Remote Vehicle Technologies, LLC v. Hyundai Motor America, Inc

Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:11-cv-00392
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Leonard Davis
Last Updated January 9, 2017 at 5:49 AM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Remote Vehicle Technologies, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Russ August & Kabat

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc Aaron Fenster +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 mafenster@raklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew David Weiss +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 aweiss@raklaw.com

Represented by Ste. 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com

Represented by Weisbrod Matteis & Copley, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A Fussell, III +1 202 499 7900 jfussell@wmclaw.com
No Logo Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel T. Conrad +1 214 969 2963 +1 214 969 5100 Dtconrad@JonesDay.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Thomas O'Brien +1 214 969 5226 +1 214 969 5100 dtobrien@jonesday.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Michael Poissant +1 212 326 3939 +1 212 755 7306 bmpoissant@jonesday.com

Represented by Workman, Gary

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yeah-Sil Moon +1 212 326 3778 ymoon@jonesday.com
v.
No Logo Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel T. Conrad +1 214 969 2963 +1 214 969 5100 Dtconrad@JonesDay.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Thomas O'Brien +1 214 969 5226 +1 214 969 5100 dtobrien@jonesday.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Michael Poissant +1 212 326 3939 +1 212 755 7306 bmpoissant@jonesday.com

Represented by Workman, Gary

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yeah-Sil Moon +1 212 326 3778 ymoon@jonesday.com
No Logo Remote Vehicle Technologies, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Russ August & Kabat

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc Aaron Fenster +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 mafenster@raklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew David Weiss +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 aweiss@raklaw.com
Other Parties
No Logo Honorable Robert Faulkner, Mediator

