Arias et al v. 1 World Trade Center L.L.C. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-00066
District Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 1, 2017 at 10:53 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Lisa-Ann Arias, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Worby Groner Edelman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher R. LoPalo +1 212 267 3700 +1 212 587 0031 clopalo@nkblaw.com
No Logo Paul Arias, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher R. LoPalo +1 212 267 3700 +1 212 587 0031 clopalo@nkblaw.com
v.
No Logo 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 1 WTC Holdings L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 2 World Trade Center LLC, Defendant
No Logo 2 WTC Holdings LLC, Defendant
No Logo 4 World Trade Center LLC, Defendant
No Logo 4 WTC Holding LLC, Defendant
No Logo 5 World Trade Center LLC, Defendant
No Logo 5 WTC Holding LLC, Defendant
No Logo A Russo Wrecking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo ABM, Defendant
No Logo ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Acrow Corporation Of America, Defendant
No Logo AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling LLC., Defendant
No Logo ASG Pest Control, Defendant
No Logo Atc Associates, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Atlantic Heydt Corp., Defendant
No Logo Atlas Concrete Corp., Defendant
No Logo Bacou-Dalloz US Headquarters, Defendant
No Logo Bechtel Associates Professional Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Bechtel Construction, Inc., Defendant
Bechtel Corporation Bechtel Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bergen Concrete Cutting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Berkel & Company Contractors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo BFP One Liberty Plaza Co., L.P., Defendant
No Logo BFP Tower C Co. LLC, Defendant
No Logo Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Boston Properties, Defendant
No Logo Bovis Holdings Limited, Defendant
No Logo Bovis International, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease Interiors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Breeze Carting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Breeze National Inc., Defendant
No Logo Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Defendant
No Logo Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.c., Defendant
No Logo C & D Fireproofing & Plastering Corp., Defendant
No Logo C & D Painting & Decorating, Inc., Defendant
No Logo C.B. Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Canron Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Cantor Seinuk Group, PC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Cantor Seinuk Group"
No Logo Certified Fence Corp., Defendant
No Logo Civetta-Cousins JV, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Component Assembly Systems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Communications Holding Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Development, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Energy, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Solutions, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Coordinated Metals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cord Contracting Co., Defendant
No Logo Craig Test Boring Company Inc., Defendant
No Logo Criticom International Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., Defendant
No Logo D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Defendant
No Logo Dakota Demo-Tech, Defendant
No Logo DCM Erectors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Defendant
No Logo Diego Construction, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Diversified Carting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo DMT Enterprise, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo EJ Davies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo En-Tech Corp., Defendant
No Logo ET Environmental, Defendant
No Logo Evans Environmental, Defendant
No Logo Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), Defendant
No Logo Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Executive Medical Service, P.C, Defendant
No Logo F & G Mechanical, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Felix Equities, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Fleet Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Frank Micelli Jr. Contracting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo FTI Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gilsanz, Murray, & Steficek, LLP., Defendant
No Logo Gino Cracolici & Sons Inc., Defendant
No Logo Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, PLLC., Defendant
No Logo Grace Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hallen Welding Service, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Helmsman Management Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo HGC Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo High Rise Hoisting and Scaffolding, Inc., Defendant
No Logo High-Rise Electric, Inc., Defendant
No Logo HP Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hudson Meridian Construction Group, L.L.C. f/k/a Meridian Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo JP Equipment Rental Materials, Inc., Defendant
Koch Skanska Inc. Koch Skanska Inc., Defendant
No Logo Laquila Construction Inc, Defendant
