Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. Porsche Cars North America, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00488
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 30, 2016 at 9:34 PM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
v.
Porsche Cars North America, Inc Porsche Cars North America, Inc, Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/09/12. cc:attys 8-09-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None
    NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC OF DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
      Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC (Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
          COMPLAINT against Porsche Cars North America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3705818.), filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 33 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?