ISwitch, LLC v. Cincinnati Bell Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00118
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 5, 2017 at 3:49 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Iswitch, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent Nelson Bumgardner +1 817 377 3490 +1 817 377 3485 brent@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T John Ward +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 tjw@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
No Logo Cincinnati Bell, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/25/2012 Harry Lee Gillam, Jr. +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 gil@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Francis Bennett +1 513 929 3485 +1 513 929 0303 jbennett@bakerlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin W. Kirsch +1 513 929 3400 +1 513 929 0303 kkirsch@bakerlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Mancino +1 513 381 2838 +1 513 929 0303 dmancino@bakerlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Richard Stanley +1 513 929 3419 +1 513 929 0303 sstanley@bakerlaw.com
No Logo Cincinnati Bell Wireless, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/25/2012 Harry Lee Gillam, Jr. +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 gil@gillamsmithlaw.com
No Logo Research In Motion Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Iftikhar Ahmed +1 713 220 5815 +1 713 236 0822 iahmed@akingump.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cono A. Carrano +1 202 887 4136 +1 202 887 4288 ccarrano@akingump.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Joseph Klein +1 214 969 2800 +1 214 969 4343 eklein@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David B Weaver +1 512 322 2588 +1 512 322 3688 david.weaver@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William L. LaFuze +1 713 485 7307 +1 713 485 7344 wlafuze@mckoolsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED koneill@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven R. Borgman +1 713 758 2002 +1 713 615 5758 sborgman@velaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristen Paris Foster +1 512 542 8496 +1 512 236 3298 kfoster@velaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea M Houston +1 512 542 8544 +1 512 236 3270 ahouston@velaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mike Schuster +1 713 758 2395 +1 713 615 5031 wschuster@velaw.com
Research In Motion Ltd. Research In Motion Ltd., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Iftikhar Ahmed +1 713 220 5815 +1 713 236 0822 iahmed@akingump.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cono A. Carrano +1 202 887 4136 +1 202 887 4288 ccarrano@akingump.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Joseph Klein +1 214 969 2800 +1 214 969 4343 eklein@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David B Weaver +1 512 322 2588 +1 512 322 3688 david.weaver@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William L. LaFuze +1 713 485 7307 +1 713 485 7344 wlafuze@mckoolsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED koneill@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven R. Borgman +1 713 758 2002 +1 713 615 5758 sborgman@velaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristen Paris Foster +1 512 542 8496 +1 512 236 3298 kfoster@velaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea M Houston +1 512 542 8544 +1 512 236 3270 ahouston@velaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mike Schuster +1 713 758 2395 +1 713 615 5031 wschuster@velaw.com
v.
No Logo Cincinnati Bell, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/25/2012 Harry Lee Gillam, Jr. +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 gil@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Francis Bennett +1 513 929 3485 +1 513 929 0303 jbennett@bakerlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin W. Kirsch +1 513 929 3400 +1 513 929 0303 kkirsch@bakerlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Mancino +1 513 381 2838 +1 513 929 0303 dmancino@bakerlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Richard Stanley +1 513 929 3419 +1 513 929 0303 sstanley@bakerlaw.com
No Logo Cincinnati Bell Wireless, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/25/2012 Harry Lee Gillam, Jr. +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 gil@gillamsmithlaw.com
No Logo Research In Motion Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Iftikhar Ahmed +1 713 220 5815 +1 713 236 0822 iahmed@akingump.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cono A. Carrano +1 202 887 4136 +1 202 887 4288 ccarrano@akingump.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Everingham, IV +1 903 297 7404 +1 903 297 7402 ceveringham@akingump.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Joseph Klein +1 214 969 2800 +1 214 969 4343 eklein@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David B Weaver +1 512 322 2588 +1 512 322 3688 david.weaver@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William L. LaFuze +1 713 485 7307 +1 713 485 7344 wlafuze@mckoolsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED koneill@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven R. Borgman +1 713 758 2002 +1 713 615 5758 sborgman@velaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristen Paris Foster +1 512 542 8496 +1 512 236 3298 kfoster@velaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea M Houston +1 512 542 8544 +1 512 236 3270 ahouston@velaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mike Schuster +1 713 758 2395 +1 713 615 5031 wschuster@velaw.com
