Fromm Group, Inc. v. Mattel, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Western District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-00952
District Judge William M. Skretny, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 5:32 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Fromm Group Inc.,, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip B. Abramowitz +1 716 853 1111 +1 716 847 2924 pabramowit@aol.com
Mattel, Inc. Mattel, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg Segalla LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Freedenberg +1 716 566 5400 +1 716 566 5401 jfreedenberg@goldbergsegalla.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil A. Goldberg +1 716 566 5400 +1 716 566 5401 ngoldberg@goldbergsegalla.com
v.
Mattel, Inc. Mattel, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg Segalla LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Freedenberg +1 716 566 5400 +1 716 566 5401 jfreedenberg@goldbergsegalla.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil A. Goldberg +1 716 566 5400 +1 716 566 5401 ngoldberg@goldbergsegalla.com
No Logo Fromm Group Inc.,, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip B. Abramowitz +1 716 853 1111 +1 716 847 2924 pabramowit@aol.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None
TEXT ORDER. The 32 Stipulation of Discontinuance is HEREBY SO ORDERED. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close this case. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny U.S.D.J. on 3/30/2009. (MEAL) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by Mattel, Inc.. (Freedenberg, John) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
      TEXT ORDER: The Status Conference scheduled to be held with the Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. at 418 U.S. Courthouse, Buffalo, New York on 8/19/2008 at 10:00 AM has been rescheduled to 2/19/2009 at 10:00 AM. SO ORDERED. Issued by the Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr on 8/14/08. (LMG) (Entered: 08/14/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
        TEXT ORDER: The Status Conference scheduled to be held with the Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. on 8/12/2008 at 10:00 AM has been rescheduled to 8/19/2008 at 10:00 AM. SO ORDERED. Issued by the Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr on 6/17/08. (LMG) (Entered: 06/17/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None
          TEXT ORDER: The Status Conference scheduled to be held with the Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. on 2/7/2008 at 10:00 AM has been rescheduled to 8/12/2008 at 10:00 AM. SO ORDERED. Issued by the Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. on 2/6/08. (LMG) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: None
            TEXT ORDER: The Status Conference scheduled to be held with the Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. on 10/4/2007 at 10:00 AM has been rescheduled to 2/7/2008 at 10:00 AM. SO ORDERED. Issued by the Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 10/2/07. (LMG) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None
              TEXT ORDER: The Status Conference scheduled to be held with the Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. at 418 U.S. Courthouse, Buffalo, New York on 9/20/2007 at 10:00 AM has been rescheduled by the Court to 10/4/2007 at 10:00 AM. SO ORDERED. Issued by the Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 9/17/07. (LMG) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: None
                TEXT ORDER: The Status Conference scheduled to be held with the Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. on 3/19/2007 at 11:00 AM has been rescheduled to 9/20/2007 at 10:00 AM. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 3/19/07. (LMG) (Entered: 03/19/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: None
                  TEXT ORDER: The status conference scheduled to be held with the Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. on 1/4/2007 at 11:00 AM has been rescheduled to 3/19/2007 at 11:00 AM. SO ORDERED. Issued by the Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 1/3/07. (LMG) (Entered: 01/03/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: None
                    TEXT ORDER: A status conference shall be held with the Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. at 418 U.S. Courthouse, Buffalo, New York on 1/4/2007 at 11:00 AM. SO ORDERED. Issued by the Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 10/23/06. (LMG) (Entered: 10/23/2006)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: None
                      TEXT ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/16/2006 10:00 AM before Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. Issued by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 4/27/06. (LMG) (Entered: 04/27/2006)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr.: Status Conference held on 4/27/2006. Scheduled further status conference for 10/16/2006 at 10:00 a.m. Order to be issued. (LMG) (Entered: 04/27/2006)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: None
                          TEXT ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/27/2006 03:00 PM before Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. at 418 U.S. Courthouse, Buffalo, New York. Issued by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 4/10/06. (LMG) (Entered: 04/10/2006)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None
