KAYE v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-00485

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 9, 2017 at 12:03 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALLEN E KAYE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Bruce Egert

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael E. Piston +1 248 524 1936 +1 248 680 0627 michaelpiston4@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Uscis, Defendant
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Complaint
        LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 31 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?