Research In Motion Ltd. Research In Motion Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Iftikhar Ahmed +1 713 220 5815 +1 713 236 0822 iahmed@akingump.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cono A. Carrano +1 202 887 4136 +1 202 887 4288 ccarrano@akingump.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Everingham, IV +1 903 297 7404 +1 903 297 7402 ceveringham@akingump.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Joseph Klein +1 214 969 2800 +1 214 969 4343 eklein@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David B Weaver +1 512 322 2588 +1 512 322 3688 david.weaver@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William L. LaFuze +1 713 485 7307 +1 713 485 7344 wlafuze@mckoolsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED koneill@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven R. Borgman +1 713 758 2002 +1 713 615 5758 sborgman@velaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristen Paris Foster +1 512 542 8496 +1 512 236 3298 kfoster@velaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea M Houston +1 512 542 8544 +1 512 236 3270 ahouston@velaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mike Schuster +1 713 758 2395 +1 713 615 5031 wschuster@velaw.com
No Logo Iswitch, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent Nelson Bumgardner +1 817 377 3490 +1 817 377 3485 brent@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent Nelson Bumgardner +1 817 377 3490 +1 817 377 3485 brent@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
No Logo Hon. Layn R. Phillips, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Layn R Phillips +1 949 760 0991 +1 949 760 5200 lphillips@irell.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (68) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT that the parties take nothing and that all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. All claims, counterclaims, and third-party claims in the instant suit are DISMISSED in their entirety. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/03/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 66 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted by Plaintiff in this case are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and all counterclaims asserted by Defendants Cincinnati Bell Inc., Cincinnati Bell Wireless, LLC, Research in Motion Ltd. and Research in Motion Corporation are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear their own fees and expenses. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/03/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
      Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff ISwitch, LLC and Defendants Cincinnati Bell Inc., Cincinnati Bell Wireless, LLC, Research in Motion Ltd. and Research in Motion Corporation's Joint Motion to Dismiss by ISwitch, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 64 Motion to extend deadline. ORDERED that the deadline for filing closing papers in this case is extended until May 29, 2013. All deadlines are stayed up to and including May 29, 2013. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/9/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
          Unopposed MOTION to Extend the Deadline for Submitting Closing Papers Second Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline for Submitting Closing Papers by ISwitch, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 62 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for filing closing papers in this case is extended to 5-08-2013. All deadlines are stayed to 5-08-2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/02/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Submit) Closing Papers by Cincinnati Bell Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Everingham, Charles) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER that parties submit closing documents no later than 5-01-2013 so that the case can be removed from Court's docket. All deadlines are stayed up to and including 5-01-2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/01/13. cc:attys 4-01-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                  Unopposed MOTION to Stay Certain Deadlines With All Defendants by ISwitch, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward on behalf of ISwitch, LLC (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF P. R. 3-4(a) and Discovery Order Disclosures (Everingham, Charles) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Cincinnati Bell Inc., Cincinnati Bell Wireless, LLC, Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF P. R. 3-3 & 3-4(b) DISCLOSURES (Everingham, Charles) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by ISwitch, LLC Under Paragraph 2(B) Of The Discovery Order (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER granting 54 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Disclosures Pursuant to Discovery Order. The deadline to serve disclosures pursuant to Paragraph 2(B) of the Court's September 7, 2012 Discovery Order (dkt #45) is extended from October 22, 2012 to November 6, 2012. This is a test only order and no document is attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/23/12. (mjm) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO DISCOVERY ORDER by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Everingham, Charles) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. [Initial Disclosures] (Borgman, Steven) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Cincinnati Bell Inc., Cincinnati Bell Wireless, LLC OF SERVING INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Kirsch, Kevin) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE by ISwitch, LLC of Disclosure Under Paragraph 1 of the Discovery Order (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Everingham, IV on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Everingham, Charles) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by ISwitch, LLC under Paragraph 2(c) of the Discovery Order (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Layn R. Phillips added as Mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/07/12. cc:attys 9-07-12(mll, ) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Jury Selection set for 11/3/2014 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 11/10/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 8/29/2013 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/07/12. cc:attys 9-07-12(mll, ) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/07/12. cc:attys 9-07-12(mll, ) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/07/12. cc:attys 9-07-12(mll, ) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/07/12. cc:attys 9-07-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Layn Phillips, filed by ISwitch, LLC. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                      Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order, Discovery Order, E-Discovery Order and Protective Order by ISwitch, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit Discovery Order, # 3 Exhibit Docket Control Order, # 4 Exhibit ESI Order)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE by ISwitch, LLC of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER setting Scheduling/Status Conference for 9/7/2012 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/09/12. cc:attys 8-10-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/08/12. cc:attys 8-09-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 8/6/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Wesley Hill (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting 32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Harry Lee Gillam, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/25/12. cc:attys 6-25-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Michael Schuster on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Schuster, William) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea M Houston on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Houston, Andrea) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristen Paris Foster on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Foster, Kristen) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cincinnati Bell Inc., Cincinnati Bell Wireless, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER setting Status Conference for 8/6/2012 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/13/12. cc:attys 6-14-12(mll, ) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE by ISwitch, LLC OF REQUEST FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                RESPONSE to 25 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, of Defendants Research in Motion Ltd. and Research in Motion Corp. by ISwitch, LLC. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  RESPONSE to 24 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendants Cincinnati Bell Inc. and Cincinnati Bell Wireless, LLC by ISwitch, LLC. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cincinnati Bell Inc., Cincinnati Bell Wireless, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Bell Inc. for Cincinnati Bell Wireless, LLC ; Corporate Parent None for Cincinnati Bell Inc.. (Gillam, Harry) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Klein, Eric) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS RESEARCH IN MOTION LIMITED AND RESEARCH IN MOTION CORPORATION'S ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against ISwitch, LLC by Research in Motion Ltd., Research In Motion Corporation.(Klein, Eric) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against ISwitch, LLC by Cincinnati Bell Wireless, LLC, Cincinnati Bell Inc..(Gillam, Harry) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cincinnati Bell Wireless, LLC.( Gillam, Harry) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cincinnati Bell Inc..( Gillam, Harry) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                Defendants Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd..( Klein, Eric) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John Francis Bennett for Cincinnati Bell Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin Walpole Kirsch for Cincinnati Bell Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David A Mancino for Cincinnati Bell Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott R Stanley for Cincinnati Bell Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cincinnati Bell Inc.(Gillam, Harry) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Iftikhar Ahmed on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Ahmed, Iftikhar) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Joseph Klein on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Klein, Eric) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kirt S O'Neill on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (O'Neill, Kirt) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cono A Carrano on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Carrano, Cono) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David B Weaver on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Weaver, David) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven R Borgman on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Borgman, Steven) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William L. LaFuze on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (LaFuze, William) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of ISwitch, LLC (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Nelson Bumgardner on behalf of ISwitch, LLC (Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of ISwitch, LLC (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ISwitch, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Kingfisher Fund VI LP for ISwitch, LLC. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Issued as to Cincinnati Bell Inc., Cincinnati Bell Wireless, LLC, Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of ISwitch, LLC (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Cincinnati Bell Inc., Cincinnati Bell Wireless, LLC, Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3483584.), filed by ISwitch, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - United States Patent No. 7,225,334)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 65 times.

                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?