Application of City of Almaty for Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782

Federal Court Proceeding New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:16-mc-00623
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 25, 2017 at 6:05 PM EST (8.2 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo RPM USA, LLC, Respondent

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/18/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward M. Spiro +1 212 880 9460 +1 212 856 9494 espiro@magislaw.com

Represented by Hoguet Newman Regal & Kenney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Patrick Curley +1 212 689 8808 +1 212 689 5101 jcurley@hnrklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Joseph Kenney +1 212 689 8808 +1 212 689 5101 jkenney@hrklaw.com

Represented by Morvillo, Abramowitz, Grand, Iason, Anello & Bohrer, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/18/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elkan Abramowitz +1 212 856 9600 +1 212 856 9494 eabramowitz@magislaw.com
No Logo RPM-Maro LLC, Respondent

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/18/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward M. Spiro +1 212 880 9460 +1 212 856 9494 espiro@magislaw.com

Represented by Hoguet Newman Regal & Kenney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Patrick Curley +1 212 689 8808 +1 212 689 5101 jcurley@hnrklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Joseph Kenney +1 212 689 8808 +1 212 689 5101 jkenney@hrklaw.com

Represented by Morvillo, Abramowitz, Grand, Iason, Anello & Bohrer, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/18/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elkan Abramowitz +1 212 856 9600 +1 212 856 9494 eabramowitz@magislaw.com
Other Parties
No Logo Application of City of Almaty for Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782, In Re

Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Manuel A Abascal +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 1863 manny.abascal@lw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie R F Gerchik +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763 julie.gerchik@lw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert John Malionek +1 212 906 1816 +1 212 751 4864 robert.malionek@lw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Schindler +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763 david.schindler@lw.com
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 27 Letter MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Application of City of Almaty for Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I) (Schindler, David) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Attorney Fees
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Status Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Status Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY in Support re 18 MOTION to Vacate the Court's Ex Parte Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782 and to Quash the Pending Subpoenas filed by RPM USA, LLC, RPM-Maro LLC. (Spiro, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 18 MOTION to Vacate the Court's Ex Parte Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782 and to Quash the Pending Subpoenas filed on behalf of Applicant City of Almaty filed by RPM USA, LLC, RPM-Maro LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Julie R. F. Gerchik, # 2 Exhibit A to E to Declaration of Julie R. F. Gerchik, # 3 Exhibit F (Part 1) to Declaration of Julie R. F. Gerchik, # 4 Exhibit F (Part 2) to Declaration of Julie R. F. Gerchik) (Spiro, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Vacate the Court's Ex Parte Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782 and to Quash the Pending Subpoenas by RPM USA, LLC, RPM-Maro LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Edward M. Spiro, # 3 Exhibit A to R to Declaration of Edward M. Spiro) (Spiro, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter by RPM USA, LLC, RPM-Maro LLC (Spiro, Edward) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel A. Abascal on behalf of Application of City of Almaty for Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 (notification declined or already on case) (Abascal, Manuel) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Schindler on behalf of Application of City of Almaty for Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 (notification declined or already on case) (Schindler, David) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Julie R. F. Gerchik on behalf of Application of City of Almaty for Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 (notification declined or already on case) (Gerchik, Julie) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Attorneys Julie Gerchik, Esq., Manuel Abascal, Esq., and David Schindler, Esq. are permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By April 21, 2016, Ms. Gerchik, Mr. Abascal, and Mr. Schindler shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Ms. Gerchik, Mr. Abascal, and Mr. Schindler shall file notices of appearance and ensure that they receive electronic notification of activity in this case. Ms. Gerchik, Mr. Abascal, and Mr. Schindler shall also ensure that the $150 admission fees are submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 4/14/2016. (Smerd, Jocelyn) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Response to Discovery Request
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Response to Discovery Request
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Letters Rogatory
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by Application of City of Almaty for Order to Take Discovery Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Ex Parte Application, # 2 Exhibit B to Ex Parte Application, # 3 Exhibit C to Ex Parte Application, # 4 Exhibit D to Ex Parte Application, # 5 Memorandum in Support, # 6 Declaration, # 7 Exhibit A to Declaration, # 8 Exhibit B to Declaration, # 9 Exhibit C to Declaration, # 10 Exhibit D to Declaration, # 11 Exhibit E to Declaration, # 12 Exhibit F to Declaration, # 13 Exhibit G to Declaration, # 14 Exhibit H to Declaration, # 15 Exhibit I to Declaration, # 16 Exhibit J to Declaration, # 17 Exhibit K to Declaration, # 18 Exhibit L to Declaration, # 19 Exhibit M to Declaration, # 20 Exhibit N to Declaration, # 21 Exhibit O to Declaration, # 22 Exhibit P to Declaration, # 23 Exhibit Q to Declaration, # 24 Exhibit R to Declaration, # 25 Exhibit S to Declaration, # 26 Misc. Case Information Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 60 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?