Vistaprint Technologies Limited v. 123Print, Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:07-cv-02298
District Judge Joan N. Ericksen, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 25, 2016 at 7:42 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo VistaPrint Technologies Ltd., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Vistaprint Technologies Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Hillman +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 hillman@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Kenneth Kolodney +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 lkk@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A. Madera +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 madera@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/09/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stinson Leonard Street LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine A Moerke +1 612 335 1421 +1 612 335 1651 katherine.moerke@stinsonleonard.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/09/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David B. Bass +1 617 526 6259 +1 617 526 5000 david.bassett@wilmerhale.com
TERMINATED: 08/09/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul B Keller +1 212 937 7273 +1 212 230 8888 Paul.Keller@wilmerhale.com
TERMINATED: 08/09/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter James Shen +1 212 230 8895 +1 212 230 8888 peter.shen@wilmerhale.com
TERMINATED: 08/09/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Souto Frank Victor +1 212 230 7224 +1 212 230 8888 victor.souto@wilmerhale.com
No Logo 123print, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins Kaplan Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/09/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katie Crosby Lehmann +1 612 361 8200 KCL@CiresiConlin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin R Lueck +1 612 349 8500 mrlueck@rkmc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MUNIR R. MEGHJEE +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 mmeghjee@robinskaplan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tara Dawn Falsani +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 tdfalsani@rkmc.com
No Logo Drawing Board (us), Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins Kaplan Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/09/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katie Crosby Lehmann +1 612 361 8200 KCL@CiresiConlin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin R Lueck +1 612 349 8500 mrlueck@rkmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tara Dawn Falsani +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 tdfalsani@rkmc.com
No Logo Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins Kaplan Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/09/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katie Crosby Lehmann +1 612 361 8200 KCL@CiresiConlin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin R Lueck +1 612 349 8500 mrlueck@rkmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tara Dawn Falsani +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 tdfalsani@rkmc.com
v.
No Logo 123print, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins Kaplan Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/09/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katie Crosby Lehmann +1 612 361 8200 KCL@CiresiConlin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin R Lueck +1 612 349 8500 mrlueck@rkmc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MUNIR R. MEGHJEE +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 mmeghjee@robinskaplan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tara Dawn Falsani +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 tdfalsani@rkmc.com
No Logo Drawing Board (us), Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins Kaplan Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/09/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katie Crosby Lehmann +1 612 361 8200 KCL@CiresiConlin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin R Lueck +1 612 349 8500 mrlueck@rkmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tara Dawn Falsani +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 tdfalsani@rkmc.com
No Logo Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins Kaplan Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/09/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katie Crosby Lehmann +1 612 361 8200 KCL@CiresiConlin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin R Lueck +1 612 349 8500 mrlueck@rkmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tara Dawn Falsani +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 tdfalsani@rkmc.com
No Logo VistaPrint Technologies Ltd., Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Vistaprint Technologies Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Hillman +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 hillman@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Kenneth Kolodney +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 lkk@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A. Madera +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 madera@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/09/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stinson Leonard Street LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine A Moerke +1 612 335 1421 +1 612 335 1651 katherine.moerke@stinsonleonard.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/09/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David B. Bass +1 617 526 6259 +1 617 526 5000 david.bassett@wilmerhale.com
TERMINATED: 08/09/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul B Keller +1 212 937 7273 +1 212 230 8888 Paul.Keller@wilmerhale.com
TERMINATED: 08/09/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter James Shen +1 212 230 8895 +1 212 230 8888 peter.shen@wilmerhale.com
TERMINATED: 08/09/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Souto Frank Victor +1 212 230 7224 +1 212 230 8888 victor.souto@wilmerhale.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (126) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on December 28, 2010. (slf) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 119 and granting 94 Motion to Stay filed by Vistaprint Technologies Limited.(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on September 2, 2008. (slf) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: None
      RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to 123 Report and Recommendation filed by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Moerke, Katherine) (Entered: 08/19/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
        OBJECTION to 119 Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge Keyes. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 08/06/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
          TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on February 26, 2008 before Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (45 pages). Court Reporter: Leslie Pingley (E-mail: lesliepingley@yahoo.com. Telephone: 612-771-3744). Redaction Request due 8/11/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2008. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (LPH) (Entered: 07/24/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. (LPH) (Entered: 07/24/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER: Plaintiff's Objection Regarding the Propriety of Defendants' Amended Claim Constructions Pursuant to the Courts June 12, 2008 Order is DENIED AS MOOT, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court SUSPENDS all discovery and deadlines currently set in the September 26, 2007 Pretrial Scheduling Order and amended by the Court's June 12, 2008 Order, while this Report and Recommendation is pending. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 7/24/08. (akl) (Entered: 07/24/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 94 MOTION to Stay This Action Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit by the PTO filed by Vistaprint Technologies Limited should be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 8/7/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 7/24/08. (akl) (Entered: 07/24/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 94 MOTION to Stay This Action Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit by the PTO filed by Vistaprint Technologies Limited to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on July 18, 2008. (slf) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None
                    LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Moerke, Katherine) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 7/17/08. (KT) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None
                      LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harkins, Tara) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 7/16/08. (KT) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes: Motion Hearing held on 7/15/2008 re 94 MOTION to Stay This Action Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit by the PTO filed by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. Motion taken under advisement. R&R to be issued. (Tape #7) (akl) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: None
                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vistaprint Technologies Limited re 112 Reply to Response to Motion, 113 Declaration in Support (Moerke, Katherine) (Entered: 07/14/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: None
                            Declaration of Katherine A. Moerke in Support of 112 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 2, # 2 Exhibit(s) 3)(Moerke, Katherine) (Entered: 07/14/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: None
                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 94 MOTION to Stay This Action Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit by the PTO filed by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Moerke, Katherine) (Entered: 07/14/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None
                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc re Memorandum in Opposition 109 , and Declaration of Tara F. Harkins in Support of Memorandum in Opposition 110 (Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None
                                  DECLARATION by Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc of Tara F. Harkins in Support of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to VistaPrint's Memorandum of Law Regarding the Propriety of Defendants' Amended Claim Constructions Pursuant to the Court's June 12, 2008 Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, Part 1 of 3, # 2 Exhibit(s) A, Part 2 of 3, # 3 Exhibit(s) A, Part 3 of 3, # 4 Exhibit(s) B, # 5 Exhibit(s) C, # 6 Exhibit(s) D)(Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None
                                    BRIEF Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to VistaPrint's Memorandum of Law Regarding the Propriety of Defendants' Amended Claim Constructions Pursuant to the Court's June 12, 2008 Order. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER: Plaintiff VistaPrint Technologies Limited's request to file a reply memorandum of law in support of its Motion to Stay is hereby GRANTED. The reply memorandum is due to be filed no later than Monday, July 14, 2008, at 12:00pm, and must comply with the length requirements set forth in Local Rule 7.1(c). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 7/10/08. (akl) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: None
                                        LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Moerke, Katherine) (Entered: 07/09/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: None
                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc re 105 Declaration in Support, 104 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, to Stay This Action Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit by the Patent Office (Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 07/08/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: None
                                            Declaration of Tara F. Harkins in Support of 104 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-1, # 2 Exhibit(s) A-2, # 3 Exhibit(s) B, # 4 Exhibit(s) C, # 5 Exhibit(s) D, # 6 Exhibit(s) E, # 7 Exhibit(s) F, # 8 Exhibit(s) G, # 9 Exhibit(s) H)(Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 07/08/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: None
