Abarta LLC v. Vuzix Corporation

Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-00682
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap
Last Updated December 23, 2016 at 4:11 AM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Abarta LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Ste. 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com

Represented by Weisbrod Matteis & Copley, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A Fussell, III +1 202 499 7900 jfussell@wmclaw.com
v.
No Logo Vuzix Corporation, Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE - The Notice of Voluntary Dismissal is GRANTED. All claims asserted by Plaintiff against Defendant Vuzix, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/29/13. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE by Abarta LLC of Change of Firm Name (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Abarta LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Vuzix Corporation (sm, ) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Entry of Default by Vuzix Corporation by Abarta LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Of Andrew W. Spangler, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abarta LLC. Vuzix Corporation served on 10/30/2012, answer due 11/20/2012. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
Corrected SUMMONS REISSUED as to Vuzix Corporation. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
SUMMONS Issued as to Vuzix Corporation. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
CORRECTED Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew) Modified on 10/24/2012 (sm, ). (Entered: 10/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE for Pretrial proceedings to Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/23/12. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James A Fussell, III on behalf of Abarta LLC (Fussell, James) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Abarta LLC (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Vuzix Corporation ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3842756.), filed by Abarta LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,224,326, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 254 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?