Royal Street Communications, LLC v. Leap Wireless International, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:07-cv-00308
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 25, 2016 at 12:40 PM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Royal Street Communications, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerald Thomas Welch +1 214 259 0901 +1 214 259 0910 gwelch@sonnenschein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1900

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Christopher Nelson +1 214 259 0901 +1 214 259 0910 mark.nelson@snrdenton.com
v.
No Logo Cricket Communications, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brooke Ashley-May Taylor +1 206 516 3880 +1 206 516 3883 btaylor@susmangodfrey.com
No Logo Leap Wireless International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brooke Ashley-May Taylor +1 206 516 3880 +1 206 516 3883 btaylor@susmangodfrey.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER transferring case to U.S. District Judge T.John Ward in Marshall . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/9/07. (mjc ) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None
    Case transferred in from District of Middle Florida; Case Number 8:06cv1754. Original file with documents numbered 1-64 available on-line; certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received, filed by Royal Street Communications, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint# 2 Civil Cover Sheet # 3 MDFL Docket Sheet# 4 MDFL Cover Letter)(mjc ) (Entered: 07/06/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 33 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?