ROM Corporation v. A&A Manufacturing Company, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Western District Court, Case No. 4:01-cv-00697
District Judge Gary A. Fenner, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 18, 2017 at 8:52 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rom Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick David Kuehl, Jr. +1 816 983 8379 +1 816 983 8090 patrick.kuehl@huschblackwell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey J. Simon +1 816 329 4711 +1 816 983 8080 jeff.simon@huschblackwell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle Lynn Elliott +1 816 474 8100 +1 816 474 3216 kelliott@spencerfane.com
No Logo A&A Manufacturing Company, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovey Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder clb@hoveywilliams.com
v.
No Logo A&A Manufacturing Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovey Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael M. Elbein +1 913 647 9050 +1 913 647 9057 mme@hoveywilliams.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder clb@hoveywilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Robert Cross +1 414 277 5669 +1 414 271 3552 drc@quarles.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D. Franzini +1 414 277 5747
TERMINATED: 12/14/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JENNIFER A. LAZEWSKI +1 414 277 5763
No Logo Rom Corporation, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 51 motion to dismiss case. Signed by Judge Gary A. Fenner on 4/3/03. (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 04/03/2003)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION to dismiss case filed by John D. Franzini on behalf of A&A Manufacturing Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/18/2003 (Franzini, John) (Entered: 04/03/2003)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 49 motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Gary A. Fenner on 2/26/03. (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 02/26/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: None
        Joint MOTION for extension of time filed by John D. Franzini on behalf of A&A Manufacturing Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/12/2003 (Franzini, John) (Entered: 02/25/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 47 motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Gary A. Fenner on 1/29/03. (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 01/29/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: None
            Joint MOTION for extension of time filed by John D. Franzini on behalf of A&A Manufacturing Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/12/2003 (Franzini, John) (Entered: 01/28/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 45 motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Gary A. Fenner on 12/23/02. (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 12/23/2002)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: None
                Joint MOTION for extension of time filed by John D. Franzini on behalf of A&A Manufacturing Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/7/2003 (Franzini, John) (Entered: 12/23/2002)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 43 motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Gary A. Fenner on 11/26/02. (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 11/26/2002)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: None
                    Joint MOTION for extension of time filed by John D. Franzini on behalf of A&A Manufacturing Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/11/2002 (Franzini, John) (Entered: 11/26/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Order entered by Judge Gary A. Fenner on 10/29/2002 granting motion for extension of time (Related Doc # 41 ) (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 10/29/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: None
                        Joint MOTION for extension of time filed by John D. Franzini on behalf of A&A Manufacturing. suggestions in opposition due by 11/13/2002. (Franzini, John) (Entered: 10/29/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER entered by Judge Gary A. Fenner setting briefing schedule. (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 09/16/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                            RULES OF TRIAL entered by Judge Gary A. Fenner (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 09/13/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: None
                              Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER filed by John D. Franzini on behalf of A&A Manufacturing. (Franzini, John) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2002 to replace incorrect pleading (Kendall, Shelly). (Entered: 09/11/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER entered by Judge Gary A. Fenner directing the parties to file their proposed scheduling order within 15 days. (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 08/28/2002)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER entered by Judge Gary A. Fenner regarding Claim Construction brief and denying plaintiff's motion to strike [(Doc. #34)]. (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 04/01/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: None
                                    SUGGESTIONS IN OPPOSITION to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike filed by John D. Franzini on behalf of A&A Manufacturing. Reply Suggestions due by 2/11/2002. (Attachments: # 1)(Related document(s) 34 ) (Franzini, John) Modified on 1/28/2002 to remove proposed order (Kendall, Shelly). (Entered: 01/25/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: None
                                      MOTION to strike filed by Kyle Lynn Elliott on behalf of ROM Corporation. suggestions in opposition due by 1/31/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Elliott, Kyle) Modified on 1/17/2002 to remove proposed order (Kendall, Shelly). Terminated on 4/22/2002 (Diefenbach, Tracy). (Entered: 01/16/2002)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None
                                        REPLY to plaintiff's claim construction brief (30) filed by John D. Franzini on behalf of defendant A&A Manufacturing. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I to Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Claim Construction Memorandum# 2 Exhibit II to Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Claim Construction Memorandum# 3 Exhibit A to Wagner Declaration# 4 Exhibit B to Wagner Declaration)(Related document(s) 25 ) (Franzini, John) Modified on 12/26/2001 pursuant to call from filer requesting notation of linking (Curl, Glenda). (Entered: 12/14/2001)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER entered by Judge Gary A. Fenner withdrawing Jennifer A. Lazewski as counsel for defendant. (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 12/14/2001)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None
                                            MOTION to withdraw/substitute attorney filed by John D. Franzini on behalf of A&A Manufacturing. suggestions in opposition due by 12/31/2001. (Kendall, Shelly) Modified on 12/19/2001 to re-docket as a motion, instead of notice of filing (Kendall, Shelly). Terminated on 1/3/2002 (Diefenbach, Tracy). (Entered: 12/19/2001)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None
                                              CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Kyle Lynn Elliott on behalf of plaintiff ROM Corporation. Reply Suggestions due by 12/17/2001. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B# 2 Exhibit C# 3 Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 25 ) (Elliott, Kyle) Modified on 12/26/2001 to reflect proper document headings and to reflect link to document #23 (Curl, Glenda). (Entered: 12/03/2001)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/21/2001, Entered: None
