Symantec Corporation et al v. Uniloc USA Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:11-cv-00033
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2017 at 11:08 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Symantec Corporation Symantec Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dale Chang +1 213 891 8662 dale.chang@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean Geoffrey Dunlavey +1 714 540 1235 dean.dunlavey@lw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark A. Flagel +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763 mark.flagel@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathy Yu +1 213 485 1234 kathy.yu@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/14/2012 Yury Kapgan yurykapgan@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Xtreamlok Pty, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dale Chang +1 213 891 8662 dale.chang@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean Geoffrey Dunlavey +1 714 540 1235 dean.dunlavey@lw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark A. Flagel +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763 mark.flagel@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathy Yu +1 213 485 1234 kathy.yu@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/14/2012 Yury Kapgan yurykapgan@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Uniloc (Singapore) Private Ltd., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Cesari & McKenna, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/07/2011, PRO HAC VICE Dean G Bostock +1 617 951 3046 +1 617 951 3927 dgb@c-m.com
TERMINATED: 07/07/2011, PRO HAC VICE Paul J Hayes +1 617 951 2500 +1 617 951 3927 pjh@c-m.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com
No Logo Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cesari & McKenna, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/07/2011, PRO HAC VICE Dean G Bostock +1 617 951 3046 +1 617 951 3927 dgb@c-m.com
TERMINATED: 07/07/2011, PRO HAC VICE Paul J Hayes +1 617 951 2500 +1 617 951 3927 pjh@c-m.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cesari & McKenna, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/07/2011, PRO HAC VICE Dean G Bostock +1 617 951 3046 +1 617 951 3927 dgb@c-m.com
TERMINATED: 07/07/2011, PRO HAC VICE Paul J Hayes +1 617 951 2500 +1 617 951 3927 pjh@c-m.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com
v.
No Logo Uniloc (Singapore) Private Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Cesari & McKenna, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/07/2011, PRO HAC VICE Dean G Bostock +1 617 951 3046 +1 617 951 3927 dgb@c-m.com
TERMINATED: 07/07/2011, PRO HAC VICE Paul J Hayes +1 617 951 2500 +1 617 951 3927 pjh@c-m.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Brannon Latimer +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 blatimer@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cesari & McKenna, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/07/2011, PRO HAC VICE Dean G Bostock +1 617 951 3046 +1 617 951 3927 dgb@c-m.com
TERMINATED: 07/07/2011, PRO HAC VICE Paul J Hayes +1 617 951 2500 +1 617 951 3927 pjh@c-m.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Brannon Latimer +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 blatimer@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cesari & McKenna, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/07/2011, PRO HAC VICE Dean G Bostock +1 617 951 3046 +1 617 951 3927 dgb@c-m.com
TERMINATED: 07/07/2011, PRO HAC VICE Paul J Hayes +1 617 951 2500 +1 617 951 3927 pjh@c-m.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Brannon Latimer +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 blatimer@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
Symantec Corporation Symantec Corporation, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dale Chang +1 213 891 8662 dale.chang@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean Geoffrey Dunlavey +1 714 540 1235 dean.dunlavey@lw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark A. Flagel +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763 mark.flagel@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/14/2012 Yury Kapgan yurykapgan@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Xtreamlok Pty, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dale Chang +1 213 891 8662 dale.chang@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean Geoffrey Dunlavey +1 714 540 1235 dean.dunlavey@lw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark A. Flagel +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763 mark.flagel@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/14/2012 Yury Kapgan yurykapgan@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Honorable Robert Faulkner, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by Jams Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert W Faulkner +1 214 744 5267 +1 214 720 6010 rfaulkner@jamsadr.com
No Logo Michael T McLemore, Technical Advisor
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (116) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/23/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
    Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of authority to seal): 114 Sealed Response to Motion,,.. (Casto, Edward) Modified on 3/22/2013 (sm, ). (Entered: 03/22/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Sealed Legal Document 114 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
      SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 106 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Steven W. Hartsell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K-1, # 13 Exhibit K-2, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Casto, Edward) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        CONSOLIDATION ORDER. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial purposes only. The earliest filed civil action 6:10cv373 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. The model ESI Order, previously filed Discovery Order, and Protective Order (filed in Civil Action 6:10cv373) will govern the consolidated case. All parties to the consolidated case are ORDERED to meet-and-confer and submit a uniform Docket Control Order incorporating the dates designated in this Order. As the stay has been lifted, the parties may engage in discovery. However, the parties may not amend their infringement and invalidity contentions without leave of Court. The parties are further ORDERED to attend mediation before 5-21-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/04/13. cc:attys 3-05-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