No Logo LaStrada General Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers P.C., Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc. Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Liberty Mutual Insurance Company"
No Logo Liberty Mutual Managed Care Inc., Defendant
No Logo LIRO, INC, Defendant
No Logo Lockwood Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lucius Pitkin, Inc., Defendant
No Logo LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, Defendant
No Logo M.G. McLaren, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Manafort Brothers, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Manafort Brothers Incorporated"
No Logo Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Ment Bros. Iron Works Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Meridian Construction Group, Defendant
No Logo MG McLaren, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Moody's Investors Service Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Moody's Investors Service"
No Logo Moretrench American Corporation, Defendant
No Logo MRA Engineering, PC, Defendant
No Logo Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Musco Sports Lighting, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Nacirema Industries Incorporated, Defendant
No Logo New York Crane & Equipment Corp., Defendant
No Logo Nicholson Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo NYC Industrial Development Agency, Defendant
No Logo Off Road Welding, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Olympic Plumbing & Heating Corp., Defendant
No Logo Ove Arup & Partners P.C., Defendant
No Logo Parson Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Phillips And Jordan, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pinnacle, Defendant
No Logo Pinnacle Environmental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Plaza Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Plaza Construction Management Corp., Defendant
No Logo Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, Defendant
No Logo Pro Safety Services, Llc, Defendant
No Logo PT & L Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rich-Mark Environmental Services Inc, Defendant
No Logo Rober Silman Associates, Defendant
No Logo Robert Errat, Defendant
No Logo Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rodar Enterprises, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Royal GM, Inc., Defendant
No Logo SAB Trucking Inc., Defendant
No Logo Safeway Environmental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Seasons Industrial Contracting, Defendant
No Logo Semcor Equipment and Manufacturing Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Sheldrake Organization, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Silverite Contracting Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Development Corp., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Facility Manager LLC, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC LLC, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC MGMT Co. LLC., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Properties LLC, Defendant
No Logo Simpson Gumpertz & Heger Inc, Defendant
No Logo Skidmore, Owing & Merrill LLP, Defendant
No Logo Star Delta Electric, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Stier Anderson, LLC., Defendant
No Logo Summit Structures, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Survivair, Defendant
No Logo Taylor Recycling Facility LLC, Defendant
No Logo Telenet Communication Inc., Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"
No Logo Thorton-Tomasetti Group, Inc, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Interiors Corporation, Defendant
Tishman Speyer Properties Tishman Speyer Properties, Defendant
No Logo Tomasetti Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Torretta Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Total Safety Consulting, LLC., Defendant
No Logo Trio Asbestos Removal, Defendant
No Logo Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Tully Construction Co Inc, Defendant
No Logo Tully Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Tully Environmental Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tully Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Turner Construction Co., Defendant
Turner Construction Company Turner Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Turner Construction International, LLC., Defendant
No Logo Tyyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), Defendant
No Logo United States Rebar, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vertical Lend, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vollmer Associates LLP., Defendant
No Logo W HARRIS & SONS INC, Defendant
No Logo Weeks Marine Inc., Defendant
No Logo Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Westfield America, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Westfield WTC Holding LLC, Defendant
No Logo Westfield WTC, LLC, Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower D. Co., LP, Defendant
No Logo Whitney Contracting Inc., Defendant
No Logo Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp, Defendant
No Logo World Trade Center Properties LLC, Defendant
No Logo WSP Cantor Seinuk Group, Defendant
No Logo Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo YONKERS CONTRACTING Company INC., Defendant
No Logo York Hunter Construction, LLC., Defendant
No Logo Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc.,, Defendant