Represented by JAMS, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert W Faulkner +1 214 744 5267 +1 214 720 6010 rfaulkner@jamsadr.com
Attributes
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT that the parties take nothing and that all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. All claims, counterclaims, and third-party claims in the instant suit are DISMISSED in their entirety. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/11/12. cc:attys 6-11-12(mll, ) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 39 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between plaintiff, and defendant Hyundai Motor America, Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms of the SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. All attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party thatincurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/11/12. cc:attys 6-11-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Remote Vehicle Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weiss, Andrew) (Entered: 06/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that parties shall submit closing documents no later than 6-29-2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/30/12. cc:attys 5-30-12(mll, ) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for parties to exchange disclosures is extended to 6-15-2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/30/12. cc:attys 5-30-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion to Extend Upcoming Deadline by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Daniel) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
E-DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/18/12. cc:attys 4-18-12(mll, ) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in part 33 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court DENIES HNAs request to extend the parties deadline to submit agreements or disputes regarding ESI discovery and production. The remainder of HNAs Motion is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/18/12. cc:attys 4-18-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion to Extend Upcoming Deadlines by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Daniel) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 31 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties are ORDERED to submit any agreements or disputes regarding ESI discovery and production no later than 4-16-2012. No further extensions will be granted. If parties fail to comply with this Order, the Court will enter the Model Order found in Appendix P of the Local Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/10/12. cc:attys 4-10-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to File Agreements or Disputes regarding ESI Discovery and Production by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Daniel) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Robert Faulkner added as Mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/29/12. cc:attys 3-29-12(mll, ) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by Remote Vehicle Technologies, LLC of Agreement Regarding Mediator (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that parties submit any agreements or disputes regarding ESI discovery and production no later than 4-09-2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/27/12. cc:attys 3-28-12(mll, ) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/27/12. cc:attys 3-27-12(mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/27/12. cc:attys 3-27-12(mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Remote Vehicle Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Agreed Docket Control Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Agreed Discovery Order)(O'Brien, Daniel) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Docket and Discovery Orders by Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Remote Vehicle Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Agreed Docket Control Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Agreed Discovery Order)(O'Brien, Daniel) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
REPLY to Response to Motion re 16 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) filed by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I - U.S. Patent and Trademark Office Assignment Database Records - Cushion Patents, # 2 Exhibit J - U.S. Patent No. 5,060,401, # 3 Exhibit K - U.S. Patent No. 5,279,051, # 4 Exhibit L - Cushion Techs., LLC v. Adidas Salomon N. Am., Inc. et al., No. 206-cv-347 (E.D. Tex.), # 5 Exhibit M - Cushion Techs., LLC v. Am. Sporting Goods Corp., et al., No. 207-cv-109 (E.D. Tex.), # 6 Exhibit N - Judge Love's Referral Docket Control Order Template)(Conrad, Daniel) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER setting Status Conference for 3/28/2012 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/08/12. cc:attys 3-09-12(mll, ) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/07/12. cc:attys 3-08-12(mll, ) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 3/5/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf, ) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 16 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) filed by Remote Vehicle Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Erich Spangenberg, # 2 Exhibit A (Certificate of Filing), # 3 Exhibit B (RVT Name Change), # 4 Affidavit of Andrew D. Weiss, # 5 Exhibit A (Assignment History), # 6 Exhibit B (Newark-DFW), # 7 Exhibit C (Newark-LAX), # 8 Exhibit D (ORD-DFW), # 9 Exhibit E (ORD-LAX), # 10 Exhibit F (MKE-DFW), # 11 Exhibit G (MKE-LAX), # 12 Exhibit H (DTW-DFW), # 13 Exhibit I (DTW-LAX), # 14 Exhibit J (DFW-Tyler Map), # 15 Exhibit K (LAX-CD Cal), # 16 Exhibit L (General Order 98-03), # 17 Exhibit M (2011-patent litigation-study))(Weiss, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2012: # 18 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 03/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James A Fussell, III on behalf of Remote Vehicle Technologies, LLC (Fussell, James) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by Remote Vehicle Technologies, LLC of Change of Firm Name (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Declaration of Barry J. Ratzlaff, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Texas Secretary of State Records, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C-Westlaw People Finder Search Results for Michael Kapolka, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D-U.S. Patent and Trademark Office-Office of Enrollment and Discipline-Patent Attorney/Agent Search Results, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E-U.S. Patent and Trademark Office Assignment Database Records, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F-Travel Times from www.kayak.com, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G-Driving Directions from maps.google.com, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H-Table C-5 of Federal Judicial Caseload Statistics, March 31, 2011, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Daniel) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER setting Status Conference for 3/5/2012 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/14/12. cc:attys 2-14-12(mll, ) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by Remote Vehicle Technologies, LLC of Readiness for a Scheduling Conference (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew W. Spangler on behalf of Remote Vehicle Technologies, LLC (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 12/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None
FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew W. Spangler on behalf of Remote Vehicle Technologies, LLC (Spangler, Andrew) Modified on 12/8/2011 (gsg). (Entered: 12/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Remote Vehicle Technologies, LLCs Answer To Counterclaims of Hyundai Motor America, Inc. by Remote Vehicle Technologies, LLC. (Weiss, Andrew) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Yeah Sil Moon for Hyundai Motor America, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian M Poissant for Hyundai Motor America, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/11/2011, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hyundai Motor America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hyundai Motor Company for Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Conrad, Daniel) (Entered: 11/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/11/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Remote Vehicle Technologies, LLC by Hyundai Motor America, Inc..(Conrad, Daniel) (Entered: 11/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/11/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Thomas O'Brien on behalf of Hyundai Motor America, Inc. (O'Brien, Daniel) (Entered: 11/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hyundai Motor America, Inc..( Conrad, Daniel) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
Return of Service Executed as to Hyundai Motor America, Inc. on 9/6/2011, by personal service; answer due: 9/27/2011. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew D Weiss on behalf of Remote Vehicle Technologies, LLC (Weiss, Andrew) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Hyundai Motor America, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGMENT against Hyundai Motor America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3153482.), filed by Remote Vehicle Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Summons(es), # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Supplement Form AO 120)(Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 55 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?