Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. Novatel Wireless Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00519
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 25, 2017 at 8:11 PM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
No Logo Novatel Wireless, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of MATTHEW GROSSMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James George Warriner +1 512 536 3096 +1 512 536 4598 james.warriner@nortonrosefulbright.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 900

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roderick B Williams +1 512 482 6880 +1 512 482 6859 rick.williams@klgates.com
v.
No Logo Novatel Wireless, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of MATTHEW GROSSMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James George Warriner +1 512 536 3096 +1 512 536 4598 james.warriner@nortonrosefulbright.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 900

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roderick B Williams +1 512 482 6880 +1 512 482 6859 rick.williams@klgates.com
No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims and counterclaims between pltf and deft are DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs in connection with this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/26/13. cc:attys 3-27-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
    ANSWER to 3 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaims by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Novatel Wireless, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
        ANSWER to 2 Complaint, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, and COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Novatel Wireless, Inc..(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
          COMPLAINT against Novatel Wireless, Inc., filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: (1) Exhibit 1, (2) Exhibit 2, (3) Exhibit 3, (4) Exhibit 4, (5) Exhibit 5)(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER severing defendant Novatel Wireless, Inc from Civil Action 6:11cv495 and assigning to a new case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/10/12. cc:attys 8-10-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 49 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?