Smart Options, LLC v. Steadyfare
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-08042
District Judge John J. Tharp, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 8, 2017 at 11:31 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Smart Options, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Smart Options, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Geoffrey Andrew Baker +1 708 707 8778 geoffb@optionit.com
v.
No Logo Steadyfare, Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KrausFlaming LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd H. Flaming +1 312 447 7217 todd@krausflaming.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Correction regarding document number 26 (tmh, ) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
    MODIFIED Consent Judgment and Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 3/5/2013:Mailed notice(air, ) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
      MINUTE entry before Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Status hearing held. Plaintiff failed to appear. Parties' joint agreed motion for entry of modified consent judgment and stipulation of dismissal with prejudice 24 is granted. No appearance required on 3/6/2013. Case terminated. ENTER MODIFIED CONSENT JUDGMENT AND STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. (For further details see separate order)Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
        DOCUMENT ENTERED IN ERROR. (air, ). Modified on 3/6/2013 (tmh, ). (Entered: 03/05/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Motion by Todd H. Flaming for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 24 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 3/13/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Flaming, Todd) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
            MOTION by Plaintiff Smart Options, LLC, Defendant Steadyfare, Inc Joint Agreed Motion for Entry of Modified Consent Judgment and Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Flaming, Todd) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Motion by Geoffrey Andrew Baker for presentment of motion for order 22 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 3/6/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Baker, Geoffrey) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                MOTION by Plaintiff Smart Options, LLC, Defendant Steadyfare, Inc for order JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CONSENT JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order CONSENT JUDGMENT and STIPULATED DISMISSAL)(Baker, Geoffrey) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                  MINUTE entry before Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: The parties' Joint Agreed Motion to extend response to complaint 19 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Defendant SteadyFare's responsive pleading is due 2/18/13. The initial status hearing is reset to 3/5/13 at 9:00 a.m., with the initial status report due on 2/25/13. These dates will be stricken upon the filing of a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a). Mailed notice(air, ) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Motion by Todd H. Flaming for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 19 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 1/22/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Flaming, Todd) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                      MOTION by Plaintiff Smart Options, LLC, Defendant Steadyfare, Inc for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (JOINT AGREED MOTION) (Flaming, Todd) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                        MINUTE entry before Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Status hearing set for 1/10/2013 is stricken.Status hearing is reset for 1/30/2013 at 9:00 a.m. Parties' Initial Status Report is due 1/23/2013. If a stipulation of dismissal has been filed, the status and report will be stricken. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None
                          MINUTE entry before Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Agreed Motion by Defendant Steadyfare, Inc. for an extension of time to file its responsive pleading to the complaint 15 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Defendant's responsive pleading is due on 1/18/2013. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Motion by Todd H. Flaming for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 15 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 12/20/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Flaming, Todd) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None
                              MOTION by Defendant Steadyfare, Inc for extension of time to file answer (AGREED MOTION) (Flaming, Todd) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                MINUTE entry before Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The parties' agreed motion for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint 11 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Defendant's responsive pleading to the amended complaint is due 12/21/12. The initial status set for 12/13/12 is re-set to 1/10/13 at 9:00 a.m. Initial status report to be filed by 1/4/13. Mailed notice(air, ) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Motion by Geoffrey Andrew Baker for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief 12 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 12/5/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Baker, Geoffrey) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
                                    MOTION by Plaintiff Smart Options, LLC, Defendant Steadyfare, Inc for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint 11 AGREED MOTION (Baker, Geoffrey) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/4/2012, Entered: None
                                      AMENDED complaint by Smart Options, LLC against Steadyfare, Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Baker, Geoffrey) (Entered: 11/04/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Defendant's motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint 8 is granted. No appearance is required on the motion. Defendant's responsive pleading is due on 11/30/12. The initial status conference in this matter is set for 12/13/12 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Tharps web site, which may be accessed at [www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judges] and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 12/7/12. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Motion by Todd H. Flaming for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 8 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 11/1/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Flaming, Todd) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None
                                            MOTION by Defendant Steadyfare, Inc for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Flaming, Todd) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None
                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Steadyfare, Inc by Todd H. Flaming (Flaming, Todd) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Defendant Steadyfare, Inc regarding Summons, Complaint and Exhibits to Complaint served on Steadyfare, Inc. on 10/11/2012, SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Smart Options, LLC as to Steadyfare, Inc., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Smart Options, LLC (Baker, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                  MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (mjc, ) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Smart Options, LLC by Geoffrey Andrew Baker (Baker, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE by Smart Options, LLC LR 3.4 Notice of Patent Claim (Baker, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                        CIVIL Cover Sheet (Baker, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                          COMPLAINT filed by Smart Options, LLC; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-7629746. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A - 539 Patent, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B - LA Times Article)(Baker, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/08/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 77 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?