John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. v. Pace Electronics, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:10-cv-00064
District Judge Michael J. Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2019 at 4:54 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/13/2011, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beata Gocyk-Farber +1 212 554 1421 +1 212 554 1448 Beata@blbglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/01/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael E Florey +1 612 337 2505 florey@fr.com
TERMINATED: 03/01/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A Gerasimow +1 612 337 5070 +1 612 288 9696 gerasimow@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J Gilbertson +1 612 373 8333 +1 612 373 0929 bgilbertson@greeneespel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hiscock & Barclay, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Donald Cook +1 315 425 2885 +1 315 703 7353 jcook@hblaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn Daley Cornish +1 315 425 2737 +1 315 425 8585 kcornish@hblaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas John Nash +1 315 425 2828 +1 315 703 7364 dnash@hiscockbarclay.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder dsullivan@hblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Maschoff Brennan Laycock Gilmore Israelsen & Wright, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/16/2011, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles J. Veverka +1 435 252 1360 cveverka@mabr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Workman Nydegger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/16/2011, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Aycock +1 801 533 9800 +1 801 328 1707 Raycock@wnlaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/16/2011, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sterling Arthur Brennan +1 949 394 0445 +1 801 328 1707 sbrennan@wnlaw.com
No Logo Pace Electronics, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carmody & Torrance, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Yeiser Boyd PHV +1 203 784 3114 +1 203 784 3199 bboyd@carmodylaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Horvack, Jr. +1 203 784 3120 +1 203 784 3199 jhorvack@carmodylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Davidson Law Firm, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Darwin Davidson, Jr. +1 501 374 9977 +1 501 374 5917 darwind@arkansas.net
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E Fahr, Jr. +1 501 374 9977 +1 501 374 5917 bobf@dlf-ar.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins Kaplan Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald J Schutz +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 rjschutz@rkmc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mathew John Yang +1 612 349 0146 +1 612 339 4181 mjyang@rkmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE BRAD HENDRICKS LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd W. Kitchens, III +1 501 221 0444 tkitchens@bradhendricks.com
No Logo Perfect 10 Antenna Company, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carmody & Torrance, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Yeiser Boyd PHV +1 203 784 3114 +1 203 784 3199 bboyd@carmodylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Horvack, Jr. +1 203 784 3120 +1 203 784 3199 jhorvack@carmodylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Davidson Law Firm, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Darwin Davidson, Jr. +1 501 374 9977 +1 501 374 5917 darwind@arkansas.net
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E Fahr, Jr. +1 501 374 9977 +1 501 374 5917 bobf@dlf-ar.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins Kaplan Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald J Schutz +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 rjschutz@rkmc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mathew John Yang +1 612 349 0146 +1 612 339 4181 mjyang@rkmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE BRAD HENDRICKS LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd W. Kitchens, III +1 501 221 0444 tkitchens@bradhendricks.com
v.
No Logo Pace Electronics, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carmody & Torrance, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Yeiser Boyd PHV +1 203 784 3114 +1 203 784 3199 bboyd@carmodylaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Horvack, Jr. +1 203 784 3120 +1 203 784 3199 jhorvack@carmodylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Davidson Law Firm, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Darwin Davidson, Jr. +1 501 374 9977 +1 501 374 5917 darwind@arkansas.net
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E Fahr, Jr. +1 501 374 9977 +1 501 374 5917 bobf@dlf-ar.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nichols Kaster, PLLP-Minneapolis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brock J Specht +1 612 256 3292 +1 612 338 4878 bspecht@nka.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins Kaplan Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald J Schutz +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 rjschutz@rkmc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mathew John Yang +1 612 349 0146 +1 612 339 4181 mjyang@rkmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE BRAD HENDRICKS LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd W. Kitchens, III +1 501 221 0444 tkitchens@bradhendricks.com
No Logo Perfect 10 Antenna Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carmody & Torrance, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Yeiser Boyd PHV +1 203 784 3114 +1 203 784 3199 bboyd@carmodylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Horvack, Jr. +1 203 784 3120 +1 203 784 3199 jhorvack@carmodylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Davidson Law Firm, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Darwin Davidson, Jr. +1 501 374 9977 +1 501 374 5917 darwind@arkansas.net
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E Fahr, Jr. +1 501 374 9977 +1 501 374 5917 bobf@dlf-ar.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nichols Kaster, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brock J Specht +1 612 256 3292 +1 612 338 4878 bspecht@nka.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins Kaplan Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald J Schutz +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 rjschutz@rkmc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mathew John Yang +1 612 349 0146 +1 612 339 4181 mjyang@rkmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE BRAD HENDRICKS LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd W. Kitchens, III +1 501 221 0444 tkitchens@bradhendricks.com