                                                ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS (Kendall, Shelly) (Entered: 11/27/2001)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                  RESPONSE TO MOTION to Stay and Conditional Consent thereto filed by Kyle Lynn Elliott on behalf of ROM Corporation. Reply Suggestions due by 12/3/2001. (Related document(s) 25 ) (Elliott, Kyle) (Entered: 11/20/2001)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's first set of interrogatories, requests for production, and requests for admissions filed by Kyle Lynn Elliott on behalf of ROM Corporation. (Elliott, Kyle) (Entered: 11/20/2001)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/15/2001, Entered: None
                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Responses to First Request for Production of Documents and Things and Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's First Interrogatories filed by Patrick David Kuehl Jr on behalf of all plaintiffs. (Kuehl, Patrick) (Entered: 11/15/2001)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION to stay proceedings filed by John D. Franzini on behalf of A&A Manufacturing. suggestions in opposition due by 11/20/2001. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Franzini, John) Terminated on 1/3/2002 (Diefenbach, Tracy). (Entered: 11/08/2001)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: None
                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Declaration of John D. Franzini In Support of Defendant's Claim Construction Brief filed by Jennifer A. Lazewski on behalf of A&A Manufacturing. (Lazewski, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/01/2001)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: None
                                                            CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by John D. Franzini on behalf of defendant A&A Manufacturing. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of John D. Franzini in support of Defendant's Claim Construction Brief# 2 Exhibit 1 to Franzini Declaration# 3 Exhibit 2 to Franzini Declaration# 4 Exhibit 3 to Franzini Declaration# 5 Exhibit 4 to Franzini Declaration# 6 Exhibit 5 to Franzini Declaration# 7 Exhibit 6 to Franzini Declaration# 8 Exhibit 7 to Franzini Declaration# 9 Exhibit 8 to Franzini Declaration)(Franzini, John) Modified on 12/26/2001 pursuant to call from dft counsel to clarify linking(Curl, Glenda). (Entered: 11/01/2001)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: None
                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Jennifer A. Lazewski on behalf of A&A Manufacturing. (Lazewski, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/12/2001)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: None
                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for First Set of Interrogatories filed by Jennifer A. Lazewski on behalf of A&A Manufacturing. (Lazewski, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/12/2001)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: None
                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Reply Claim Chart filed by Cheryl Lynn Burbach on behalf of A&A Manufacturing. (Burbach, Cheryl) (Entered: 10/10/2001)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/12/2001, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF ENDORSEMENT filed by Jeffrey J. Simon on behalf of ROM Corporation. (Simon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/12/2001)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None
                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Submission of Claim Chart filed by Kyle Lynn Elliott on behalf of ROM Corporation. (Elliott, Kyle) (Entered: 09/10/2001)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                                        STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (Kendall, Shelly) (Entered: 09/06/2001)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Judge Gary A. Fenner. Discovery due by 4/1/2002, pre-trial conference set for 9/6/2002 at 03:30 PM at Chambers, accelerated jury trial held on 10/7/2002 at 09:00AM at Courtroom 8A, Kansas City (GAF) dispositive motions due by 5/1/2002, (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 09/06/2001)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            RULES OF TRIAL entered by Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 09/06/2001)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: None
                                                                              PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER (Jointly Submitted) filed by Cheryl Lynn Burbach on behalf of A&A Manufacturing. (Burbach, Cheryl) (Entered: 09/04/2001)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Kyle Lynn Elliott on behalf of ROM Corporation. (Elliott, Kyle) (Entered: 08/28/2001)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Cheryl Lynn Burbach on behalf of A&A Manufacturing. (Burbach, Cheryl) (Entered: 08/27/2001)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTEREST of Defendant filed by Michael Elbein on behalf of A&A Manufacturing. (Elbein, Michael) (Entered: 07/30/2001)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                      ANSWER to counterclaim (Related Doc # 4 ) Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Counterclaim filed by Patrick David Kuehl Jr on behalf of all plaintiffs. (Kuehl, Patrick) (Entered: 07/30/2001)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTEREST filed by Jeffrey J. Simon on behalf of ROM Corporation. (Simon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/24/2001)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION AND ORDER for Pro Hac Vice granting appearance of Attorney John D. Franzini for A&A Manufacturing Fee paid; receipt number 191082. (Beard, Melanie) (Entered: 07/23/2001)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION AND ORDER for Pro Hac Vice granting appearance of Attorney Jennifer A. Lazewski for A&A Manufacturing Fee paid; receipt number 191080. (Beard, Melanie) (Entered: 07/23/2001)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                              MOTION AND ORDER for Pro Hac Vice granting appearance of Attorney David R Cross for A&A Manufacturing Fee paid; receipt number 191081. (Beard, Melanie) (Entered: 07/23/2001)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                RULE 16 NOTICE entered by Judge Gary A. Fenner. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/2/2001, rule 26 conference due by 8/22/2001, (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 07/19/2001)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                  ANSWER to complaint (Related Doc # 1 ), COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Relief against ROM Corporation filed by Cheryl Lynn Burbach on behalf of A&A Manufacturing. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A1: brochure# 2 Exhibit A2: photograph# 3 Exhibit A3: photograph# 4 Exhibit A4: photograph)(Burbach, Cheryl) (Entered: 07/19/2001)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT EXECUTED ON A&A Manufacturing 6/29/2001, answer due on 7/19/2001 filed by Jeffrey J. Simon on behalf of ROM Corporation. (Related document(s) 1 ) (Beard, Melanie) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/27/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Notice of EAPADMIN was handed to the mailed. (Beard, Melanie) (Entered: 06/28/2001)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/27/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                        COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against A&A Manufacturing. Filed by Jeffrey J. Simon on behalf of ROM Corporation. Receipt number 190601. Service due by 10/25/2001, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Beard, Melanie) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2001 (Beard, Melanie). (Entered: 06/28/2001)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 119 times.

                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                           
                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                          Need Password Help?