Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. Garmin International, Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00515
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 30, 2016 at 1:11 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
No Logo Garmin International, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2012 Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Ainsworth +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 charley@pbatyler.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Christopher Bunt +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 rcbunt@pbatyler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul R Hart +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 paul.hart@eriseip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Abran J Kean +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 abran.kean@eriseip.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline A Bader +1 913 777 5618 +1 913 777 5601 carrie.bader@eriseip.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric A Buresh +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 eric.buresh@eriseip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lyons Marriott +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 michelle.marriott@eriseIP.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan J Redmond +1 913 777 5613 +1 913 777 5601 megan.redmond@eriseip.com
No Logo Garmin USA, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2012 Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Ainsworth +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 charley@pbatyler.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Christopher Bunt +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 rcbunt@pbatyler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul R Hart +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 paul.hart@eriseip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Abran J Kean +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 abran.kean@eriseip.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline A Bader +1 913 777 5618 +1 913 777 5601 carrie.bader@eriseip.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric A Buresh +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 eric.buresh@eriseip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lyons Marriott +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 michelle.marriott@eriseIP.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan J Redmond +1 913 777 5613 +1 913 777 5601 megan.redmond@eriseip.com
v.
No Logo Garmin International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2012 Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Ainsworth +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 charley@pbatyler.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Christopher Bunt +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 rcbunt@pbatyler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul R Hart +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 paul.hart@eriseip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Abran J Kean +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 abran.kean@eriseip.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline A Bader +1 913 777 5618 +1 913 777 5601 carrie.bader@eriseip.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric A Buresh +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 eric.buresh@eriseip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lyons Marriott +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 michelle.marriott@eriseIP.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan J Redmond +1 913 777 5613 +1 913 777 5601 megan.redmond@eriseip.com
No Logo Garmin USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2012 Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Ainsworth +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 charley@pbatyler.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Christopher Bunt +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 rcbunt@pbatyler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul R Hart +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 paul.hart@eriseip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Abran J Kean +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 abran.kean@eriseip.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline A Bader +1 913 777 5618 +1 913 777 5601 carrie.bader@eriseip.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric A Buresh +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 eric.buresh@eriseip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lyons Marriott +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 michelle.marriott@eriseIP.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan J Redmond +1 913 777 5613 +1 913 777 5601 megan.redmond@eriseip.com
No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims between pltf and defts are DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/02/13. cc:attys 4-03-13(mll, ) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/13. cc:attys 3-27-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
      ANSWER to 3 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaims by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
          ANSWER to 2 Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc..(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
            COMPLAINT against Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc., filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: (1) Exhibit 1, (2) Exhibit 2, (3) Exhibit 3, (4) Exhibit 4, (5) Exhibit 5)(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER severing defendant Garmin International, Inc and Garmin USA, Inc from Civil Action 6:11cv495 and assigning to a new case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/10/12. cc:attys 8-10-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 60 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?