No Logo John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/13/2011, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beata Gocyk-Farber +1 212 554 1421 +1 212 554 1448 Beata@blbglaw.com
TERMINATED: 06/13/2011, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beata Gocyk-Farber +1 212 554 1421 +1 212 554 1448 Beata@blbglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/01/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael E Florey +1 612 337 2505 florey@fr.com
TERMINATED: 03/01/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael E Florey +1 612 337 2505 florey@fr.com
TERMINATED: 03/01/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A Gerasimow +1 612 337 5070 +1 612 288 9696 gerasimow@fr.com
TERMINATED: 03/01/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A Gerasimow +1 612 337 5070 +1 612 288 9696 gerasimow@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J Gilbertson +1 612 373 8333 +1 612 373 0929 bgilbertson@greeneespel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J Gilbertson +1 612 373 8333 +1 612 373 0929 bgilbertson@greeneespel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hiscock & Barclay, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Donald Cook +1 315 425 2885 +1 315 703 7353 jcook@hblaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Donald Cook +1 315 425 2885 +1 315 703 7353 jcook@hblaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn Daley Cornish +1 315 425 2737 +1 315 425 8585 kcornish@hblaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn Daley Cornish +1 315 425 2737 +1 315 425 8585 kcornish@hblaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas John Nash +1 315 425 2828 +1 315 703 7364 dnash@hiscockbarclay.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas John Nash +1 315 425 2828 +1 315 703 7364 dnash@hiscockbarclay.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder dsullivan@hblaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder dsullivan@hblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Maschoff Brennan Laycock Gilmore Israelsen & Wright, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/16/2011, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles J. Veverka +1 435 252 1360 cveverka@mabr.com
TERMINATED: 03/16/2011, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles J. Veverka +1 435 252 1360 cveverka@mabr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Workman Nydegger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/16/2011, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Aycock +1 801 533 9800 +1 801 328 1707 Raycock@wnlaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/16/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Aycock +1 801 533 9800 +1 801 328 1707 Raycock@wnlaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/16/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sterling Arthur Brennan +1 949 394 0445 +1 801 328 1707 sbrennan@wnlaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/16/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sterling Arthur Brennan +1 949 394 0445 +1 801 328 1707 sbrennan@wnlaw.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (164) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Civil-8th Circuit Pre-Hearing Conference Notice, # 2 Civil Notice - appeal)(MMP) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/12/12. (KMW) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company re 161 Stipulation of Dismissal (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
        STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
          REQUEST - Amended Request for Claim Construction Hearing and Joint Claim Construction Chart by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sullivan, Denis) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 108 is DENIED. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 7/22/11. (GRR) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              SEVENTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/2/2011. Motions (non-disp) due 12/9/2011. Motions (disp) due by 2/24/2012. Ready for trial due by 3/26/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 7/21/11. Modified on 7/22/2011 (TSS). (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                STIPULATION re 152 Scheduling Order to Modify Scheduling Deadlines by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
                  AMENDED MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Lloyd Kitchens by Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Specht, Brock) Modified on 6/14/2011 (MMC). (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Denis J. Sullivan by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Kathryn Daley Cornish by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None
                        DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - replaced by doc. #156. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Lloyd Kitchens by Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Specht, Brock) Modified on 6/14/2011 (MMC). (Entered: 06/13/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                          SIXTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/19/2011. Motions (non-disp) due 8/26/2011. Motions (disp) due by 10/26/2011. Ready for trial due by 12/5/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 5/11/11. (RLR) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                            JOINT STIPULATION TO MODIFY DEADLINES by all parties. (Boyd, Brian) Modified text on 5/10/2011 (MMP). (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. A total of 1 transcripts are associated with this filing. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 03/11/2011 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. (49 pages). Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 4/13/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2011. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (Simpson, Lori) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                  DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. A total of 1 transcripts are associated with this filing. (Simpson, Lori) Modified text on 3/23/2011 (MMP). (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.. (Cook, John) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis: Motion Hearing held on 3/11/2011 re 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Pace Electronics, Inc. and Perfect 10 Antenna Company. Motion was moved, argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/3/2011. Motions (non-disp) due 6/10/2011. Motions (disp) due by 8/26/2011. Ready for trial due by 9/26/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 2/18/11. (RLR) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                            STIPULATION -- Joint Stipulation to Modify Deadlines by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc., Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Florey, Michael) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Douglas J. Nash by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.. (Florey, Michael) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for John D. Cook by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.. (Florey, Michael) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Susan Richard Nelson recused. Case reassigned back to Chief Judge Michael J. Davis for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 10cv64 MJD/JJG. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 1/13/2011. (JME) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the elevation of Judge Susan Richard Nelson, this case is reassigned to her. Chief Judge Michael J. Davis no longer assigned to the case. (MGV) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      NOTICE to Attorneys: The hearing on the motion for summary judgment has been rescheduled for March 11, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis in ST. PAUL FEDERAL COURTHOUSE IN THE DEVITT COURTROOM. (KMW) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/18/2011. Motions (non-disp) due 2/25/2011. Motions (disp) due by 4/28/2011. Ready for trial due by 6/9/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 12/1/10. (RLR) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Horvack, John) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                            STIPULATION to Modify Deadlines (Joint) by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc., Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Aycock, Robert) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER EXTENDING THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 133 Stipulation filed by Pace Electronics, Inc. and Perfect 10 Antenna Company. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 11/17/10. (KMW) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                STIPULATION re 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment to extend deadline for reply by all parties. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boyd, Brian) Modified text on 11/16/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  Declaration of Robert E. Aycock in Support of 127 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,, filed by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-416 PAtent, # 2 Exhibit(s) B-Dictionary, # 3 Exhibit(s) C-Dictionary, # 4 Exhibit(s) D-Dictionary, # 5 Exhibit(s) E-Dictionary, # 6 Exhibit(s) F-Dictionary, # 7 Exhibit(s) G-USPTO Office Action, # 8 Exhibit(s) H-USPTO Office Action, # 9 Exhibit(s) I-PPC Claim Chart, # 10 Exhibit(s) J-194 Patent, # 11 Exhibit(s) K-248 Patent)(Aycock, Robert) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of C.J. Veverka in Support re 127 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,. (Veverka, C) Modified text on 11/15/2010 (lph). (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      DECLARATION of Alan Williams re 127 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.. (Aycock, Robert) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        DECLARATION of Noah Montena re 127 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.. (Aycock, Robert) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          DECLARATION of Charles Eldering, Ph.D. re 127 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.. (Aycock, Robert) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.. DOCUMENTS FILED IN ERROR- EXHIBITS SHOULD NOT BE ATTACHED TO MEMO // (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert E. Aycock, # 2 Exhibit(s) A to Decl.-416 Patent, # 3 Exhibit(s) B to Decl.-Dictionary, # 4 Exhibit(s) C to Decl.-Dictionary, # 5 Exhibit(s) D to Decl.-Dictionary, # 6 Exhibit(s) E to Decl.-Dictionary, # 7 Exhibit(s) F to Decl.-Dictionary, # 8 Exhibit(s) G to Decl.-Office Action, # 9 Exhibit(s) H to Decl.-Office Action, # 10 Exhibit(s) I to Decl.-PPC Claim Chart, # 11 Exhibit(s) J to Decl.-194 Patent, # 12 Exhibit(s) K to Decl.-248 Patent, # 13 Certificate of Service, # 14 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Aycock, Robert) Modified text on 11/15/2010 (lph). (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              THIRD AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. For issues on which a party has the burden of persuasion, the parties shall disclose the identities of their experts on or before January 17, 2011 and shall serve those experts reports, consistent with Rule 26(a)(2)(B), by February 18, 2011. 2. Rebuttal experts reports, consistent with Rule 26(a)(2) (B), shall be served on or before March 25, 2011. 3. Expert discovery, and any nondispositive motions relating to expert discovery, shall be completed on or before April 22, 2011. 4. Except where expressly superseded through this order, all prior operative pretrial scheduling orders shall have full force and effect. (Discovery due by 4/22/2011.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 11/02/2010. (LMB) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER denying 114 Motion to Stay Discovery. Oral ruling from the bench by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 10/26/2010. (LMB) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham: Motion Hearing held on 10/26/2010 re 114 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Decision on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company. BY ORAL RULING FROM THE BENCH, the motion is DENIED. Amended pretrial scheduling order to be issued. (RLR) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Brock J Specht on behalf of Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Specht, Brock) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER MODIFYING THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 121 Stipulation filed by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. Opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment Motion shall be due by 11/12/10 and the Reply shall be due 11/19/10. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 10/22/10. (KMW) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        STIPULATION re 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment to Extend Deadlines by all parties. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(Aycock, Robert) Modified text on 10/21/2010 (MMP). Modified text on 10/21/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company Responding to Plaintiff's Request for Abeyance of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boyd, Brian) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 114 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Decision on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert E. Aycock, # 2 Exhibit(s) 1 to Decl. R. Aycock, # 3 Exhibit(s) 2 to Decl. R. Aycock, # 4 Exhibit(s) 3 to Decl. R. Aycock, # 5 Exhibit(s) 4 to Decl. R. Aycock, # 6 Exhibit(s) 5 to Decl. R. Aycock, # 7 Exhibit(s) 6 to Decl. R. Aycock, # 8 Exhibit(s) 7 to Decl. R. Aycock, # 9 Exhibit(s) 8 to Decl. R. Aycock, # 10 Exhibit(s) 9 to Decl. R. Aycock, # 11 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 12 Certificate of Service). (Aycock, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. regarding Abeyance for Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Veverka, C) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Service re 116 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 114 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Decision on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, 115 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Certificate of Service by Brian Y Boyd on behalf of Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Boyd, Brian) Modified text on 10/12/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 114 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Decision on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (Boyd, Brian) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 114 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Decision on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Attachments: # 1 Word Count Compliance LR 7.1)(Boyd, Brian) Modified text on 10/8/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Decision on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Boyd, Brian) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of SERVICE re 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 110 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 109 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 112 Declaration in Support, 111 Declaration in Support, Certificate of Service by Brian Y Boyd on behalf of Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Boyd, Brian) Modified text on 10/8/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Declaration of Robert Chastain in Support of 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 110 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Boyd, Brian) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 10/8/10. (KT) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Declaration of Brian Y. Boyd in Support of 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 110 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4 (pp. 1-60), # 5 Exhibit 4 (pp. 61-120), # 6 Exhibit 4 (pp. 121-180), # 7 Exhibit 4 (pp. 181-235), # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7). (Boyd, Brian) Modified text on 10/8/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment (placeholder for) filed by Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Boyd, Brian) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 10/8/10. (KT) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2011 09:00 AM in Edward J. Devitt Courtroom (STP) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. (Boyd, Brian) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment by Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Boyd, Brian) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER re: Stipulation 106 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 10/6/10. (RLR) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      STIPULATION to Protective Order and ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by all parties. (Boyd, Brian) Modified text on 10/7/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        SECOND AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/1/2010. Motions (non-disp) due 12/15/2010. Motions (disp) due by 4/18/2011. Ready for trial due by 6/9/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 9/30/2010. (JME) (Entered: 10/02/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          STIPULATION to Extend Dates in Scheduling Order by all parties. ATTACHMENT FILED IN ERROR-(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order (will be provided in Word also)(Boyd, Brian) Modified text on 9/24/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. re 102 Request For Claim Construction Hearing and Joint Claim Construction Chart (Aycock, Robert) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              REQUEST For Claim Construction Hearing and Joint Claim Construction Chart by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.. (Aycock, Robert) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER adopting 100 Joint Stipulation to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 6/24/10. (LPH) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION re 98 Scheduling Order, TO EXTEND DEADLINES by all parties. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(Aycock, Robert) Modified text on 6/24/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the Plaintiff's Motions for Preliminary Injunction 21 and 53 are DENIED (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 5/5/10. (GRR) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/10/2010. Discovery due by 10/1/2010. Motions (non-disp) due 10/15/2010. Motions (disp) due by 2/18/2011. Ready for trial due by 6/9/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 4/30/10. (RLR) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 53 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 21 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The hearing scheduled for 4/30/10 at 1:00 p.m. is hereby cancelled. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/30/10. (KMW) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/10/2010. Discovery due by 10/1/2010. Motions (non-disp) due 10/15/2010. Motions (disp) due by 2/18/2010. Ready for trial due by 6/9/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 4/28/10. (RLR) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for RULE 16 DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham held on 4/23/2010. Discussion of pretrial deadlines Pretrial scheduling order will be issued. The Court encouraged the parties to work diligently and to consider possibilities for resolving the matter. (LMB) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Counterclaim of Perfect 10 Antenna by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service). (Aycock, Robert) Modified text on 4/23/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by all parties. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(Aycock, Robert) Modified text on 4/21/2010 (MMP). M (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER INCREASING WORD COUNT LIMIT FOR REPLY BRIEF re 89 Letter to District Judge filed by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/20/10. (KMW) Modified text on 4/21/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 83 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/20/10. (KMW) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Attorneys. The hearings on the Motions for Preliminary Injunction 21 53 have been rescehduled for April 30, 2010 at 1:00 p.m before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis in the Minneapolis Federal Courthouse, Courtroom 15E. (KMW) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Aycock, Robert) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. re 87 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, 84 Reply to Response to Motion, 83 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal, 86 Declaration in Support, 85 Declaration in Support. (Aycock, Robert) Modified text on 4/19/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. re 84 Reply to Response to Motion. (Aycock, Robert) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Robert E. Aycock in Support of 53 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Aycock, Robert) Modified text on 4/19/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Charles A. Eldering PH.D. in Support of 83 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal, 53 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. (Aycock, Robert) Modified text on 4/19/2010 (MMP). SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK's OFFICE ON 4/16/10. (KT) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 83 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal, 53 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. (Aycock, Robert) Modified text on 4/19/2010 (MMP). SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 4/16/10. (KT) Replaced specified pages per filer's request. Stapled originals to cover letter. Modified on 4/26/2010 (TSS). (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. (Aycock, Robert) Modified text on 4/19/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for expedited discovery 77 is DENIED (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/16/10. (GRR) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service 80 Response in Opposition to Motion by Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Boyd, Brian) Modified text on 4/16/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 77 MOTION to Expedite Limited Discovery MOTION for Discovery filed by Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Attachments: # 1 Word Count Certification).(Boyd, Brian) Modified text on 4/16/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. re 77 MOTION to Expedite Limited Discovery MOTION for Discovery and Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Limited Expedited Discovery (Aycock, Robert) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 77 MOTION to Expedite Limited Discovery MOTION for Discovery filed by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate).(Aycock, Robert) Modified text on 4/15/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Expedite Limited Discovery, MOTION for Discovery by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.(a Delaware corporation). (Aycock, Robert) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Brian Y. Boyd. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2393627 by Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Yang, Mathew) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 64 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/12/10. (KMW) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company re 65 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion REDACTED VERSION filed by Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(Yang, Mathew) Modified text on 4/12/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company re 66 Declaration in Support, 65 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 69 Declaration, 70 Declaration, 72 Certificate of Service, 71 Declaration, 68 Declaration, 67 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate. (Yang, Mathew) Modified text on 4/12/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company re 65 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Yang, Mathew) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Nicholas Bambos re 65 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Yang, Mathew) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 4/9/10. (KT) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Vern Swedin re 65 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Yang, Mathew) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 4/9/10. (KT) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Robert Chastain re 65 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company Robert Chastain. (Yang, Mathew) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 4/9/10. (KT) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Daniel J. Whittle re 65 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company FILED UNDER SEAL. (Yang, Mathew) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 4/9/10. (KT) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company re 65 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. (Yang, Mathew) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint Declaration of Brian Y. Boyd in Support of 65 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B Part 1, # 3 Exhibit B Part 2, # 4 Exhibit B Part 3, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K)(Yang, Mathew) Modified text on 4/12/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 53 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 64 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Yang, Mathew) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 4/9/10. (KT) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Pace Electronics, Inc., Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Yang, Mathew) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald J Schutz on behalf of Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service). (Schutz, Ronald) Modified text on 4/9/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Mathew J Yang on behalf of Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(Yang, Mathew) Modified text on 4/9/2010 (MMP). Modified text on 4/9/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. by Perfect 10 Antenna Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Horvack, John) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Counterclaim