                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 94 MOTION to Stay This Action Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit by the PTO filed by Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 07/08/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vistaprint Technologies Limited re 101 Memorandum, 102 Declaration in Support (Moerke, Katherine) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                  Declaration of Katherine A. Moerke in Support of 101 Memorandum, filed by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2)(Moerke, Katherine) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                    MEMORANDUM by Vistaprint Technologies Limited Regarding the Propriety of Defendants' Amended Claim Constructions Pursuant to the Court's June 12, 2008 Order filed by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Moerke, Katherine) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes: Telephone Conference held on 7/1/2008. No Order to be issued. (jdf) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                        AMENDED DOCUMENT by Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., Vistaprint Technologies Limited, 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc. Amendment to 55 Notice (Other) AMENDED JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Moerke, Katherine) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vistaprint Technologies Limited re 94 MOTION to Stay This Action Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit by the PTO, 96 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 95 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 97 Declaration in Support (Moerke, Katherine) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                            Declaration of Katherine A. Moerke in Support of 94 MOTION to Stay This Action Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit by the PTO filed by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Moerke, Katherine) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 94 MOTION to Stay This Action Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit by the PTO filed by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Moerke, Katherine) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 94 MOTION to Stay This Action Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit by the PTO : Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2008 01:30 PM in Minneapolis - Courtroom 9W before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. (Moerke, Katherine) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION to Stay This Action Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit by the PTO by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Moerke, Katherine) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting 79 Motion and Modifying Pretrial Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 6/12/08. (akl) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes: Motion Hearing held on 6/5/2008 re 79 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Leave to Amend Prior Art Statement filed by 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc, Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc. Order to be issued. (Tape #1) (akl) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        NOTICE OF LOCATION CHANGE re 79 Motion for Leave to Amend Prior Art Statement filed by 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc, Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc. Motion hearing set for 6/5/08 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 8E before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J Keyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 5/30/08. (kt) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vistaprint Technologies Limited re 88 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 89 Declaration in Support,, (Moerke, Katherine) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            Declaration of Katherine A. Moerke in Support of 88 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3, # 4 Exhibit(s) 4, # 5 Exhibit(s) 5, # 6 Exhibit(s) 6, # 7 Exhibit(s) 7, # 8 Exhibit(s) 8, # 9 Exhibit(s) 9, # 10 Exhibit(s) 10, # 11 Exhibit(s) 11, # 12 Exhibit(s) 12, # 13 Exhibit(s) 13, # 14 Exhibit(s) 14, # 15 Exhibit(s) 15, # 16 Exhibit(s) 16, # 17 Exhibit(s) 17, # 18 Exhibit(s) 18)(Moerke, Katherine) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 79 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Leave to Amend Prior Art Statement filed by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Moerke, Katherine) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign the Magistrate Judge in this case. Case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan no longer assigned to the case. In addition, any proceedings currently scheduled before the transferring Magistrate Judge will proceed in front of that Judge, unless directed otherwise. Please contact Jackie Phipps, at (612) 664-5470, for scheduling or other matters related to Magistrate Judge Keyes. NOTE: the new case number is 07cv2298 JNE/JJK. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (JME) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER : that the close of fact discovery in this action is extended from June 16,2008 to June 30, 2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 5/14/08. (jam) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    NOTICE OF LOCATION CHANGE RE: 79 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to Amend their Prior Art Stateemnt. Hearing will be held at 2:30 p.m. on 6/5/08 in Courtroom 13W in Minneapolis before Magistrate Judge Arthur J Boylan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 5/8/08. (kt) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc re 81 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 80 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 83 Certificate of Compliance with LR 37.1, 79 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Leave to Amend Prior Art Statement, 82 Declaration in Support,, (Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH LR 37.1 re: 79 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Leave to Amend Prior Art Statement filed by 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc, Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc. by all defendants filed by all defendants. (Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          Declaration of Tara F. Harkins in Support of 79 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Leave to Amend Prior Art Statement filed by all defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 1 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) 2, # 4 Exhibit(s) 3, # 5 Exhibit(s) 4, # 6 Exhibit(s) 5, # 7 Exhibit(s) 6, # 8 Exhibit(s) 7, # 9 Exhibit(s) 8, # 10 Exhibit(s) 9, # 11 Exhibit(s) 10, # 12 Exhibit(s) 11, # 13 Exhibit(s) 12, # 14 Exhibit(s) 13, # 15 Exhibit(s) 14, # 16 Exhibit(s) 15, # 17 Exhibit(s) 16, # 18 Exhibit(s) 17, # 19 Exhibit(s) 18, # 20 Exhibit(s) 19)(Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 79 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Leave to Amend Prior Art Statement filed by all defendants. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 79 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Leave to Amend Prior Art Statement : Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2008 02:30 PM in St Paul - Courtroom 5 before Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION for Discovery Motion for Leave to Amend Prior Art Statement by Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc. (Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan: Telephone Conference held on 4/30/2008: Curry deposition date. Ordered on the record - deposition may take in June 2008. Time for discovery extended as advised by the court in conference. Proposed written order to be submitted. (kt) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Moerke, Katherine) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc re 74 Notice (Other) of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel (Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE by Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel (Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan: Telephone Conference held on 4/3/2008. Ordered that Rule 30(b)(6) corporate deposition of plaintiff take place in Boston, MA. (kt) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              REPLY to 70 Answer and Counterclaim by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Moerke, Katherine) Modified link and text on 4/2/2008 (dch). (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc re 70 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim [First Amended Answer and Counterclaims to Second Amended Complaint] (Lehmann, Katie) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  First Amended ANSWER and COUNTERCLAIM to the Second Amended Complaint against Vistaprint Technologies Limited by Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc. (Lehmann, Katie) Modified text on 3/12/2008 (dch). (Entered: 03/12/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER. That Defendant's Motion to Amend its Answer [Docket No. 18] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as provided herein: 1. Defendants shall be allowed to amend its Answer to assert a counterclaim of inequitable conduct; 2. Defendants shall not be allowed to amend its Answer to clarify their estoppel defense by expressly adding the doctrine of unclean hands. Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 3/10/08. (kt) Modified text on 3/10/2008 (dch). (Entered: 03/10/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan: Motion Hearing held on 2/26/2008 re 57 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants' Answer to Allege Inequitable Conduct and Unclean Hands filed by 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc, Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc. Motion taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Tape #91 (Ctrm. 5) (STP)) (kt) Modified text on 2/27/2008 (dch). (Entered: 02/27/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER: The time of the hearing of Defendant's Motion to Amend their Answer has been changed. The hearing scheduled to be held on Tuesday, February 26, 2008, in Courtroom 5, 180 East Fifth Street, St. Paul, Minnesota, will be held at 3:00 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Arthur J Boylan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 2/19/08. (jam) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vistaprint Technologies Limited re 63 Response in Opposition to Motion, 65 Declaration in Support, 64 Declaration in Support (Moerke, Katherine) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Declaration of Robert Dulaney in Support of 63 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Moerke, Katherine) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 2/14/08. (KT) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Declaration of Katherine A. Moerke in Support of 63 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Moerke, Katherine) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 2/14/08. (KT) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition re 57 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants' Answer to Allege Inequitable Conduct and Unclean Hands filed by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Moerke, Katherine) Modified text on 2/15/2008 (dch). SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 2/14/08. (KT) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc re 58 Amended Notice of Hearing on Motion, 57 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants' Answer to Allege Inequitable Conduct and Unclean Hands, 60 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, 59 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 61 Affidavit in Support of Motion,, (Lehmann, Katie) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Katie Crosby Lehmann in SUPPORT OF 57 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants' Answer to Allege Inequitable Conduct and Unclean Hands filed by Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, 2, 3 filed under seal, # 2 Exhibit(s) 4, 5, 6, # 3 Exhibit(s) 7, 8, # 4 Exhibit(s) 9, 10, # 5 Exhibit(s) 11 (part 1), # 6 Exhibit(s) 11 (part 2), # 7 Exhibit(s) 12, # 8 Exhibit(s) 13 (part 1), # 9 Exhibit(s) 13 (part 2), # 10 Exhibit(s) 13 (part 3), # 11 Exhibit(s) 14, # 12 Exhibit(s) 15, # 13 Exhibit(s) 16, 17, 18, 19)(Lehmann, Katie) SEALED DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 2/4/2008. Modified text on 2/4/2008 (jdf). (Entered: 02/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc re 59 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc. (Lehmann, Katie) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 57 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants' Answer to Allege Inequitable Conduct and Unclean Hands filed by Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc. (Lehmann, Katie) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 57 