          REPLY to Response to Motion re 105 Opposed MOTION to Join Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. as Plaintiff filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 2/25/2013. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign in Sheet) (cwk) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 108 Motion to Modify Briefing Scheduling. ORDERED that the Unilocs deadline to respond to Symantec and Xteamloks Motion to Dismiss is extended to March 21, 2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/1/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kathy Yu on behalf of Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty (Yu, Kathy) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                  Unopposed MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 105 Opposed MOTION to Join Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. as Plaintiff filed by Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Sealed Legal Document 106 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
                      SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of M. Flagel, # 2 Exhibit 1 - 082712 Notice of Ruling, # 3 Exhibit 2 - 030712 Rev 3rd Amended Comp, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Articles of Inc. for Uniloc PC Preload, # 5 Exhibit 4 - UNI077559-77563, # 6 Exhibit 5 - 042202 Richardson letter, # 7 Exhibit 6 - 2010 2011 Cert of Status, # 8 Exhibit 7 - UNI043334-43341, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Gewirtz and Nelson email 11-2011, # 10 Exhibit 9 - UNI098729-98732, # 11 Exhibit 10 - UNI097606-097626, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                        Opposed MOTION to Join Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. as Plaintiff by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward E Casto, Jr on behalf of Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA Inc (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER granting 100 Motion to Lift Stay and Set Case Management Conference. These cases are hereby set for a case management conference on 2-25-2013, at 2:00 P.M. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/25/13. cc:attys 1-25-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                              RESPONSE in Support re 100 Opposed MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND NOTICE OF READINESS FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                                RESPONSE to Motion re 100 Opposed MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND NOTICE OF READINESS FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Sureloc Final Declaratory Judgment, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                  Opposed MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND NOTICE OF READINESS FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Order dismissing California Action, # 2 Exhibit B - Markman Hearing transcript, # 3 Exhibit C - Claim Construction Order, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 98 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Yury Kapgan terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/13/12. cc:attys 5-15-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Yury Kapgan by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting 94 Motion to Stay. This civil action, including all discovery, is STAYED until further order of the Court, pending resolution of the California Action filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Corp. Pty, Ltd., and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. The Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to administratively close this case. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/01/11. cc:attys 12-01-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER. The Court advises the parties that it does not accept communications to the Court outside of CM/ECF filings. Any letters, faxes, or other communications that have not been specifically requested by the Court will be disregarded. All arguments and communications to the Court shall be made through formal CM/ECF filings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/28/11. cc:attys 11-29-11(mll, ) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing Proceedings held on 10/19/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 91 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2012. (sms, ) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                              Joint MOTION to Stay All Above Actions by Symantec Corporation, Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA Inc, Xtreamlok Pty. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Uniloc v. Sureloc Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - Ltr from Miller to attys in Uniloc litigation re 216 patent, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER. This provisional claim construction Order sets forth the Courts initial constructions for the disputed claim terms in U.S. Patent No. 5,490,216. The Court will issue a Memorandum Opinion, including a full analysis of the disputed claim terms, at a later date. The Court may modify these provisional constructions when it issues the Memorandum Opinion. ThisOrder is intended to serve as a guideline and framework with which the parties may proceed at an earlier point in the litigation. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/03/11. cc:attys 11-04-11(mll, ) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER that pltf and defts each pay $14,850.00 to Michael T. McLemore for services rendered and expenses incurred through 10-19-2011 as Technical Advisor to the Court, for a total amount of $29,700.00. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/25/11. cc:attys 10-26-11(mll, ) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Markman Hearing held on 10/19/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER that as time allows, the Court will hear argument on all currently pending motions at the Markman hearing scheduled for 10-19-2011 at 9 a.m. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/12/11. cc:attys 10-13-11(mll, ) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA Inc of Compliance Regarding Patent Rule 4-5(d) (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA Inc Regarding Estimated Amount of Time Required for Markman Hearing (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                            REPLY to 84 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Steven W. Hartsell, # 2 Exhibit G)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER appointing Michael T. McLemore, 10333 Richmond Ave., Suite 1100, Houston, Texas 77042, to the position of technical advisor in this case with his costs to be assessed equally between Plaintiff and Defendants and timely paid as billed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/4/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Sealed Legal Document 85 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 84 Claim Construction Brief,. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of H. Ribera, # 2 Exhibit A - 1st Amended PR 3-1 and 3-2)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  Responsive CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - '216 patent, # 2 Exhibit 2 - PTO Amendment, # 3 Exhibit 3- Reply to PTO, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Response to PTO, # 5 Exhibit 5 - PTO Notice of Reexam, # 6 Exhibit 6 - PTO Dec of Pooch, # 7 Exhibit 7 - PTO Interview Summary, # 8 Exhibit 8 - PTO Dec of Rosenblatt)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER. The Court intends to appoint Michael T. McLemore to the position of technical advisor in this case. Any objection to the appointment shall be presented to the Court for in camera review within 10 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/22/11. cc:attys 9-23-11(mll, ) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 80 Motion to withdraw; withdrawing 77 Motion for Leave. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/12/11. cc:attys 9-12-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Steven W. Hartsell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D1, # 6 Exhibit D2, # 7 Exhibit D3, # 8 Exhibit D4, # 9 Exhibit D5, # 10 Exhibit D6, # 11 Exhibit D7, part 1, # 12 Exhibit D7, part 2, # 13 Exhibit D8, # 14 Exhibit D9, # 15 Exhibit E, # 16 Exhibit F)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/15/2011: # 17 Exhibit E Searchable, # 18 Exhibit F Searchable) (mjc, ). (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Approve the Joint Stipulation to Address Issues in Markman Proceeding and to Withdraw Dkt No. 77 re 77 MOTION for Leave to Address File History Disclaimer Issues, Arising From the Recent Reexamination, in the Upcoming Claim Construction Proceedings by Symantec Corporation, Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA Inc, Xtreamlok Pty. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 78 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing 76 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/06/11. cc:attys 9-07-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 76 MOTION to Strike Previously Construed Claim Terms From the Parties' P.R. 4-3 Statement by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Address File History Disclaimer Issues, Arising From the Recent Reexamination, in the Upcoming Claim Construction Proceedings by Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Claim Construction Letter, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Alternate Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION to Strike Previously Construed Claim Terms From the Parties' P.R. 4-3 Statement by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited of Filing of Patent Rule 4-3 Joint Claim Construction and Pre-Hearing Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty -- Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 -- (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty -- Notice of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 -- (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/29/11. cc:attys 8-29-11(mll, ) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE by Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty of Compliance with Discovery Order (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting 68 Motion for Extension of Time for Symantec Corporation and XtreamLok, Pty to Comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 to furnish invalidity contentions and accompanying document production to 8/26/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/15/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION For Extension of Time to Comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 by Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA Inc of United States Patent Office's Notice of Intent to Issue Ex Parte Reexamination Certificate for Patent-in-Suit (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 45 Stipulation Regarding Motion to Change Venue and Motion to Dismiss, filed by Xtreamlok Pty, Symantec Corporation, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/05/11. cc:attys 8-08-11(mll, ) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty regarding Initial Disclosures (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA Inc (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion and Status Proceedings held on 4/26/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 51 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/12/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Brannon Latimer on behalf of Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc (Latimer, Steven) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 59 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Barry Bumgardner, Steven Wayne Hartsell, and Edward R Nelson, III (Lead) for Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, and Uniloc USA Inc. Attorney Dean G Bostock and Paul J Hayes terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/07/11. cc:attys 7-08-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Symantec Corporation re 54 Order of Disclosure regarding Source Code (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Lewis Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Symantec Corporation Revised Notice of Disclosure Pursuant to Docket Control Order (DKT 150) (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Symantec Corporation Pursuant to Docket Control Order Dkt. 150 (Jones, Michael) Modified on 6/28/2011 (gsg). (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/08/11. cc:attys 6-09-11(mll, ) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/07/11. cc:attys 6-07-11(mll, ) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc (Initial Disclosures) (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time to File the proposed Docket Control Order. Deadline is 6/2/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/3/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DOCKET CONTROL ORDER (PARTIALLY AGREED) by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Courts Order of May 20, 2011, # 2 Text of Proposed Order (Ex B - Proposed Docket Control Order incorporating the Plaintiffs positions), # 3 Text of Proposed Order (Ex C - Proposed Docket Control Order incorporating the Defendants positions))(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION ENTRY OF DISCOVERY ORDER by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Docket Control Order by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty of Designation of Lead Counsel - Mark Flagel (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The parties shall submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 5-31-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/20/11. cc:attys 5-20-11(mll, ) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION (Joint) Regarding Motion to Change Venue and Motion to Dismiss by Symantec Corporation, Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc, Xtreamlok Pty. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul J Hayes (Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        4.26.11 Minute Entry - Status Conf: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 4/26/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf, ) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc re 39 Order, Set Hearings,, of In Camera Submission (Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER setting Status Conference set for 4/26/2011 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. By 4-25-2011 at 9:00 a.m., pltfs shall submit, for in camera review, a table summarizing the licenses or settlements reached in the instant or prior cases involving the patents-in-suit. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/20/11. cc:attys 4-20-11(mll, ) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty re 35 Order, that Case is Ready for Status Conference (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER that plaintiff file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all of the defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice shall be filed within five days of the last remaining defendant's answer or motion. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/01/11. cc:attys 4-04-11(mll, ) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT. cc:attys 1-18-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 8:10-cv-01483. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ENJOIN UNILOC FROM PROCEEDING WITH DUPLICATIVE ACTION AS AGAINST SYMANTEC, AND TO REQUIRE UNILOC TO DISMISS SYMANTEC AS A DEFENDANT FROM THAT ACTION 18 AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS'/COUNTERCLAIMANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS 19 . Electronic Documents are accessible through Pacer. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (Attachments: # 1 Transmittal) (rla) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Plaintiffs Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty, Counter Defendants Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty, Defendants Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc, Counter Claimants Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. (Flagel, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF POST-BRIEFING EVENTS REGARDING PENDING MOTIONS re MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Texas Or, In the Alternative, To Dismiss 19 , MOTION to Enforce Agreements and Order 18 filed by Defendants Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc, Counter Claimants Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. (Shamonki, Nada) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF POST-BRIEFING EVENTS re MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Texas Or, In the Alternative, To Dismiss 19 , MOTION to Enforce Agreements and Order 18 filed by Plaintiffs Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty, Counter Defendants Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Notice, # 2 Exhibit B to Notice, # 3 Exhibit C to Notice)(Flagel, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 12/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: TAKING MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION 19 Motion to Transfer Case. Accordingly, the hearing set for December 20, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. is removed from the calendar. Parties will be served with the Court's ruling. (rla) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge David O. Carter granting 25 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul Hayes on behalf of Defendants Uniloc USA, designating Harvey Saferstein as local counsel. (ak) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge David O. Carter granting 24 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Dean Bostock on behalf of Uniloc USA Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private, designating Harvey Saferstein as local counsel. (ak) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION for attorney Paul J. Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-7933892 paid.) filed by Defendants/Counterclaimants Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case)(Shamonki, Nada) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION for attorney Dean G. Bostock to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-7933744 paid.) filed by Defendants/Counterclaimants Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case)(Shamonki, Nada) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY in Support of MOTION to Enforce Agreements and Order 18 filed by Plaintiffs Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty, Counter Defendants Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty. (Flagel, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY In Support of MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Texas Or, In the Alternative, To Dismiss 19 filed by Defendants Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc, Counter Claimants Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bradley C. Davis In Support Of Defendants/Counterclaimants Motion To Transfer Venue To The U.S. District Court For The Eastern District Of Texas Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss, # 2 Declaration of Dean G. Bostock In Support Of Defendants/Counterclaimants Motion To Transfer Venue To The U.S. District Court For The Eastern District Of Texas Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss)(Shamonki, Nada) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Enforce Agreements and Order 18 filed by Defendants Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc, Counter Claimants Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dean G. Bostock in Support of Defendants/Counterclaimants' Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Enjoin Uniloc From Proceeding With Duplicative Action As Against Symantec, And To Require Uniloc To Dismiss Symantec As A Defendant From That Action)(Shamonki, Nada) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Texas Or, In the Alternative, To Dismiss 19 filed by Plaintiffs Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty, Counter Defendants Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Kazanegras, # 2 Declaration of Mark A. Flagel, # 3 Exhibit A to Flagel Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Flagel Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C to Flagel Declaration, # 6 Exhibit D to Flagel Declaration, # 7 Exhibit E to Flagel Declaration, # 8 Exhibit F to Flagel Declaration, # 9 Exhibit G to Flagel Declaration, # 10 Exhibit H to Flagel