JOAO Bock Transaction Systems, LLC v. Georgia's Own Credit Union
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-00147
District Judge Richard W. Story, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 31, 2017 at 9:29 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Joao Bock Transaction Systems, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Robert Miller +1 404 996 0863 +1 205 547 5506 jmiller@hgdlawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Whitefield Ritcheson +1 818 882 1030 +1 818 337 0383 swritcheson@hgdlawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Georgia's Own Credit Union, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (mdy) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by JOAO Bock Transaction Systems, LLC (Miller, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      Court Notice Of Filing: Standing Order by Judge Richard W. Story. (rag) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None
        AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (bdb) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
          Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by JOAO Bock Transaction Systems, LLC. (bdb) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
            Summons Issued as to Georgia's Own Credit Union. (bdb) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
              COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by JOAO Bock Transaction Systems. LLC. Consent form to proceed before U.S. Magistrate and pretrial instructions provided. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number GAN100052451.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/16/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 113 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?