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants' Answer to Allege Inequitable Conduct and Unclean Hands : Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2008 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (Lehmann, Katie) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants' Answer to Allege Inequitable Conduct and Unclean Hands by Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc. (Lehmann, Katie) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Letter re: withdrawal of motion re 49 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 48 MOTION for Protective Order and MOTION to Quash Subpoenas from Tara F. Harkins. (Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                JOINT Claim Construction Statement by Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., Vistaprint Technologies Limited, 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Moerke, Katherine) Modified text on 1/8/2008 (dch). (Entered: 01/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION FOR DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Moerke, Katherine) (Entered: 01/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James Tower, Inc., Precision Press, Inc., The Occasions Group, Inc., Thayer Publishing, Inc., Corporate Graphics re 49 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 50 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 48 MOTION for Protective Order and MOTION to Quash Subpoenas, 52 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 51 Declaration in Support, (Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Sheila B. Hagen in SUPPORT OF 48 MOTION for Protective Order and MOTION to Quash Subpoenas filed by James Tower, Inc., Precision Press, Inc., The Occasions Group, Inc., Thayer Publishing, Inc., Corporate Graphics. (Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Tara F. Harkins in Support of 48 MOTION for Protective Order and MOTION to Quash Subpoenas filed by James Tower, Inc., Precision Press, Inc., The Occasions Group, Inc., Thayer Publishing, Inc., Corporate Graphics. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E)(Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 48 MOTION for Protective Order and MOTION to Quash Subpoenas filed by James Tower, Inc., Precision Press, Inc., The Occasions Group, Inc., Thayer Publishing, Inc., Corporate Graphics. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 48 MOTION for Protective Order and MOTION to Quash Subpoenas : Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2008 02:00 PM in St Paul - Courtroom 5 before Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Protective Order and, MOTION to Quash Subpoenas by James Tower, Inc., Precision Press, Inc., The Occasions Group, Inc., Thayer Publishing, Inc., Corporate Graphics. (Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan : Telephone Conference held on 11/14/2007. (kt) (Entered: 11/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc re: Answer and Counterclaims to Second Amended Complaint (Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 11/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second), COUNTERCLAIM against Vistaprint Technologies Limited by Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc. (Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 11/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) against Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc, filed by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Moerke, Katherine) (Entered: 11/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A# 2 Certificate of Service)(Moerke, Katherine) (Entered: 11/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan : Telephone Conference held on 10/17/2007. Parties are hereby ordered by the Court to meet and confer in person before November 14, 2007, telephone conference scheduled for 8:30 a.m. (kt) (Entered: 10/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Amended Pleadings due by 12/19/2007.,Discovery due by 6/16/2008.,Motions (disp) due by 11/3/2008.,Ready for trial due by 2/1/2009.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 9/26/07. (RJL) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed byMagistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 9/26/07. (RJL) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan : Pretrial Conference held on 9/18/2007. Scheduling order to be issued. (RJL) (Entered: 09/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., Vistaprint Technologies Limited, 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A# 2 Certificate of Service)(Moerke, Katherine) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's REPLY to Counterclaim First Amended Answer and Counterclaims by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Moerke, Katherine) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE--REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Moerke, Katherine) Modified text on 9/10/2007 (akl). (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF LOCATION CHANGE - Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2007 10:15 AM in Minneapolis - Chambers 8E before Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 8/27/07. (RJL) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc, 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc, 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc re 33 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement,, 32 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, (Lehmann, Katie) (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc, 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc, 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc that there is no such parent or publicly held corporation to report. (Lehmann, Katie) (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              First Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM of 123Print, Inc., Drawing Board (US), Inc.(D/B/A Stationery House, Inc.); and Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc. against all plaintiffs by Taylor Strategic Accounts, Inc., 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc, 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc.(Lehmann, Katie) (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Robert E. Hillman by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Moerke, Katherine) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Lawrence K. Kolodney by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Moerke, Katherine) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Vistaprint Technologies Limited (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Moerke, Katherine) (Entered: 08/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc, 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc, filed by Vistaprint Technologies Limited, Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Certificate of Service)(Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR /// NOT SIGNED /// WILL REFILE AMENDED COMPLAINT only /// AMENDED COMPLAINT against 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc, 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc, filed by Vistaprint Technologies Limited, Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List # 2 Exhibit 1, Part 1 # 3 Exhibit 1, Part 2 # 4 Exhibit 2, Part 1 # 5 Exhibit 2, Part 2 # 6 Exhibit 3 # 7 Certificate of Service)(Bazis, Jeanette) Modified text on 8/7/2007 (dch). (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT re 23 Stipulation, filed by Vistaprint Technologies Limited,, 123Print, Inc,, Drawing Board (US), Inc. . Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 8/3/07. (RJL) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vistaprint Technologies Limited, Vistaprint Technologies Limited re 24 Amended Complaint,, 23 Stipulation,, 22 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR /// STIPULATION NOT RULED ON YET /// AMENDED COMPLAINT against 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc, 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc, filed by Vistaprint Technologies Limited, Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List# 2 Exhibit 1, Part 1# 3 Exhibit 1, Part 2# 4 Exhibit 2, Part 1# 5 Exhibit 2, Part 2# 6 Exhibit 3)(Bazis, Jeanette) Modified text on 8/2/2007 (dch). (Entered: 08/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION re 19 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint to Add a New Defendant by Vistaprint Technologies Limited, 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc, Vistaprint Technologies Limited, 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit 1, Part 1# 4 Exhibit 1, Part 2# 5 Exhibit 2, Part 1# 6 Exhibit 2, Part 2# 7 Exhibit 3)(Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of withdrawal of plaintiff's motion to amend complaint to add a new defendant by Vistaprint Technologies Limited, Vistaprint Technologies Limited re 19 (Bazis, Jeanette) Modified text on 8/2/2007 (dch). (Entered: 08/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vistaprint Technologies Limited re 19 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint to Add a New Defendant, 20 Notice (Other) (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 19 Motion to amend/correct by Vistaprint Technologies Limited (Bazis, Jeanette) Modified text on 7/31/2007 (dch). (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint to Add a New Defendant by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Vistaprint Technologies Limited Concerning Pretrial Conference Date. (Shen, Peter) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED NOTICE OF Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2007 10:15 AM, in Suite 720, 180 East 5th Street, St. Paul, before Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 7/16/07. (RJL) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF Pretrial Conference set for 9/9/2007 10:15 AM, in Suite 720, 180 East 5th Street, St. Paul, MN before Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 7/13/07. (RJL) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan for all further proceedings. The new case number is 07cv2298 JNE/AJB. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 7/6/07. (JME) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson for all further proceedings. The new case number is 0:07-cv-02298-JNE-SRN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 07/03/07. (JGG) (Entered: 07/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Pretrial Conference set for 8/1/2007 10:00 AM in In Chambers, Room 750, St. Paul, MN Hearing before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 6/25/07. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(SEA) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Counterclaim by Vistaprint Technologies Limited, Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vistaprint Technologies Limited, Vistaprint Technologies Limited of VistaPrint Limited as corporate parent and/or publicly held company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 06/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc, 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc re 9 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement,, 8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc, 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc of Navitor, Inc., Personalized Business Products, Inc., Taylor Corporation as corporate parent and/or publicly held company. (Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Vistaprint Technologies Limited by 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc.(Harkins, Tara) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. 123Print, Inc served on 5/18/2007, answer due 6/7/2007; Drawing Board (US), Inc served on 5/18/2007, answer due 6/7/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavits of Service# 2 Certificate of Service)(Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vistaprint Technologies Limited re 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Paul B. Keller, 2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David B. Bassett, 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Victor F. Souto, 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Peter J. Shen (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Peter J. Shen by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Victor F. Souto by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Paul B. Keller by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David B. Bassett by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against 123Print, Inc, Drawing Board (US), Inc ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4013147.) assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per Patent list and referred to Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham., filed by Vistaprint Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(RJL) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 42 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?