                            STIPULATION Protective Order by Mattel, Inc., Mattel, Inc.. (Freedenberg, John) (Entered: 12/17/2004)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                              STIPULATION AND ORDER granting 11 Motion to Stay and 17 Consent Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 11/22/04. (LMG) (Entered: 11/22/2004)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: None
                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mattel, Inc. re 17 Consent MOTION to Stay re 11 MOTION to Stay (Freedenberg, John) (Entered: 11/19/2004)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: None
                                  Consent MOTION to Stay re 11 MOTION to Stay by Mattel, Inc..(Freedenberg, John) (Entered: 11/19/2004)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None
                                    ORDER: Responses to 11 defendant's motion to stay proceedings due by 11/19/2004; Replies due by 12/3/2004; Oral Argument set for 12/13/2004 02:00 PM before Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 11/01/04.(LMG) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: None
                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mattel, Inc., Mattel, Inc. re 13 Declaration, 14 Memorandum in Support, 11 MOTION to Stay, 12 Declaration (Freedenberg, John) (Entered: 10/25/2004)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: None
                                        MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 11 MOTION to Stay byMattel, Inc., Mattel, Inc.. (Freedenberg, John) (Entered: 10/25/2004)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: None
                                          DECLARATION signed by Peter Lewe re 11 MOTION to Stay filed by Mattel, Inc., Mattel, Inc.. (Freedenberg, John) (Entered: 10/25/2004)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: None
                                            DECLARATION signed by Charles H. DeVoe re 11 MOTION to Stay filed by Mattel, Inc., Mattel, Inc.. (Freedenberg, John) (Entered: 10/25/2004)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: None
                                              MOTION to Stay by Mattel, Inc., Mattel, Inc.. (Freedenberg, John) (Entered: 10/25/2004)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Compliance with Rule 26(a)(1) requirements to be accomplished by 8/31/2004; Motions to join parties/amend pleadings due 9/30/2004; Fact depositions to be completed by 2/28/2005; Plaintiff's expert witness ID due by 3/31/2005; Defendant's expert witness ID due by 5/2/2005; Expert depositions to be completed by 7/2/2005; Discovery to be completed by 7/29/2005; Pretrial Conference set for 3/7/2005 10:00 AM before Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr.; Plaintiff's formal written settlement demand due 2/11/2005; Defendant's written response due 2/28/2005; Settlement conference set for 8/2/2005 10:00 AM before Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr.; Dispositive motions due by 9/9/2005; Pretrial statements due by 10/7/2005; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2005 09:00 AM before Hon. William M. Skretny; Jury Trial set for 1/24/2006 09:30 AM before Hon. William M. Skretny. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 08/06/04. (Attachments: # 1) (LMG) Modified on 8/9/2004 (JMD, ). (Entered: 08/06/2004)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr.: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 8/6/2004. Established dates for issuance of Case Management Order. (LMG) (Entered: 08/06/2004)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                    ORDER OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Preliminary Pretrial Conferenceset for 8/6/2004 10:00 AM before Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 07/14/04. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3) (LMG) (Entered: 07/14/2004)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                      STIPULATION and ORDER, to held in abeyance discovery and all other proceedings in this action pending the forthcoming determination by the US Patent and Trademark Office with respect to defendants request for re-examination of patent No. 5,640,859 filed 2/12/3. signed by USMJ H. K. Schroeder Jr. . Notice and copy of order sent to Philip B. Abramowitz, John P. Freedenberg, Neil A. Goldberg . (JMD) (Entered: 03/03/2003)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Fromm Group, Inc re: [5-1] counterclaim answer (JMD) (Entered: 02/13/2003)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                          ANSWER by Fromm Group, Inc. to [2-2] counter claim by Mattel, Inc. (JMD) (Entered: 02/13/2003)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                            ORDER, set Pretrial Conference for 2:00pm on 3/18/03. ( signed by USMJ H. K. Schroeder Jr. ) Notice and copy of order sent to Philip B. Abramowitz, John P. Freedenberg, Neil A. Goldberg (JMD) (Entered: 02/05/2003)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to USMJ H. K. Schroeder Jr. for all pretrial matters and for hearing and disposition of all NON-DISPOSITIVE Motions for the consideration of the District Judge. ( signed by USDJ William M. Skretny ) Notice and copy sent to Philip B. Abramowitz, John P. Freedenberg, Neil A. Goldberg . (JMD) (Entered: 02/03/2003)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                ANSWER to Complaint; jury demand and COUNTERCLAIM by Mattel, Inc. (Atty. John P. Freedenberg, Neil A. Goldberg) against Fromm Group, Inc. (JMD) (Entered: 01/24/2003)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                  COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150. RECEIPT # 94054 (JMD) (Entered: 12/31/2002)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 91 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?