by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service). (Aycock, Robert) Modified TEXT on 4/6/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. re 57 Declaration in Support, 58 Declaration in Support, 53 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 55 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 56 Declaration in Support, 54 Notice of Hearing on Motion (Originally filed in Civil Case No. 10-cv-781 on 03/18/2010). (akl) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Charles Elderling, Ph.D. in Support of 53 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against Defendant Perfect 10 Antenna Company filed by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. (Originally filed in Civil Case No. 10-cv-781 on 03/18/2010). (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Appendix C, # 4 Appendix D). (akl) Modified text on 4/1/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Andrew White in Support of 53 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. (Originally filed in Civil Case No. 10-cv-781 on 03/18/2010) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 3/18/10. (akl) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Robert E. Aycock in Support of 53 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. (Originally filed in Civil Case No. 10-cv-781 on 03/18/2010) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(akl) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 53 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against Perfect 10 Antenna Company filed by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. (Originally filed in Civil Case No. 10-cv-781 on 03/18/2010) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 3/18/10. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(akl) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 53 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against Perfect 10 Antenna Company: Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. (Originally filed in Civil Case No. 10-cv-781 on 03/18/2010)(akl) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against Perfect 10 Antenna Company by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. (Originally filed in Civil Case No. 10-cv-781 on 03/18/2010) (akl) Modified on 3/31/2010 (akl). (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER CONSOLIDATING THE RELATED ACTIONS. 1. Pursuant to Rule 42(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the above captioned cases, and any ubsequently filed or transferred related actions are hereby CONSOLIDATED under master file no. 10-cv-64. From the date of this order, all documents shall be filed in case no. 10-CV-64. Case 10-cv-781 shall be closed. 2. A copy of the consolidated orders shall be filed in both related cases, but the files in this consolidated action shall be maintained under master file no. 10-CV-64 MJD/JJG). All orders, pleadings, motions, and other documents when filed in the Master File shall be deemed to be filed and docketed in the related case.3. The Clerk of Court is ORDERED to close civil case 10-cv-781. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/18/10. Associated Cases: 0:10-cv-00064-MJD-JJG, 0:10-cv-00781-MJD-JJG(RLR) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 44 Stipulation to allow defendant to amend its answer to complaint filed by Pace Electronics, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 3/18/10. (RLR) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER CANCELLING the 3/19/10 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND RESCHEDULING for ( Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2010 03:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 3/18/10. (RLR) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER WITHDRAWING MOTION re 46 Stipulation filed by Pace Electronics Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/18/10. (KMW) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(Aycock, Robert) Modified text on 3/19/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(Aycock, Robert) Modified text on 3/18/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION re 30 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Unenforceability Defense and Counterclaim by both parties.(a Minnesota corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(Yang, Mathew) Modified text on 3/18/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FIRST AMENDED ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims 12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. by Pace Electronics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(Yang, Mathew) Modified text on 3/18/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION re 12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim To Allow Defendant to Amend its Answer to Complaint by all parties. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(Yang, Mathew) Modified text on 3/18/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. re 42 Amended Notice of Hearing on Motion. (Aycock, Robert) Modified text on 3/18/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PLAINTIFF'S RE-NOTICE OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. (Aycock, Robert) Modified text on 3/18/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 10cv781 be reassigned to Chief Judge Michael J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/16/2010 and Judge John R. Tunheim on 3/17/2010. (JME) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. re 39 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Aycock, Robert) Modified text on 3/16/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.,and Pace Electronics, Inc. ATTACHMENT FILED IN ERROR(Attachments: # 1 Proposed Stipulation for Protective Order). (Aycock, Robert) Modified TEXT on 3/16/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service).(Florey, Michael) Modified text on 3/16/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 28 Motion to Seal Documents. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/1/10. (KMW) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Motion to File re 28 MOTION to Seal Document 25 Declaration in Support, 23 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 25 Declaration in Support filed by Pace Electronics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(Yang, Mathew) Modified text on 3/1/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. re 34 Reply to Counterclaim (Aycock, Robert) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PPC's REPLY to Counterclaim by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.