ENCYCLOPAEDIA BRITANNICA, INC. v. MAGELLAN NAVIGATION, INC.

Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Western District Court, Case No. 3:07-cv-00285
District Judge John C. Shabaz, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge John C. Shabaz
Last Updated January 23, 2017 at 11:06 PM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Encyclopaedia Britannica, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barton Earl Showalter +1 214 953 6500 +1 214 661 4509 bart.showalter@bakerbotts.com

Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John S Skilton +1 608 663 7460 +1 608 663 7499 jskilton@perkinscoie.com
v.
No Logo American Tv & Appliance Of Madison, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED H. Dale Peterson +1 608 257 2281 +1 608 257 7643 hdpeterson@stroudlaw.com
No Logo Inc. Tomtom, Defendant

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A Fussell, III +1 202 626 7713 +1 202 783 2331 fussell@fr.com

Represented by One East Main Street

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Donald Peterson +1 608 257 3911 +1 608 257 0609 jpeterson@gklaw.com
No Logo Magellan Navigation, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Noah Franklin Webster +1 312 469 7065 nwebster@kirkland.com

Represented by Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shane A. Brunner +1 608 257 3501 +1 608 283 2275 sabrunner@michaelbest.com
Attributes
Citation No cause code entered
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
ORDER GRANTING DEFTS. MOT. TO TRANSFER TO WEST. DIST. OF TEXAS; DISMISSING AS MOOT DEFTS. MOT. TO SEVER AND STAY. CC MLD (Entered: 08/31/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
ORDER GRANTING DEFT. TOMTOM UNCONTESTED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CROSSCLAIM OF DEFT.AMERICAN TV.CC MLD (Entered: 08/31/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None
ORDER ADMITTING JAMES AUBREY FUSSELL, III PRO HAC VICE. (Entered: 08/23/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None
ORDER ADMITTING INDRANIL MUKERJI PRO HAC VICE. (Entered: 08/23/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT OF INDRANIL MUKERJI. (Entered: 08/22/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT OF JAMES A. FUSSELL III. (Entered: 08/22/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: None
MOTION TO ADMIT JAMES A. FUSSELL III AND INDRANIL MUKERJI PRO HAC VICE. (Entered: 08/22/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF CROSSCLAIM OF DEFT. AMERICAN TV AGAINST DEFT. MAGELLAN. (Entered: 08/21/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: None
MOTION BY PLTF. FOR LEAVE TO FILE CLARIFICATION OF STATEMENT MADE IN DEFTS. REPLY. (Entered: 08/17/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
BRIEF IN REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS. MOTION TO SEVER DEFT. AMERICAN TV AND TRANSFER VENUE. (Entered: 08/14/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
MOTION (UNCONTESTED) BY DEFT. TOMTOM FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CROSSCLAIM OF DEFT. AMERICAN TV. (Entered: 08/14/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None
ORDER GRANTING UNCONTESTED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CROSSCLAIM. (Entered: 08/10/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
MOTION BY DEFT. TOMTOM (UNCONTESTED) FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CROSSCLAIM. (Entered: 08/06/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION BY PLTF. TO DEFTS. JOINT MOTION TO SEVER AMERICAN TV AND TRANSFER VENUE. (Entered: 08/03/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
ANSWER BY PLTF. TO COUNTERCLAIM OF DEFT. MAGELLAN. (Entered: 07/19/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None
PTC ORDER - DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE 11/1/07. (Entered: 07/18/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: None
CROSSCLAIM OF DEFT. AMERICAN TV. (Entered: 07/17/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: None
ANSWER BY DEFT. AMERICAN TV. (Entered: 07/17/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
PPTC REPORT BY DEFT. AMERICAN TV. (Entered: 07/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
PPTC REPORT BY DEFT. TOMTOM. (Entered: 07/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
PPTC REPORT BY PLTF. (Entered: 07/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
PPTC REPORT BY DEFT. MAGELLAN. (Entered: 07/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT OF NELSON CHAN. (Entered: 07/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT OF JOCELYN VIGREUX. (Entered: 07/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
MOTION (JOINT) BY DEFTS. TO SEVER DEFT. AMERICAN TV AND TRANSFER VENUE. (Entered: 07/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
DISCLOSURE OF CORP. AFFIL. & FINAN. INT. BY DEFT. TOMTOM. (Entered: 07/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
ANSWER BY DEFT. TOMTOM. (Entered: 07/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY ATTY. WEBSTER FOR DEFT. MAGELLAN. (Entered: 07/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY ATTY. KAPPLIN FOR DEFT. MAGELLAN. (Entered: 07/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY ATTY. STEADMAN FOR DEFT. MAGELLAN. (Entered: 07/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY ATTY. GEKAS FOR DEFT. MAGELLAN. (Entered: 07/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY ATTY. STREFF FOR DEFT. MAGELLAN. (Entered: 07/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None
DISCLOSURE OF CORP. AFFIL. & FINAN. INT. BY DEFT. MAGELLAN. (Entered: 06/28/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: None
ORDER (AGREED) GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFT. AMERICAN TV TO FILE AN ANSWER UNTIL 7/17/07. CC MLD (Entered: 06/27/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None
ANSWER BY DEFT. MAGELLAN. (Entered: 06/26/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: None
DISCLOSURE OF CORP. AFFIL. & FINAN. INT. BY DEFT. AMERICAN TV. (Entered: 06/25/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY ATTY. PETERSON FOR DEFT. AMERICAN TV. (Entered: 06/25/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
MOTION (UNOPPOSED) BY DEFT. MAGELLAN FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLTF. COMLAINT. (Entered: 06/25/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None
ORDER ADMITTING DAVID WILLE PRO HAC VICE. (Entered: 06/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None
ORDER ADMITTING BRIAN OAKS PRO HAC VICE. (Entered: 06/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None
ORDER ADMITTING SCOTT PARTRIDGE PRO HAC VICE. (Entered: 06/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None
ORDER ADMITTING BARTON SHOWALTER PRO HAC VICE. (Entered: 06/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None
MOTION TO ADMIT DAVID WILLE PRO HAC VICE. (Entered: 06/19/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None
MOTION TO ADMIT BRIAN OAKS PRO HAC VICE. (Entered: 06/19/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None
MOTION TO ADMIT SCOTT PARTRIDGE PRO HAC VICE. (Entered: 06/19/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None
MOTION TO ADMIT BARTON SHOWALTER PRO HAC VICE. (Entered: 06/19/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: None
SUMMONS (Entered: 06/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: None
DISCLOSURE OF CORP. AFFIL. & FINAN. INT. BY PLTF. (Entered: 05/22/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: None
COMPLAINT - SUMMONS ISSUED. (rep). (Entered: 05/22/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: None
JS-44 (Entered: 05/22/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 50 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?