Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. et al v. Nuance Communications, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-01017
District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 5, 2018 at 2:32 PM DT (3.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/02/2014 Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 332 7788 +1 817 332 7789 casey.oneill@wickphillips.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/02/2014 Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 06/02/2014 Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 06/02/2014 Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com
TERMINATED: 06/02/2014 Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/02/2014 Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1260

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Russell Maynard +1 949 885 6084 scott@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/19/2014 Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/02/2014 Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 332 7788 +1 817 332 7789 casey.oneill@wickphillips.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/02/2014 Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 06/02/2014 Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 06/02/2014 Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com
TERMINATED: 06/02/2014 Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/02/2014 Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1260

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Russell Maynard +1 949 885 6084 scott@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/19/2014 Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Nuance Communications Inc., Counter-Claimant
Unknown Role, CERENCE INC

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/12/2013 Garland T. Stephens +1 212 310 8976 +1 212 310 8007 garland.stephens@weil.com
v.
No Logo Nuance Communications Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, CERENCE INC

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah J Race +1 903 561 1600 drace@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/11/2016 ANTHONY L. PRESS +1 213 892 5200 +1 213 892 5454 apress@mofo.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy J Ray +1 213 892 5446 +1 213 892 5454 wray@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edwin Dale Buxton, II +1 858 720 5100 +1 858 720 5125 dbuxton@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/12/2013 Garland T. Stephens +1 212 310 8976 +1 212 310 8007 garland.stephens@weil.com
No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/02/2014 Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 06/02/2014 Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 06/02/2014 Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/02/2014 Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/19/2014 Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/02/2014 Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 06/02/2014 Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 06/02/2014 Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/02/2014 Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/19/2014 Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Hon. W. Royal Furgeson, Jr., Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by United States District Court For The Northern District of Texas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Royal Furgeson, Jr. +1 214 753 2355
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    Case reassigned to Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to the case. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 51 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven Wayne Hartsell; Edward R Nelson, III; Ryan Casey O'Neill; Jaime Kate Olin; Barry Bumgardner and Edward E Casto, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/02/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Change of Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Nelson, III on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott R Maynard on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Maynard, Scott) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER that Garland T. Stephens is withdrawn as Attorney of Record for Defendant Nuance Communications, Inc. in this matter. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/12/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The civil action 6:12cv1013 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/28/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting 44 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/22/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                      ***CORRECTED FILING. REPLACES 43 .***Unopposed MOTION To Extend Certain Deadlines re 33 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, by Nuance Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah) Modified on 10/22/2013 (mjc, ). (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                        ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 44 .***Unopposed MOTION To Extend Deadline for Invalidity Contentions re 33 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, by Nuance Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah) Modified on 10/22/2013 (mjc, ). (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                              PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ***FILED IN ERROR*** PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mll, ) Modified on 10/15/2013 (mll, ). (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                  Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery, E-Discovery, and Protective Orders by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Regarding Disclosures Required by Paragraphs 2(B) and 2(C) of the Court's Discovery Order (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER that the parties submit their agreed Discovery Orders, ESI Orders, and Protective Orders in compliance with this Order within ten days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/02/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE by Nuance Communications, Inc. Of Initial Disclosures (Race, Deborah) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Notice of Compliance (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Judge William Royal Furgeson Jr is appointed as Mediator in this cause. Mediation Completion due by 3/2/2015. Jury Selection set for 2/1/2016 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 2/8/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 10/9/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/10/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice Regarding Disclosures (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Joint Notice of Dispute (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Def Exh 1)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER re Notices of Dispute Concerning Discovery Order, Protective Order, and ESI Order. Parties shall meet and confer and submit a joint notice of dispute indicating the points that cannot be agreed upon, each partys proposal, and a brief statement of reasoning in support of each partys proposal. The joint notice SHALL be submitted on or before 9-03-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/28/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE by Nuance Communications, Inc. Defendants' Notice of Dispute Concerning Docket Control Order, Discovery Order, Protective Order and ESI Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice of Dispute Concerning Docket Control Order, Discovery Order, Protective Order and ESI Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice of Intent to File Additional Related Cases (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Edwin Dale Buxton, II on behalf of Nuance Communications, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4246425. (Buxton, Edwin) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Anthony L Press on behalf of Nuance Communications, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4246423. (Press, Anthony) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Wendy J Ray on behalf of Nuance Communications, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4246403. (Ray, Wendy) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deborah J Race on behalf of Nuance Communications, Inc. (Race, Deborah) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Otis W Carroll, Jr on behalf of Nuance Communications, Inc. (Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER setting Status Conference for 8/29/2013 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/25/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nuance Communications, Inc. (Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          RESPONSE to 15 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Reply to the Counterclaims of Defendant Nuance Communications, Inc. filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Request for Scheduling Conference (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Casey O'Neill on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Nuance Communications, Inc..(Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nuance Communications, Inc..( Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed Amended First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nuance Communications, Inc..( Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 02/06/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nuance Communications, Inc..( Stephens, Garland) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Nuance Communications, Inc. on 1/14/2013, by cert mail; answer due: 2/4/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            SUMMONS Issued as to Nuance Communications, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Nuance Communications, Inc., filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward E Casto, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3930556.), filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - United States Patent No. 5,490,216, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Casto, Edward) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 51 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?