Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. et al v. SolarWinds, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00228
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 3, 2017 at 9:48 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2013 Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/26/2013 Stephen Eugene Edwards +1 713 228 6601 +1 713 228 6605 sedwards@blankrome.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2013 Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/26/2013 Stephen Eugene Edwards +1 713 228 6601 +1 713 228 6605 sedwards@blankrome.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Solarwinds, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Klein Ayers +1 214 939 5497 +1 214 939 5849 jennifer.ayers@klgates.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Gregory Schortgen +1 214 939 5567 +1 214 939 5849 steve.schortgen@klgates.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan J Sinclair +1 650 798 6700 +1 650 798 6701 bryan.sinclair@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin E. Weed +1 312 781 7166 +1 312 345 1843 benjamin.weed@klgates.com
v.
No Logo Solarwinds Worldwide, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Klein Ayers +1 214 939 5497 +1 214 939 5849 jennifer.ayers@klgates.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Gregory Schortgen +1 214 939 5567 +1 214 939 5849 steve.schortgen@klgates.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan J Sinclair +1 650 798 6700 +1 650 798 6701 bryan.sinclair@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin E. Weed +1 312 781 7166 +1 312 345 1843 benjamin.weed@klgates.com
No Logo Solarwinds, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Klein Ayers +1 214 939 5497 +1 214 939 5849 jennifer.ayers@klgates.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Gregory Schortgen +1 214 939 5567 +1 214 939 5849 steve.schortgen@klgates.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan J Sinclair +1 650 798 6700 +1 650 798 6701 bryan.sinclair@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin E. Weed +1 312 781 7166 +1 312 345 1843 benjamin.weed@klgates.com
No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2013 Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/26/2013 Stephen Eugene Edwards +1 713 228 6601 +1 713 228 6605 sedwards@blankrome.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2013 Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/26/2013 Stephen Eugene Edwards +1 713 228 6601 +1 713 228 6605 sedwards@blankrome.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo James Knowles, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by Knowles Mediations

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Knowles +1 903 534 3800 +1 903 534 3806 jimk@knowlesmed.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Any and all claims of Plaintiffs are dismissed with prejudice from the case. Defendants' counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs and Defendants shall each bear their own attorney's fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/19/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE by SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc. Notice of Change of Lead Counsel for Defendants SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC and SolarWinds, Inc. (Sinclair, Bryan) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
      REPORT of Mediation by James Knowles. Mediation result: Suspended(Knowles, James) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER that this civil action is CONSOLIDATED for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:12cv227 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated lead case. Parties shall submit a single Docket Control, Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order, and each of the respective orders shall be filed in the Lead Case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/09/12. cc:attys 10-09-12(mll, ) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by SolarWinds, Inc. Disclosing Service of Initial Disclosures (Ayers, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
              NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice Regarding Disclosures (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Mediation Completion due by 6/28/2013. James Knowles is appointed Mediator in this cause. Jury Selection set for 11/3/2014 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 11/10/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 9/26/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/24/12. cc:attys 8-27-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/23/12. cc:attys 8-23-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                    DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/23/12. cc:attys 8-23-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
                      Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order, Discovery Order and E-Discovery Order by SolarWinds, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Docket Control Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Discovery Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed E-Discovery Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER granting 22 Unoppsed Motion to Extend. The deadline to comply with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 is extended to 9/14/12, and the deadline to comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 is extended to 12/3/2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/10/2012. (leh, ) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER that parties are to submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 08-20-2012. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local patent rules, the Court deems 08-20-2012 as the effective Rule 16 Initial Case Management Conference date, and thus plaintiff's PR 3-1 and 3-2 disclosures will be due 08-10-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/08/12. cc:attys 8-09-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Certain Disclosure Deadlines by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 8/6/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Klein Ayers on behalf of SolarWinds, Inc. (Ayers, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Wesley Hill (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None
                                    RESPONSE to 14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant SolarWinds, Inc. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER setting Status Conference for 8/6/2012 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/13/12. cc:attys 6-14-12(mll, ) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. OF REQUEST FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SolarWinds, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SolarWinds, Inc. for SolarWinds, Inc., SolarWinds, Inc.. (Schortgen, Steven) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                                            Original ANSWER to 1 Complaint, First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by SolarWinds, Inc..(Schortgen, Steven) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
                                              APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bryan J Sinclair for SolarWinds, Inc.. (pkb, ) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Benjamin E Weed for SolarWinds, Inc.. (pkb, ) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                  Return of Service Executed as to SolarWinds, Inc. on 4/17/2012, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re SolarWinds, Inc..( Schortgen, Steven) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                      SUMMONS Issued as to SolarWinds, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen E Edwards on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Edwards, Stephen) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Miller Albritton on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      COMPLAINT against SolarWinds, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3521886.), filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US 7,024,696, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 42 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?