Declaration)(Flagel, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Texas Or, In the Alternative, To Dismiss filed by Defendants/ Counterclaimants Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. Motion set for hearing on 12/20/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendants'/ Counterclaimants' Motion For Transfer Of Venue To The United States District Court For The Eastern District Of Texas Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss, # 2 Declaration if Bradley C. Davis In Support of Defendants'/ Counterclaimants' Motion For Transfer Of Venue To The United States District Court For The Eastern District Of Texas Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss, # 3 Declaration of Dean G. Bostock In Support of Defendants'/ Counterclaimants' Motion For Transfer Of Venue To The United States District Court For The Eastern District Of Texas Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss, # 4 Exhibit 1 through 5 to Declaration of of Dean G. Bostock In Support of Defendants'/ Counterclaimants' Motion For Transfer Of Venue To The United States District Court For The Eastern District Of Texas Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss, # 5 Exhibit 6 through 11 to Dean G. Bostock In Support of Defendants'/ Counterclaimants' Motion For Transfer Of Venue To The United States District Court For The Eastern District Of Texas Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss, # 6 Exhibit 12 through 17 to Dean G. Bostock In Support of Defendants'/ Counterclaimants' Motion For Transfer Of Venue To The United States District Court For The Eastern District Of Texas Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss, # 7 Proposed Order Granting of Defendants'/ Counterclaimants' Motion For Transfer Of Venue To The United States District Court For The Eastern District Of Texas Or, In The Alternative, To Dismiss)(Shamonki, Nada) Modified on 12/15/2010 (rla).[Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Agreements and Order filed by Plaintiffs Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty. Motion set for hearing on 12/20/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration of Mark A. Flagel, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration, # 6 Exhibit D to Declaration, # 7 Exhibit E to Declaration, # 8 Exhibit F to Declaration, # 9 Exhibit G to Declaration, # 10 Proposed Order)(Flagel, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        First Amended ANSWER to Counterclaim 15 filed by Plaintiffs and Counter-claim Defendants Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty.(Flagel, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Counterclaim 15 filed by Plaintiffs and Counterclaim Defendants Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty.(Flagel, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            COUNTERCLAIM against Counter Defendants Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty; Jury Demand,, filed by Counterclaimant Uniloc USA Inc, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited.(db) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2011 at 08:30 AM, Courtroom 9-D before Judge David O. Carter. Read Immediately. (see order for details) (nca) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND ; (Defendants' Counterclaim will be manually filed per ECF requirements on 11/8/10) filed by Defendants Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc.(Shamonki, Nada) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Uniloc USA Inc answer now due 11/11/2010; Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited answer now due 11/11/2010; Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited answer now due 11/11/2010, filed by Defendants Uniloc USA Inc; Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited; Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited.(Shamonki, Nada) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Xtreamlok Pty, Symantec Corporation, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Uniloc USA, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Summons and Complaint served 10/7/10, answer due 10/28/10 (Flagel, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Xtreamlok Pty, Symantec Corporation, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Uniloc Corporation PTY Limited in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Summons and Complaint Served 10/7/10, answer due 10/28/10 (Flagel, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Xtreamlok Pty, Symantec Corporation, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Summons and Complaint served 10/7/10, answer due 10/28/10 (Flagel, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty. correcting Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed, Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed 6 , Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed, Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed 5 , Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed, Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed 7 (Flagel, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Xtreamlok Pty, Symantec Corporation, upon Defendant Uniloc USA Inc acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2010, answer due 12/6/2010. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Bradley Davis, Authorized agent to accept service. (Flagel, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Xtreamlok Pty, Symantec Corporation, upon Defendant Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2010, answer due 12/6/2010. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Bradley Davis, Authorized agent to accept service. (Flagel, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Xtreamlok Pty, Symantec Corporation, upon Defendant Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2010, answer due 12/6/2010. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Bradley Davis, Authorized agent to accept service. (Flagel, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV08-00203 DOC (MLGx). Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV10-01483 DOC (MLGx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (ade) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiffs Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty, (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Symantec Corporation, Xtreamlok Pty. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against defendants Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc Corporation Pty Limited, Uniloc USA Inc. Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman.(Filing fee $ 350 paid) jury demand., filed by plaintiffs Xtreamlok Pty, Symantec Corporation.(twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2011.] (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 59 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?