Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. JVC Americas Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00518
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 25, 2017 at 8:11 PM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
v.
No Logo Jvc Americas Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cedric Lloyd Allen +1 214 922 3400 +1 214 922 3899 cedric.allen@alston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yitai Hu +1 650 838 2000 +1 650 838 2001 yitai.hu@alston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J Newton +1 214 922 3400 +1 214 922 3899 mike.newton@alston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Hannah Rader +1 650 838 2008 +1 650 838 2001 elizabeth.rader@alston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melvin R Wilcox, III +1 903 595 1133 +1 903 595 0191 mrw@yw-lawfirm.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant JVC Americas Corporation are hereby, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs in connection herewith. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/31/12. cc:attys 8-31-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by JVC Americas Corporation (mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
      ANSWER AND DEFENSES to 2 Complaint by JVC Americas Corporation.(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
        COMPLAINT against JVC Americas Corporation, filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: (1) Exhibit 1, (2) Exhibit 2, (3) Exhibit 3, (4) Exhibit 4, (5) Exhibit 5)(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER severing defendant JVC Americas Corporation from Civil Action 6:11cv495 and assigning to a new case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/10/12. cc:attys 8-10-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 20 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?