Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. Dish Network Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00513
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 30, 2016 at 1:20 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
Dish Network Corporation Dish Network Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah J Race +1 903 561 1600 drace@icklaw.com
v.
Dish Network Corporation Dish Network Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah J Race +1 903 561 1600 drace@icklaw.com
No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT that the parties take nothing and that all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED without prejudice in their entirety. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/18/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/18/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/13. cc:attys 3-27-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
        ANSWER to 3 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaims by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dish Network Corporation (mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
            ANSWER to 2 Complaint, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, and COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Dish Network Corporation.(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
              COMPLAINT against Dish Network Corporation, filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(Attachments: (1) Exhibit 1, (2) Exhibit 2, (3) Exhibit 3, (4) Exhibit 4, (5) Exhibit 5)(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER severing defendant Dish Network Corporation from Civil Action 6:11cv495 and assigning to a new case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/10/12. cc:attys 8-10-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 44 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?