No Logo Bovis Holdings Limited, ADR Provider
No Logo Bovis International, Inc., ADR Provider
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease Interiors, Inc., ADR Provider
No Logo Laquila Construction Inc, ADR Provider
No Logo Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, ADR Provider
City of New York City of New York, ADR Provider
Officially listed as "The City of New York"
Turner Construction Company Turner Construction Company, ADR Provider
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331pi
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSING CASES: On March 16, 2012, Plaintiffs' counsel Worby Groner Edelman & Napoli Bern, LLP moved to dismiss 8,559 cases from the above-captioned master calendars. Defendants in the 21 MC 102 master calendar objected, agreeing that the 8,559 cases should be dismissed, but contending that approximately 276 additional claims should also be terminated. Defendants point out that these additional 276 claims were included in a prior "Notice of Withdrawal of All Claims" ("Notice"), filed by Worby Groner on December 31, 2011. Because defendants do not object to the dismissal of the 8,559 claims, I order them dismissed. Regarding the 276 additional claims, the Notice in which they were included was filed in this Court for the purpose of meeting obligations necessary to participate in the reopened Victims Compensation Fund ("VCF"), pursuant to the James Zadroga Act. Air Transportation Safety and System Stabilization Act, 49 U.S.C. § 40101 Note, Tit. IV § 405(c)(3)(C)(iii). I did not endorse, approve, or deny this Notice. Rule 41(a), Fed. R. Civ. P., provides that a plaintiff may only dismiss a claim without a court order if the opposing party has not filed an answer, or if the stipulation of dismissal is signed by all parties. This was not the case with the Notice, and thus it did not function as a dismissal. If defendants believe any of these 276 additional cases should be dismissed for reasons relevant to this litigation, they may make a motion to do so. The clerk shall close the docket numbers of all cases on Schedule A. ENDORSEMENT: To be read left motion of 3/16/12, endorsed by Order 5/11/12. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/11/2012) (fk) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FINAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT: (THIS STIPULATED ORDER PERTAINS TO ALL PLAINTIFFS AND DOCKET NUMBERS SET FORTH ON EXHIBIT A) IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED Plaintiffs and Settling Defendants have entered into a settlement agreement resolving all claims by Plaintiffs against Settling Defendants in the above-captioned action. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' claims against the Settling Defendants and each of them shall be dismissed, and hereby are dismissed, with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/25/2011) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(tro) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      STIPULATION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the Plaintiffs listed on the attached Schedule A, and the attorneys for defendants BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LP, BFP One Liberty Plaza Co., LLC, BFP Tower C Co. LLC, Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., WFP Tower A Co., LP, WFP Tower B Co., LP and WFP Tower D Co., LP (collectively the "Brookfield Parties") in these actions, that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed, and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of this action, the matters listed on the attached Schedule A are hereby discontinued without prejudice as against the above-named Brookfield Parties only, and without costs to any party... and as further set forth. Relates to All cases listed in Schedule A. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/27/10) (rjm) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
        COMPLAINT BY ADOPTION/CHECK-OFF COMPLAINT Related to the Master Complaint 35 Complaint By Adoption/Check-Off Complaint against HP Environmental, Inc., Koch Skanska, Inc., Lastrada General Contracting Corp, Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers P.C., Liro, Inc., Lockwood, Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Lucius Pitkin, Inc., Dakota Demo-Tech, Diamond Point Excavating Corp., LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, Manafort Brothers Incorporated, Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Moretrench American Corporation, MRA Engineering, PC, Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Nacirema Industries Incorporated, New York Crane & Equipment Corp., Nicholson Construction Company, Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Pinnacle Environmental Corp., Plaza Construction Corp., Pro Safety Services LLC., PT & L Contracting Corp., Rober Silman Associates, Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Rodar Enterprises, Inc., Royal GM, Inc., SAB Trucking Inc., Safeway Environmental Corp., Seasons Industrial Contracting, Semcor Equipment and Manufacturing Corporation, Silverite Contracting Corporation, Simpson Gumpertz & Heger Inc, Skidmore, Owing & Merrill LLP, Survivair, The City of New York, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tishman Speyer Properties, Torretta Trucking, Inc., Total Safety Consulting, L.L.C., Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), Vollmer