 200 0669 charlie.jones@haynesboone.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin W. Goldstein +1 302 576 5851 kgoldstein@stradley.com
No Logo Kickapoo Run, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Austin Hansley Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/21/2013 Austin Hansley +1 469 587 9776 +1 855 347 6329 Austin@TheTexasLawOffice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Haynes And Boone, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Michael Jones, II +1 214 651 5073 +1 214 200 0669 charlie.jones@haynesboone.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/05/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Carlyle Gabaeff +1 818 882 1030 +1 818 337 0383 jgabaeff@hgdlawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dara Jeffries +1 404 996 0867 djeffries@hgdlawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Whitefield Ritcheson +1 818 882 1030 +1 818 337 0383 swritcheson@hgdlawfirm.com
No Logo Jeff Kaplan, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by JAMS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeff Kaplan +1 214 744 5267 +1 214 720 6010 jkaplan@jamsadr.com
No Logo Scott E Wolson, Technical Advisor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Scott Woloson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Woloson +1 281 352 9878 +1 281 978 2172 scott@scottwolosonlaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (75) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 74 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/2/14. (mrm, ) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Kickapoo Run, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jeffries, Dara) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 72 Motion to Stay deadlines. All deadlines are stayed up to DECEMBER 30, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/16/13. (bas, ) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
        Joint MOTION to Stay by Infomc Inc, Kickapoo Run, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          AMENDED ORDER - the court has received Mr. Woloson's invoice for services through 10/25/2013, the court orders payment to be promptly made as follows. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/26/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 68 Joint Motion to Stay. Docket Control Order is stayed 3 weeks. If parties do not file dismissal papers by 12/15/2013, parties are ORDERED to appear for Status Conference set for 12/17/2013 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/26/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER - the court has received Mr. Nelson's invoice for services throught 10/25/2013, the court ORDERS payment to be promptly made as follows herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/26/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                Joint MOTION to Stay Docket Control Order Deadlines by Infomc Inc, Kickapoo Run, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                  REPORT of Mediation by Jeff Kaplan. Mediation result: settled(Kaplan, Jeff) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                    Letter Brief filed by Infomc Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Responsive Letter Brief)(Goldstein, Kevin) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                      Letter Brief filed by Kickapoo Run, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter Brief Response)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                        Letter Brief filed by Infomc Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A letter brief)(Goldstein, Kevin) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting 61 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Steven Whitefield Ritcheson for Kickapoo Run, LLC. Attorney Joseph Carlyle Gabaeff terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/5/2013. (sm, ) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                            ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***Letter Brief filed by Infomc Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Letter Brief of InfoMC)(Goldstein, Kevin) Modified on 11/5/2013 (ch, ). (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                              Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Kickapoo Run, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                                Letter Brief filed by Kickapoo Run, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Letter Brief)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                                  Letter Brief filed by Kickapoo Run, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Letter Brief)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Motions due by 1/13/2014., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/27/2014., Jury Selection set for 2/17/2014 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/27/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                      Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Infomc Inc, Kickapoo Run, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Emerson, John) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting 55 Motion for extension of time to complete mediation. The new deadline is NOVEMBER 15, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/23/13. (bas, ) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation by Infomc Inc, Kickapoo Run, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Markman Hearing held on 10/18/2013. (Court Reporter Carla Sims.) (bga, ) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Dara T Jeffries on behalf of Kickapoo Run, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4357997. (Jeffries, Dara) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kevin Goldstein on behalf of Infomc Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4357776. (Goldstein, Kevin) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER APPOINTING - Scott E. Woloson as the courts technical advisor. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/9/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ***FILED IN ERROR BY CLERK. PLEASE IGNORE.***PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/3/13. (bas, ) Modified on 10/7/2013 (bas, ). (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                      Joint Claim Construction Chart Pursuant to P.R. 4-5(d) by Kickapoo Run, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Chart)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                        Plaintiff KICKAPOO RUN, LLC's REPLY to Defendant InfoMC, Inc.'s Responsive Claim Construction Brief 46 Claim Construction Brief filed by Kickapoo Run, LLC. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                          REPLY to 46 Claim Construction Brief filed by Infomc Inc. (Emerson, John) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                            OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Kickapoo Run, LLC. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE by Kickapoo Run, LLC Notice of Submission of Joint Claim Construction Chart and Prehearing Statement (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE by Infomc Inc, Kickapoo Run, LLC Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit A, # 9 Exhibit B, # 10 Exhibit C)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement. Deadline is 8/9/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/5/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Pursuant to P.R. 4-3 by Infomc Inc, Kickapoo Run, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Emerson, John) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 39 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/20/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE by Kickapoo Run, LLC re 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Kickapoo Run, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Charles) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 37 Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Order. Amended Pleadings due by 7/10/2013., Markman Hearing set for 10/18/2013 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Motions due by 1/13/2014., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/27/2014., Jury Selection set for 2/17/2014 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/5/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              Joint MOTION Amend the Docket Control Order by Kickapoo Run, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/27/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 32 Motion to Stay Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/3/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Joseph Carlyle Gabaeff on behalf of Kickapoo Run, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4055953. (Gabaeff, Joseph) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 33 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Melissa Richards Smith for Kickapoo Run, LLC,Melissa Richards Smith for Kickapoo Run, LLC. Attorney Austin Lee Hansley terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/20/13. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Kickapoo Run, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION to Stay re 30 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, by Kickapoo Run, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/5/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 3/27/2013., Markman Hearing set for 6/12/2013 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Motions due by 1/13/2014., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/27/2014., Jury Selection set for 2/17/2014 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Mediation deadline is 7/10/2013. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/5/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/5/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/22/13. (bas, ) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Invalidity Contentions Under P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 by Infomc Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Emerson, John) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION for Protective Order , Agreed, by Infomc Inc, Kickapoo Run, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Protective Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Hon. Jeff Kaplan (Ret.) of JAMS, 8401 North Central Expressway, Suite 610, Dallas, Texas 75225, telephone number 214 744-5267 and fax number 214-720-6010, is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced case. Mediation shall be completed by the date set forth in the Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/30/13. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order by Infomc Inc, Kickapoo Run, LLC. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Infomc Inc, Kickapoo Run, LLC. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, No Agreement, filed by Infomc Inc, Kickapoo Run, LLC. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/24/13. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control Order, Discovery Order, and Notice of Mediator by Kickapoo Run, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Docket Control Order, Discovery Order and Notice of Mediator. Deadline is 1/16/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/10/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Docket Control Order, Discovery Order, and Notice of Mediator by Kickapoo Run, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Docket Control Order, Discovery Order, and Notice of Mediator by Kickapoo Run, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) Modified on 1/3/2013 (ch, ). (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Kickapoo Run, LLC Of Compliance with PR 3-1, 3-2 (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Kickapoo Run, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 12/19/2012 09:15 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/19/12. (bas) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Kickapoo Run, LLC of Readiness for a Scheduling Conference (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Kickapoo Run, LLC.(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant InfoMC, Inc. shall have up to and including October 4, 2012, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 10/11/12. (mrm, ) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Russell Emerson on behalf of Infomc Inc (Emerson, John) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Kickapoo Run, LLC by Infomc Inc.(Jones, Charles) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Infomc Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Charles) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Kickapoo Run, LLC.(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Kickapoo Run, LLC.(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kickapoo Run, LLC. Infomc Inc served on 7/24/2012, answer due 8/14/2012. (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Issued as to Infomc Inc. (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kickapoo Run, LLC (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 06/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 06/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Infomc Inc ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3647257.), filed by Kickapoo Run, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 82 times.

                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?