Jones, et al v. USA, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:00-cv-00230
District Judge Fred Van Sickle, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 1, 2017 at 8:06 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Brake-Guard Ltd, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E Caruso +1 509 323 5210 greyhairbob@hotmail.com
No Logo Ed Jones, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E Caruso +1 509 323 5210 greyhairbob@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ed Jones

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ed Jones
No Logo Ellsworth F Jones, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pamela Jean DeRusha +1 509 353 2767 +4623 462 462 3866 USAWAE.PDeRushaECF@usdoj.gov
v.
Federal Trade Commission Federal Trade Commission, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/08/2000, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pamela Jean DeRusha +1 509 353 2767 +4623 462 462 3866 USAWAE.PDeRushaECF@usdoj.gov
No Logo John 1-100 Does, Defendant
National Highway Traffic Safety Administration National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/08/2000, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pamela Jean DeRusha +1 509 353 2767 +4623 462 462 3866 USAWAE.PDeRushaECF@usdoj.gov
No Logo Southwest Research Institute, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Beemer & Mumma

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/13/2000, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian L Ernst +1 509 324 6411
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/08/2000, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pamela Jean DeRusha +1 509 353 2767 +4623 462 462 3866 USAWAE.PDeRushaECF@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER CLOSING FILE by Chief Judge Fred L. Van Sickle: court is advised case has been settled; DCE directed to close file terminating case COB: 178-54 (cc: all counsel; Commissioner of Patents & Trademarks) (LE) (Entered: 02/02/2001)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER FOR VOLUNTARY NONSUIT by Chief Judge Fred L. Van Sickle terminating party SouthWest Research Institute COB: 177-54 (cc: all counsel) (LE) (Entered: 12/14/2000)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/8/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER by Chief Judge Fred L. Van Sickle granting motion for enlargement of time [26-1] (Plaintiff's response is due on or before November 14, 2000)(cc: all counsel) (KH) (Entered: 12/11/2000)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/8/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER by Chief Judge Fred L. Van Sickle granting motion to dismiss United States of America, Federal Trade Commission, national Highway Traffic Safety Admin With Prejudice [9-1] (cc: all counsel) (KH) (Entered: 12/11/2000)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/8/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER by Chief Judge Fred L. Van Sickle granting motion for Voluntary Nonsuit [29-1] terminating party NHTSA, FTC, party USA COB: 177-34 (cc: all counsel) (KH) (Entered: 12/11/2000)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/8/2000, Entered: None
            MOTION and (Proposed) Order by plaintiff for Voluntary Nonsuit (LE) (Entered: 12/08/2000)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/6/2000, Entered: None
              PROPOSED RECEIVED Order for Dismissal re: stipulation [27-1] submitted by USA (LE) (Entered: 12/07/2000)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/6/2000, Entered: None
                Stipulation by USA for Order For Dismissal of United States of America, Federal Trade Commission, National Highway Traffic Safety Administration With Prejudice (LE) (Entered: 12/07/2000)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/22/2000, Entered: None
                  MOTION & Declaration by plaintiff for enlargement of time (SAP) (Entered: 11/22/2000)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: None
                    PROPOSED RECEIVED Motion & Order for voluntary nonsuit re: motion for dismissal voluntary nonsuit [18-1] submitted by plaintiff Ed Jones, plaintiff Brake-Guard Ltd, defendant South West Research (SAP) (Entered: 11/21/2000)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: None
                      PROPOSED RECEIVED Order granting enlargement of time re: submitted by plaintiff (SAP) (Entered: 11/15/2000)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: None
                        MOTION & Declaration by plaintiffs to shorten time to hear motion to enlarge time for summary jgm response (wooa) (SAP) (Entered: 11/15/2000)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: None
                          MOTION & Declaration by plaintiff to shorten time to hear mtn for dismissal voluntary nonsuit (SAP) Modified on 11/15/2000 (Entered: 11/15/2000)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: None
