Dawes v. City Of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-01303

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 17, 2019 at 2:05 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Durven Dawes, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Durven Dawes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Durven Dawes
v.
City of New York City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Corporation Counsel for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amanda Shoffel +1 732 856 7674 ashoffel@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Det. Chess, Defendant
No Logo Det. Guevara, Defendant
No Logo Det. Scheinblum, Defendant
No Logo JOHN AND JANE DOE 1 TO 10, Defendant
Officially listed as "John and Jane Doe"
No Logo Lt. Charles Hyland, Defendant
No Logo P.O. James Romano, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Corporation Counsel for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amanda Shoffel +1 732 856 7674 ashoffel@law.nyc.gov
No Logo P.O. Lee, Defendant
No Logo UC Undercover Police Officer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Corporation Counsel for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Shield #279 Amanda Shoffel +1 732 856 7674 ashoffel@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      AMENDED COMPLAINT; re: amending 2 Complaint against City Of New York, P.O. James Romano, UC Undercover Police Officer, Charles Hyland, Det. Chess, Det. Guevara, P.O. Lee, Det. Scheinblum with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Durven Dawes. Related document: 2 Complaint filed by Durven Dawes.(sc) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court having held a case management conference on October 5, 2016, with Plaintiff proceeding pro se and counsel for the defendants, it is hereby ORDERED, as stated at the conference, that: Counsel for defendant City of New York (the "City") is directed to make continued efforts to determine if any videotape or photographs of Plaintiff's arrest currently exist and, if any can be located, to produce copies to Plaintiff. Fact Discovery due by 1/31/2017. Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 10/6/2016) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (kko) Modified on 10/11/2016 (kko). (Entered: 10/06/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court having held a case management conference on August 31, 2016, with Plaintiff proceeding pro se and counsel for the defendants, it is hereby ORDERED, as stated at the conference, that: 1. No later than September 14, 2016, Defendant shall provide to Plaintiff: a. the identities of all officers who participated in the buy-and-bust operation described in Plaintiff's Complaint, including all officers believed to have been involved, in any way, in Plaintiff's arrest and subsequent booking, and b. copies of any existing video recording of Plaintiff's arrest, as well as of his treatment by police officers at or near the time of his arrest, taken from any cameras operated or controlled by the City of New York, in the vicinity of Plaintiff's arrest (i.e., in or near Washington Square Park). 2. The Court will hold a follow-up case management conference on October 5, 2016, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 17A, at the U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York NY 10007. Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 9/9/2016) Copies Sent by Chambers. (mro) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint served. P.O. James Romano served on 7/11/2016, answer due 8/1/2016. Service was accepted by Detective Byrne. Document filed by Durven Dawes. (sc) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/21/2016) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ama) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ANSWER to 2 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by City Of New York.(Shoffel, Amanda) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint served. City Of New York served on 6/15/2016, answer due 7/6/2016. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck, Office Clerk. Document filed by Durven Dawes. (sc) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting 6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time.Granted. Defendants shall provide Plaintiff with the names of any remaining John Doe officers by July 11, 2016. Copy mailed to pro se party by chambers. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) Copies of Notice of Electronic Filing Mailed By Chambers. (Oetken, J.) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Identify John Does, with Service Address of Undercover Officer Shield 279 addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Amanda C. Shoffel dated May 10, 2016. Document filed by City Of New York, P.O. James Romano, UC Undercover Police Officer.(Shoffel, Amanda) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER OF SERVICE: By order dated March 8, 2016, the Court granted Plaintiffs request to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to send USM-285 forms for the City of New York and P.O. James Romano, Shield # 1748, to Plaintiff so that these defendants may be served. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order and the complaint to New York City Law Department at: 100 Church Street, New York, New York 10007. An Amended Civil Rights Complaint form is attached to this order. SO ORDERED. USM-285 Form due by 4/11/2016. Request for Issuance of Summons due by 4/11/2016. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/11/2016) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ama) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/8/2016) (vj) (Entered: 03/09/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None
                            COMPLAINT against City Of New York, John and Jane Doe, P.O. James Romano, UC Undercover Police Officer. Document filed by Durven Dawes.(sjo) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None
                              REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Durven Dawes.(sjo) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 378 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?