Associates LLP., Weeks Marine, Inc., Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Whitney Contracting Inc., Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp, Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc., York Hunter Construction, LLC., Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc.,, A Russo Wrecking, Inc., Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, Turner Construction Company, ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc., Laquila Construction Inc, AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling LLC., Bechtel Associates Professional Corporation, Evans Environmental, Executive Medical Service, P.C, Hudson Meridian Construction Group, L.L.C. f/k/a Meridian Construction Corp., Liberty Mutual Group, Phillips and Jordan, Inc., Taylor Recycling Facility LLC., Tishman Interiors Corporation, Thorton-Tomasetti Group, Inc, WSP Cantor Seinuk Group, Atlantic Heydt Corp., Bechtel Construction, Inc., Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Berkel & Company, Contractors, Inc., Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Breeze Carting Corp., Breeze National Inc., Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C., C.B. Contracting Corp., Canron Construction Corp., Certified Fence Corp., Cord Contracting Co., D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Diego Construction, Inc., Diversified Carting, Inc., DMT Enterprise, Inc., Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., EJ Davies, Inc., En-Tech Corp., ET Environmental, Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Fleet Trucking, Inc., Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., FTI Trucking, Inc., Gilsanz, Murray, & Steficek, LLP., Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, PLLC., Hallen Welding Service, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Paul Arias, Lisa-Ann Arias. Related document: 35 Complaint By Adoption/Check-Off Complaint filed by Lisa-Ann Arias, Paul Arias.(di5) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None
          COMPLAINT BY ADOPTION/CHECK-OFF COMPLAINT Related to the Master Complaint 1 Complaint against HP Environmental, Inc., JP Equipment Rental Materials, Inc., Koch Skanska, Inc., Lastrada General Contracting Corp, Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers P.C., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Managed Care Inc., Liro, Inc., Lockwood, Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Lucius Pitkin, Inc., Dakota Demo-Tech, DCM Erectors, Inc., Diamond Point Excavating Corp., LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, M.G. McLaren, P.C., Manafort Brothers Incorporated, Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Ment Bros. Iron Works Co., Inc., Meridian Construction Group, MG McLaren, P.C., Moody's Investors Service, Moretrench American Corporation, MRA Engineering, PC, Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Musco Sports Lighting, LLC, Nacirema Industries Incorporated, New York Crane & Equipment Corp., NYC Industrial Development Agency, Nicholson Construction Company, Off Road Welding, Inc., Olympic Plumbing & Heating Corp., Ove Arup & Partners P.C., Parson Group, Inc., Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Pinnacle, Pinnacle Environmental Corp., Plaza Construction Corp., Plaza Construction Management Corp., Pro Safety Services LLC., PT & L Contracting Corp., Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co, Inc., Rich-Mark Environmental Services Inc, Rober Silman Associates, Robert Errat, Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Rodar Enterprises, Inc., Royal GM, Inc., SAB Trucking Inc., Safeway Environmental Corp., Seasons Industrial Contracting, Semcor Equipment and Manufacturing Corporation, Sheldrake Organization, Inc., Silverite Contracting Corporation, Silverstein Development Corp., Silverstein Properties Inc.,, Silverstein Properties, Silverstein WTC Facility Manager LLC, Silverstein WTC LLC, Silverstein WTC MGMT Co. LLC., Silverstein WTC Properties LLC, Simpson Gumpertz & Heger Inc, Skidmore, Owing & Merrill LLP, Star Delta Electric, Inc., Stier Anderson, LLC., Summit Structures LLC., Survivair, Telenet Communication Inc., The City of New York, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tishman Speyer Properties, Tomasetti Group, Inc., Torretta Trucking, Inc., Total Safety Consulting, L.L.C., Trio Asbestos Removal, Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Tully Construction Co., Inc., 2 World Trade Center LLC, Tully Construction Company, Tully Environmental Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., Turner Construction Co., Turner Construction International, LLC., Tyyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation, Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), United States Rebar, Inc., Vertical Lend Inc., Vollmer Associates LLP., 2 WTC Holdings LLC, W Harris & Sons Inc., Weeks Marine, Inc., Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Westfield America, Inc., Westfield WTC Holding LLC, Westfield WTC, LLC, WFP Tower D. Co., LP, Whitney Contracting Inc., Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp, World Trade Center Properties LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc., York Hunter Construction, LLC., Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc.,, 4 WTC Holding LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 5 WTC Holding LLC, A Russo