Armstead v. Clinton et al
Federal Court Proceeding Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 3:16-mc-00011

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 10, 2017 at 11:49 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Brenda C. Armstead, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brenda C Armstead

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brenda C Armstead
v.
Clinton, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Hillary Rodham, Defendant
Officially listed as "Hillary Clinton"
No Logo Jeb Bush, Defendant
No Logo Ted Cruz, Defendant
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Transfer Case
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None
        PETITION to transfer case by Brenda C. Armstead. (AET) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 14 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?