Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. Subaru of America, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00287
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 3:13 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
v.
Subaru Of America, Inc. Subaru Of America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R Barney +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 james.barney@finnegan.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rajeev Gupta +20240435 202 240 4352 raj.gupta@finnegan.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED P. Andrew Riley andrew.riley@finnegan.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas William Winland +1 202 408 4085 +1 202 408 4400 tom.winland@finnegan.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT entered pursuant to the parties' Stipulated Dismissal filed in the consolidated lead case, 6:13-cv-278, Doc. No. 219, by Defendant Subaru of America, Inc. and Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC. Ordered that the parties take nothing and all pending motions are denied as moot. Each party to bear its own costs. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice in their entirety.The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/13/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas W Winland on behalf of Subaru of America, Inc. (Winland, Thomas) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James R Barney on behalf of Subaru of America, Inc. (Barney, James) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by P Andrew Riley on behalf of Subaru of America, Inc. (Riley, P) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rajeev Gupta on behalf of Subaru of America, Inc. (Gupta, Rajeev) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:13cv278 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for trial. All motions shall be filed in the consolidated case. The Clerk of the Court shall add all consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as each defendants Lead and Local Counsel only. Should additional attorneys wish to appear in the consolidated case, they should file a Notice of Appearance in the lead case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/17/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                SUMMONS Issued as to Subaru of America, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                  Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                    COMPLAINT against Subaru of America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4064102.), filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 29 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?