(Aycock, Robert) Modified text on 2/26/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. re 30 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Unenforceability Defense and Counterclaim (Aycock, Robert) Modified text on 2/26/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 30 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Unenforceability Defense and Counterclaim filed by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate).(Aycock, Robert) Modified text on 2/26/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 30 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Unenforceability Defense and Counterclaim : Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. (Aycock, Robert) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WITHDRAWN PER 49 ORDER WITHDRAWING MOTION Dated 3-18-10. Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Unenforceability Defense and Counterclaim by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. (Aycock, Robert) Modified TEXT on 3/18/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. re 28 MOTION to Seal Document 25 Declaration in Support, 23 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Aycock, Robert) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal Document 25 Declaration in Support, 23 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.. (Aycock, Robert) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. re 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Aycock, Robert) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Charles Eldering in Support of 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) C)(Aycock, Robert) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Andrew White in Support of 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. (Aycock, Robert) Modified text on 2/26/2010 (MMP). SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 2/25/10. (KT) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Robert E. Aycock in Support of 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Aycock, Robert) Modified text on 2/26/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Aycock, Robert) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 2/25/10. (KT) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. (Aycock, Robert) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. (Aycock, Robert) Modified text on 2/26/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2010 09:30 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(LMB) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.. (Veverka, C) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Robert E. Aycock by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(Gerasimow, David) Modified text on 2/22/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2010 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (LMB) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pace Electronics, Inc. that there is no such parent or publicly held corporation to report. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(Yang, Mathew) Modified text on 2/8/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Charles Darwin "Skip" Davidson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2320347 by Pace Electronics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(Yang, Mathew) Modified text on 2/4/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Robert E. Fahr, Jr. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2320329 by Pace Electronics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(Yang, Mathew) Modified text on 2/4/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for John R. Horvack, Jr. by Pace Electronics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(Yang, Mathew) Modified text on 2/3/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. by Pace Electronics, Inc.(Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service). (Yang, Mathew) Modified text on 2/2/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION: Pursuant to the Joint Stipulation (Doc. No. 7 ), entered into by the parties, seeking to extend the time for defendant to answer the Complaint, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time for Defendant Pace Electronics, Inc., d/b/a Pace International, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including February 1, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 02/01/10. (LMB) Modified text on 2/1/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT PACE ELECTRONICS, INC., D/B/A PACE INTERNATIONAL: That attorney Ronald J. Schutz, enters his appearance as counsel of record for Defendant Pace Electronics, Inc., d/b/a Pace International. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(Yang, Mathew) Modified text on 2/2/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Mathew J Yang on behalf of Pace Electronics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(Yang, Mathew) Modified text on 2/1/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR TO BE REFILED - NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald J Schutz on behalf of Pace Electronics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Schutz, Ronald) Modified on 2/1/2010 (VEM). (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION (JOINT) by all parties. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(Yang, Mathew) Modified text on 2/1/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR TO BE REFILED - NOTICE of Appearance by Mathew J Yang on behalf of Pace Electronics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(Yang, Mathew) Modified text on 2/1/2010 (MMP). Modified on 2/1/2010 (VEM). (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. that John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc., d/b/a PPC, is a nongovernmental corporate party in the above-captioned action. No publicly-held corporation owns 10% or more of John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.'s stock. (Florey, Michael) Modified text on 1/21/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Charles J. (C.J.) Veverka by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.. (Gerasimow, David) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Sterling A. Brennan by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.. (Gerasimow, David) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT re 1 Complaint, Exhibit B by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc.. (Florey, Michael) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Pace Electronics, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4040516.) assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Patent list and referred to Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham, filed by John Mezzalingua Associates, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLR) (Qc'd by akl on 1/8/10) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 149 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?