Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. et al v. Palisade Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00971
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 2:06 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman, Suder & Cooke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/07/2013 Decker A. Cammack +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 cammack@fsclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman, Suder & Cooke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/07/2013 Decker A. Cammack +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 cammack@fsclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
v.
No Logo Palisade Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrews & Kurth, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul D. Ackerman +1 212 850 2858 +1 212 813 8148 paulackerman@andrewskurth.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 19 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted in this suit between Uniloc and Palisade are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the Party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/25/13. cc:attys 3-25-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
    MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Defendant Palisade Corporation With Prejudice by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Palisade Corporation's time to ANSWER or otherwise move is extended to 4-11-2013. No further extensions to the time to respond to the Complaint will be granted. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/14/13. cc:attys 3-14-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None
        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Palisade Corporation. (Ackerman, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2013: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 03/13/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
          Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Palisade Corporation.( Ackerman, Paul) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
            Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Palisade Corporation.( Ackerman, Paul) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Palisade Corporation.( Ackerman, Paul) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                Return of Service Executed as to Palisade Corporation on 1/4/2013, by cert mail; answer due: 1/25/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting 10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Decker A Cammack terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/07/13. cc:attys 1-08-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward E Casto, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Miller Albritton on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None
                                    SUMMONS Issued as to Palisade Corporation, and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                      Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                        COMPLAINT against Palisade Corporation ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3927791.), filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 7,024,696)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 70 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?