Wrecking, Inc., Bovis Holdings Limited, Bovis International, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease Interiors, Inc., Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, ABM, Turner Construction Company, ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc., Acrow Corporation of America, Laquila Construction Inc, AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling LLC., ASG Pest Control, ATC Associates, Inc., Atlantic Heydt Corp., Atlas Concrete Corp., Bacou-Dalloz US Headquarters, Bechtel Construction, Inc., Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Bergen Concrete Cutting, Inc., Berkel & Company, Contractors, Inc., BFP One Liberty Plaza Co., L.P., BFP Tower C Co. LLC, Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Boston Properties, Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Breeze Carting Corp., Breeze National Inc., Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C., C & D Fireproofing & Plastering Corp., C & D Painting & Decorating, Inc., C.B. Contracting Corp., Canron Construction Corp., Cantor Seinuk Group, Certified Fence Corp., Civetta-Cousins JV, L.L.C., Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc., Component Assembly Systems, Inc., Consolidated Edison Communications Holding Company, Inc., Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Consolidated Edison Development, Inc., Consolidated Edison Energy, Inc., Consolidated Edison Solutions, Inc., Consolidated Edison, Inc., Coordinated Metals, Inc., Cord Contracting Co., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., Craig Test Boring Company Inc., Criticom International Corporation, Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Diego Construction, Inc., Diversified Carting, Inc., DMT Enterprise, Inc., Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., 1 WTC Holdings L.L.C., EJ Davies, Inc., En-Tech Corp., ET Environmental, Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), Ewell W. Finley, P.C., F & G Mechanical, Inc., Felix Equities, Inc., Fleet Trucking, Inc., Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., Frank Micelli Jr. Contracting, Inc., FTI Trucking, Inc., Gilsanz, Murray, & Steficek, LLP., Gino Cracolici & Sons Inc., Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, PLLC., Grace Industries, Inc., Hallen Welding Service, Inc., Helmsman Management Services, Inc., HGC Contracting Corp., High-Rise Electric, Inc., High Rise Hoisting and Scaffolding, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Paul Arias, Lisa-Ann Arias. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Lisa-Ann Arias, Paul Arias.(di5) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None
            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Paul Arias, Lisa-Ann Arias. (Dubanevich, William) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Paul Arias, Lisa-Ann Arias. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None
                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Service was accepted by Breeze National, Inc.. Document filed by Paul Arias, Lisa-Ann Arias. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None
                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Service was accepted by Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, PLLC. Document filed by Paul Arias, Lisa-Ann Arias. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None
                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Tishman Speyer Properties served on 5/3/2006, answer due 5/23/2006. Service was accepted by J.M. (unreadable). Document filed by Paul Arias; Lisa-Ann Arias. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Service was accepted by Dawn Galente. Document filed by Paul Arias, Lisa-Ann Arias. (Dubanevich, William) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                        STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL... that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the actions, the above actions listed are discontinued without prejudice against -Cushman and Wakefield, Inc.- only, without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation and order. This Document relates to All Cases listed in this document. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/4/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00100-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None
                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Moody's Investors Service served on 5/3/2006, answer due 5/23/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Paul Arias; Lisa-Ann Arias. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: None
                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Lastrada General Contracting Corp served on 5/3/2006, answer due 5/23/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Paul Arias; Lisa-Ann Arias. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 07/20/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: None
                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Laquila Construction Inc served on 5/2/2006, answer due 5/22/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Paul Arias; Lisa-Ann Arias. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 07/20/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: None
