Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. Ford Motor Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00514
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 30, 2016 at 12:54 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
Ford Motor Company Ford Motor Company, Counter-Claimant
Officer/Director, Gopivotal, Inc.
Officer/Director, Vastera, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsay Michelle Manning +1 508 490 8500 +1 508 490 8501 lmanningburke@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marissa A. Lalli marissa.lalli@wilmerhale.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SARAH B. PETTY +1 617 526 6755 sarah.petty@wilmerhale.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Summersgill +1 617 526 6261 +1 617 526 5000 michael.summersgill@wilmerhale.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd C Zubler +1 202 663 6636 +1 202 663 6363 todd.zubler@wilmerhale.com
v.
Ford Motor Company Ford Motor Company, Defendant
Officer/Director, Gopivotal, Inc.
Officer/Director, Vastera, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsay Michelle Manning +1 508 490 8500 +1 508 490 8501 lmanningburke@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marissa A. Lalli marissa.lalli@wilmerhale.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SARAH B. PETTY +1 617 526 6755 sarah.petty@wilmerhale.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Summersgill +1 617 526 6261 +1 617 526 5000 michael.summersgill@wilmerhale.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd C Zubler +1 202 663 6636 +1 202 663 6363 todd.zubler@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims of Plaintiff against Defendant Ford are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/02/13. cc:attys 1-03-13(mll, ) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ford Motor Company (mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
      ANSWER to 2 Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Ford Motor Company.(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
        COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(Attachments: (1) Exhibit 1, (2) Exhibit 2, (3) Exhibit 3, (4) Exhibit 4, (5) Exhibit 5)(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER severing defendant Ford Motor Company from Civil Action 6:11cv495 and assigning to a new case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/10/12. cc:attys 8-10-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 52 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?