Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. Ricoh Americas Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00508
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 30, 2016 at 12:26 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
No Logo Ricoh Americas Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Amster Rothstein & Ebenstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael V. Solomita +1 212 336 8026 +1 212 336 8001 Funai-Orinda@arelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin R Wilcox, III +1 903 595 1133 +1 903 595 0191 mrw@yw-lawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Ricoh Americas Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Amster Rothstein & Ebenstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael V. Solomita +1 212 336 8026 +1 212 336 8001 Funai-Orinda@arelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin R Wilcox, III +1 903 595 1133 +1 903 595 0191 mrw@yw-lawfirm.com
No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE by Ricoh Americas Corporation NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR TERMINATION OF ELECTRONIC NOTICES (Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE by Ricoh Americas Corporation Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Solomita, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/08/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/13. cc:attys 3-27-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
          ANSWER to 3 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaims by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(mll, ) (Entered: 08/11/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ricoh Americas Corporation (mll, ) (Entered: 08/11/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
              ANSWER to 2 Complaint, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, and COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Ricoh Americas Corporation.(mll, ) (Entered: 08/11/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                COMPLAINT against Ricoh Americas Corporation, filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: (1) Exhibit 1, (2) Exhibit 2, (3) Exhibit 3, (4) Exhibit 4, (5) Exhibit 5)(mll, ) (Entered: 08/11/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                  MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER severing defendant Ricoh Americas Corporation from Civil Action 6:11cv495 and assigning to a new case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/10/12. cc:attys 8-10-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/11/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 107 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?