                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. High Rise Hoisting and Scaffolding, Inc. served on 5/3/2006, answer due 5/23/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Paul Arias; Lisa-Ann Arias. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, PLLC. served on 5/2/2006, answer due 5/22/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Paul Arias. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Fleet Trucking, Inc. served on 5/3/2006, answer due 5/23/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Paul Arias. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Hallen Welding Service, Inc. served on 4/11/2006, answer due 5/1/2006. Service was accepted by Josh Folger. Document filed by Paul Arias. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. ET Environmental served on 5/3/2006, answer due 5/23/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Paul Arias. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp. served on 5/2/2006, answer due 5/22/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Paul Arias. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Diego Construction, Inc. served on 5/2/2006, answer due 5/22/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Paul Arias. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Whitney Contracting Inc. served on 4/11/2006, answer due 5/1/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Paul Arias. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Cushman & Wakefield, Inc. served on 5/3/2006, answer due 5/23/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Paul Arias. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 07/11/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Turner Construction Company served on 4/11/2006, answer due 5/1/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Paul Arias. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 07/11/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan served on 4/11/2006, answer due 5/1/2006; Tishman Construction Corporation of New York served on 4/11/2006, answer due 5/1/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Paul Arias. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 07/11/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The City of New York served on 3/24/2006, answer due 4/13/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Paul Arias. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Port Authority of New York and New Jersey served on 3/22/2006, answer due 4/11/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Paul Arias. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Bovis Holdings Limited served on 4/11/2006, answer due 5/1/2006; Bovis International, Inc. served on 4/11/2006, answer due 5/1/2006; Bovis Lend Lease Interiors, Inc. served on 4/11/2006, answer due 5/1/2006; Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc. served on 4/11/2006, answer due 5/1/2006; Bovis Lend Lease, Inc. served on 4/11/2006, answer due 5/1/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Paul Arias. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Breeze National Inc. served on 5/3/2006, answer due 5/23/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Paul Arias. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Breeze Carting Corp. served on 5/3/2006, answer due 5/23/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Paul Arias. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 06/27/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Atlantic Heydt Corp. served on 5/2/2006, answer due 5/22/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Paul Arias. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp. served on 5/3/2006, answer due 5/23/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Paul Arias. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Tucci Equipment Rental Corp. served on 5/3/2006, answer due 5/23/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Paul Arias. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/14/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Total Safety Consulting, L.L.C. served on 5/3/2006, answer due 5/23/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Paul Arias. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/14/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Tishman Speyer Properties served on 5/2/2006, answer due 5/22/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Paul Arias. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/14/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Skidmore, Owing & Merrill LLP served on 5/2/2006, answer due 5/22/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Paul Arias. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/14/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York Crane & Equipment Corp. served on 5/3/2006, answer due 5/23/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Paul Arias. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 06/14/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                              COMPLAINT against HP Environmental, Inc., JP Equipment Rental Materials, Inc., Koch Skanska, Inc., Lastrada General Contracting Corp, Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers P.C., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Managed Care Inc., Liro, Inc., Lockwood, Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Lucius Pitkin, Inc., Dakota Demo-Tech, DCM Erectors, Inc., Diamond Point Excavating Corp., LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, M.G. McLaren, P.C., Manafort Brothers Incorporated, Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Ment Bros. Iron Works Co., Inc., Meridian Construction Group, MG McLaren, P.C., Moody's Investors Service, Moretrench American Corporation, MRA Engineering, PC, Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Musco Sports Lighting, LLC, Nacirema Industries Incorporated, New York Crane & Equipment Corp., Nyc Industrial Development Agency, Nicholson Construction Company, Off Road Welding, Inc., Olympic Plumbing & Heating Corp., OVE ARUP & PARTNERS P.C., Parson Group, Inc., Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Pinnacle, Pinnacle Environmental Corp., Plaza Construction Corp., Plaza Construction Management Corp., Pro Safety Services LLC., PT & L Contracting Corp., Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co, Inc., Rich-Mark Environmental Services Inc, Rober Silman Associates, Robert Errat, Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Rodar Enterprises, Inc., Royal GM, Inc., SAB Trucking Inc., Safeway Environmental Corp., Seasons Industrial Contracting, Seasons Industrial Contracting, Semcor Equipment and Manufacturing Corporation, Sheldrake Organization, Inc., Silverite Contracting Corporation, Silverstein Development Corp., Silverstein Properties Inc.,, Silverstein Properties, Silverstein WTC Facility Manager LLC, Silverstein WTC LLC, Silverstein WTC MGMT Co. LLC., Silverstein WTC Properties LLC, Simpson Gumpertz & Heger Inc, Skidmore, Owing & Merrill LLP, Star Delta Electric, Inc., Stier Anderson, LLC., Summit Structures LLC., Survivair, Telenet Communication Inc., The City of New York, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tishman Speyer Properties, Tomasetti Group, Inc., Torretta Trucking, Inc., Total Safety Consulting, L.L.C., Trio Asbestos Removal, Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Tully Construction Co., Inc., 2 World Trade Center LLC, Tully Construction Company, Tully Environmental Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., Turner Construction Co., Turner Construction International, LLC., Tyyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation, Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), United States Rebar, Inc., Vertical Lend Inc., Vollmer Associates LLP., 2 WTC Holdings LLC, W Harris & Sons Inc., Weeks Marine, Inc., Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Westfield America, Inc., Westfield WTC Holding LLC, Westfield WTC, LLC, WFP Tower D. Co., LP, Whitney Contracting Inc., Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp, World Trade Center Properties LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc., York Hunter Construction, LLC., Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc.,, 4 WTC Holding LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 5 WTC Holding LLC, A Russo Wrecking, Inc., ABM, ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc., Acrow Corporation of America, AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling LLC., ASG Pest Control, ATC Associates, Inc., ATC Associates, Inc., Atlantic Heydt Corp., Atlas Concrete Corp., Bacou-Dalloz US Headquarters, Bechtel Construction, Inc., Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Bergen Concrete Cutting, Inc., Berkel & Company, Contractors, Inc., BFP One Liberty Plaza Co., L.P., BFP Tower C Co. LLC, Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Boston Properties, Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Breeze Carting Corp., Breeze National Inc., Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C., C & D Fireproofing & Plastering Corp., C & D Painting & Decorating, Inc., C.B. Contracting Corp., Canron Construction Corp., Cantor Seinuk Group, Certified Fence Corp., Civetta-Cousins JV, L.L.C., Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc., Component Assembly Systems, Inc., Consolidated Edison Communications Holding Company, Inc., Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Consolidated Edison Development, Inc., Consolidated Edison Energy, Inc., Consolidated Edison Solutions, Inc., Consolidated Edison, Inc., Coordinated Metals, Inc., Cord Contracting Co., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., Craig Test Boring Company Inc., Criticom International Corporation, Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Diego Construction, Inc., Diversified Carting, Inc., DMT Enterprise, Inc., Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., 1 WTC Holdings L.L.C., EJ Davies, Inc., En-Tech Corp., ET Environmental, Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), Ewell W. Finley, P.C., F & G Mechanical, Inc., Felix Equities, Inc., Fleet Trucking, Inc., Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., Frank Micelli Jr. Contracting, Inc., FTI Trucking, Inc., Gilsanz, Murray, & Steficek, LLP., Gino Cracolici & Sons Inc., Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, PLLC., Grace Industries, Inc., Hallen Welding Service, Inc., Helmsman Management Services, Inc., HGC Contracting Corp., High-Rise Electric, Inc., High Rise Hoisting and Scaffolding, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 250.00, Receipt Number 565614)Document filed by Paul Arias, Lisa-Ann Arias.(laq, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2006 (mbe, ). (Entered: 01/10/2006)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 154 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?