Hewlett-Packard Company v. Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Western District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-00491
District Judge Lee Yeakel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 2, 2017 at 6:17 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Hewlett-Packard Company Hewlett-Packard Company, Plaintiff
Unknown Role, Navisite, Inc.
Unknown Role, E-cruiter.com Inc.
Unknown Role, Novadigm, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan D Albright +1 512 494 3620 +1 512 472 9123 alan.albright@bracewelllaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry Kenneth Shelton +1 512 375 4907 +1 512 479 6745 barry.shelton@pillsburylaw.com
v.
No Logo Does 1 - 10, Defendant
No Logo Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hewlett-Packard Company (Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER GRANTING 16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint; Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC answer due 9/27/2013. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
          Fifth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER GRANTING 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint; Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC answer due 9/20/2013. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
              Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER GRANTING 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint; Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC answer due 9/13/2013. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                  Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER GRANTING 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint; Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC answer due 9/6/2013. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint; Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC answer due 8/7/2013. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 07/05/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hewlett-Packard Company. Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC served on 6/17/2013, answer due 7/8/2013. (Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
                              Summons Issued as to Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (kkc) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
                                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
                                  RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
                                    Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office with copy of complaint. (jmw) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
                                      RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
                                        COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-5601562). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 26 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?