                            PROPOSED RECEIVED Order re: motion for dismissal voluntary nonsuit [18-1] submitted by plaintiffs (SAP) (Entered: 11/15/2000)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: None
                              Notice by plaintiff of hearing setting motion for dismissal voluntary nonsuit [18-1] (w/o oral argument 11/20/00 ) (SAP) (Entered: 11/15/2000)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: None
                                Declaration of Robert E. Caruso by plaintiffs re motion for dismissal voluntary nonsuit [18-1] (SAP) (Entered: 11/15/2000)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: None
                                  MOTION by plaintiff for dismissal voluntary nonsuit wooa (SAP) (Entered: 11/15/2000)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting enlargement of time by Judge Wm. Fremming Nielsen granting motion to extend time [15-1]; response ddl 11/13/00 (cc: all counsel) (SAP) (Entered: 10/10/2000)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: None
                                      MOTION and Declaration by plaintiff to Shorten Time for Hearing of the Mtn to Enlarge Time (w/o oral arg.; no date set) (LE) (Entered: 10/05/2000)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: None
                                        MOTION and Declaration by plaintiff to extend time (w/o argument; no date set) (LE) Modified on 10/05/2000 (Entered: 10/05/2000)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: None
                                          Declaration of service by plaintiff of: doc #13 (SAP) (Entered: 09/21/2000)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiff Ed Jones, plaintiff Brake-Guard Ltd; Atty Robert E Caruso appearing & ntc of assoc of counsel (Minister Navin Naidu) (SAP) Modified on 09/21/2000 (Entered: 09/21/2000)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: None
                                              Certificate of service by defendant USA, defendant FTC, defendant NHTSA of: docs #9-11 (SAP) (Entered: 09/12/2000)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: None
                                                Notice by defendant USA, defendant FTC, defendant NHTSA of hearing setting motion to dismiss [9-1] (w/o oral argument 4:30 10/27/00 ), setting motion for summary judgment [9-2] (w/o oral argument 4:30 10/27/00 ) (SAP) (Entered: 09/12/2000)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: None
                                                  Memorandum by defendant USA, defendant FTC, defendant NHTSA in support of motion to dismiss [9-1], motion for summary judgment [9-2] (SAP) (Entered: 09/12/2000)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION by defendant NHTSA, defendant FTC, defendant USA to dismiss or in the alternative for summary judgment (SAP) (Entered: 09/12/2000)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant USA, defendant FTC, defendant NHTSA, plaintiff Ellsworth F Jones ; Atty Pamela Jean DeRusha appearing (SAP) (Entered: 08/30/2000)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/23/2000, Entered: None
                                                        SUMMONS/RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant USA, defendant FTC, defendant NHTSA, defendant South West Research (SAP) (Entered: 08/23/2000)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/10/2000, Entered: None
                                                          ANSWER by defendant South West Research (SAP) (Entered: 08/11/2000)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant South West Research; Atty Brian L Ernst appearing (SAP) (Entered: 07/21/2000)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/12/2000, Entered: None
                                                              SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re:complaint [3-1], complaint [1-1]; jury demand (SAP) (Entered: 07/12/2000)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: None
                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT re:complaint [1-1]; jury demand (SAP) (Entered: 07/12/2000)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: None
                                                                  SUMMONS/RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant USA, defendant FTC, defendant NHTSA, defendant South West Research via certified/registered mail (SAP) (Entered: 07/12/2000)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: None
                                                                    COMPLAINT AGAINST THE UNITED STATES, ITS AGENCIES AND CONTRACTORS FOR ULTRA VIRES ACTIONS, VEXATIOUS SANCTIONS AND UNCONSTITUTIONAL RESTRAINTS TO FRUSTRATE, HARASS AND DESTROY LAWFUL AND LEGAL BUSINESS ACTIVITY DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (Summons(es) issued) Fee-status: pd Receipt #: 44820 (RF) (Entered: 07/07/2000)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 17 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?