Dexas International Ltd v. Lifetime Brands, Inc. et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:11-cv-00090
District Judge Richard A. Schell, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Richard A. Schell
Last Updated January 9, 2017 at 3:22 PM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Dexas International, Ltd., Plaintiff

Represented by The Law Office Of Daniel V Thompson PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel V Thompson +1 972 479 0900 dt@dfwpatent.com
No Logo Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Kristopher Long +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 klong@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com
No Logo Greenbrier International, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Kristopher Long +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 klong@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com
v.
No Logo Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Brandon Conrad +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 conrad@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Kristopher Long +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 klong@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com
No Logo Greenbrier International, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Brandon Conrad +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 conrad@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Kristopher Long +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 klong@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com
No Logo Lifetime Brands Inc., Defendant

Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Joseph Cornelius, Jr. +1 903 509 5000 +1 903 509 5091 wc@wilsonlawfirm.com
No Logo Dexas International, Ltd., Counter-Defendant

Represented by The Law Office Of Daniel V Thompson PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel V Thompson +1 972 479 0900 dt@dfwpatent.com
Attributes
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 28 Motion to Dismiss. All costs shall be taxed to the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 11/8/2011. (pad, ) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Dexas International Ltd, Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Greenbrier International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER ON CLOSING DOCUMENTS, ( Closing Documents due by 9/30/2011). Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 9/20/11. (cm, ) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER EXTENDING CERTAIN DEADLINES granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 9/20/11. (cm, ) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Settlement and Request for Stay by Dexas International Ltd, Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Greenbrier International, Inc. (Thompson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File (AGREED MOTION TO EXTEND CERTAIN DEADLINES) by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Greenbrier International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Long, James) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/1/2011) (cm, ). (Entered: 08/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER:( Mediation Completion due by 2/1/2012., Proposed Findings of Fact due by 8/24/2012), (Markman Hearing set for 1/5/2012 09:00 AM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before Judge Richard A. Schell.) Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2012 01:30 PM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before Judge Richard A. Schell. Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2011. Discovery due by 5/15/2012. Expert Witness List due from Plaintiff by 3/12/2012 and from Defendant by 4/9/2012. Joinder of Parties due by 7/15/2011. Motions due by 6/11/2012. Motions in Limine due by 8/1/2012. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/24/2012. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 7/6/11. (cm, ) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Schell: Scheduling Conference held on 7/5/2011. (Court Reporter Jerry Kelley.) (bss, ) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 15 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice claims against Lifetime Brands Inc. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 06/29/2011. (lhj, ) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for Defendant Lifetime Brands Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 06/29/2011. (lhj, ) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE by Dexas International Ltd OF COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULE CV-26(C) (Thompson, Daniel) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Greenbrier International, Inc. (NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULE CV-26(C)) (Long, James) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Daniel) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Kriistopher Long on behalf of Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Greenbrier International, Inc. (Long, James) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE CLAIMS AGAINST LIFETIME BRANDS, INC. by Dexas International Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Daniel) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Lifetime Brands, Inc..( Cornelius, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (cm, ). Modified on 5/12/2011 (cm, ). (Entered: 05/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to 9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Dexas International Ltd.(Thompson, Daniel) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO CONDUCT RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE, ( Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/20/2011., Management Conference set for 7/5/2011 03:30 PM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before Judge Richard A. Schell). Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 4/27/11. (cm, ) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Brandon Conrad on behalf of Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Greenbrier International, Inc. (Conrad, David) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Greenbrier International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dollar Tree, Inc. for Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Greenbrier International, Inc.. (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
DOLLAR TREE'S ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM TO DEXAS' ORIGINAL COMPLAINT ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Dexas International Ltd by Greenbrier International, Inc., Dollar Tree Stores, Inc..(McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Lifetime Brands, Inc..( Cornelius, William) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Lifetime Brands, Inc..( Cornelius, William) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Greenbrier International, Inc..( McNabnay, Neil) (Main Document 6 replaced on 3/18/2011) (cm, ). (Entered: 03/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Dollar Tree Stores, Inc..( McNabnay, Neil) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/18/2011) (cm, ). (Entered: 03/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Lifetime Brands, Inc.. (cm, ) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Greenbrier International, Inc.. (cm, ) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (cm, ) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
COMPLAINT ,ORIGINAL, WITH REQUEST FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND JURY DEMAND against Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Greenbriar International, Inc., Lifetime Brands, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2901170.), filed by Dexas International Ltd. (Attachments: # (Thompson, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/23/2011: # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C) (cm, ). Modified on 2/23/2011 (cm, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/23/2011: # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (cm, ). (Entered: 02/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 61 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?