Cardiac Science, Inc v. Defibtech, LLC.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:03-cv-02988
District Judge Richard H. Kyle, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 1, 2017 at 7:42 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cardiac Science, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson, Thuente, Skaar & Christensen, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Chadwick +1 612 349 5740 +1 612 349 9266 litigationECF@ptslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron W. Davis +1 612 349 5740 +1 612 349 9266 davis@ptslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas G Dickson +1 612 349 3004 +1 612 349 9266 dickson@ptslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randall T Skaar +1 612 349 5740 +1 612 349 9266 skaar@ptslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SKAAR ULBRICH MACARI PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew T Macari +1 612 216 1700 +1 612 234 4465 macari@sumiplaw.com
No Logo Defibtech LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Eleven South LaSalle Street

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Constantine John Gekas +1 312 726 4501 +1 312 726 4505 cjg@gekaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan W Dettmann +1 612 766 7000 jdettmann@faegre.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenyon & Kenyon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/26/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John F. Petrsoric +1 212 425 7200
TERMINATED: 10/26/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexas D. Skucas +1 212 425 7200

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexis Gorton +1 212 446 4887 +1 212 446 4900 agorton@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Lori Ann Wagner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/14/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY Lori Ann Wagner

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michelle A Paninopoulos

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/17/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle A Paninopoulos

Toggle Switch Represented by Soumitra Deka

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/26/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Soumitra Deka

Toggle Switch Represented by Steven T. Snyder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/26/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven T. Snyder

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew M. Luger +1 612 664 5780 +1 612 664 5787 andrew.luger@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William P DiSalvatore +1 212 937 7226 +1 212 230 8888 william.disalvatore@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nora Q.E. Passamaneck nora.passamaneck@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Souto Frank Victor +1 212 230 7224 +1 212 230 8888 victor.souto@wilmerhale.com
v.
No Logo Defibtech LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Eleven South LaSalle Street

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Constantine John Gekas +1 312 726 4501 +1 312 726 4505 cjg@gekaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/15/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY Jonathan W Dettmann +1 612 766 7000 jdettmann@faegre.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenyon & Kenyon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/26/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L DeLucia +1 212 908 6213 +1 212 425 5288 rdelucia@kenyon.com
TERMINATED: 10/26/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John F. Petrsoric +1 212 425 7200
TERMINATED: 10/26/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexas D. Skucas +1 212 425 7200

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexis Gorton +1 212 446 4887 +1 212 446 4900 agorton@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Lori Ann Wagner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/15/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY Lori Ann Wagner

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michelle A Paninopoulos

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/15/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY Michelle A Paninopoulos

Toggle Switch Represented by Soumitra Deka

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/26/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Soumitra Deka

Toggle Switch Represented by Steven T. Snyder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/26/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven T. Snyder

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew M. Luger +1 612 664 5780 +1 612 664 5787 andrew.luger@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William P DiSalvatore +1 212 937 7226 +1 212 230 8888 william.disalvatore@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nora Q.E. Passamaneck nora.passamaneck@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Souto Frank Victor +1 212 230 7224 +1 212 230 8888 victor.souto@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Cardiac Science, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson, Thuente, Skaar & Christensen, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Chadwick +1 612 349 5740 +1 612 349 9266 litigationECF@ptslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron W. Davis +1 612 349 5740 +1 612 349 9266 davis@ptslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randall T Skaar +1 612 349 5740 +1 612 349 9266 skaar@ptslaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (139) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DESTROY DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. (GJS) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER - FILED UNDER SEAL re 124 MOTION for Settlement to be Enforced and 128 MOTION for Settlement Enforce Settlement Agreement and Approve Written Settlement Agreement . Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S Mayeron on 8/3/05. (GJS) (Entered: 08/03/2005)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Janie S Mayeron : Motion Hearing held on 8/3/2005 re 124 MOTION for Settlement to be Enforced and 128 MOTION for Settlement Enforce Settlement Agreement and Approve Written Settlement Agreement. Motions taken under advisement as 7/26/05. Order to be issued. (Tape #113/103 to 113/507) (GJS) (Entered: 08/03/2005)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: None
        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC. re 135 Affidavit in Support of Motion, (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 07/27/2005)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: None
          AFFIDAVIT of William P. DiSalvatore in SUPPORT OF 128 MOTION for Settlement Enforce Settlement Agreement and Approve Written Settlement Agreement filed by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List# 2 Exhibit A)(Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 07/27/2005)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: None
            DECLARATION of Randall T. Skaar in Opposition to 128 MOTION for Settlement Enforce Settlement Agreement and Approve Written Settlement Agreement filed by Cardiac Science, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B - Filed Under Seal)(Skaar, Randall) RECIEVED SEALED DOCUMENT ON 7/25/05 Modified on 7/27/2005 (GJS). (Entered: 07/25/2005)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: None
              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 128 MOTION for Settlement Enforce Settlement Agreement and Approve Written Settlement Agreement [FILED UNDER SEAL] filed by Cardiac Science, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Skaar, Randall)RECEIVED SEALED DOCUMENT ON 7/25/05 Modified on 7/27/2005 (GJS). (Entered: 07/25/2005)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: None
                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC. re 131 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 128 MOTION for Settlement Enforce Settlement Agreement and Approve Written Settlement Agreement, 129 Notice of Hearing on Motion,, 130 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 07/19/2005)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: None
                  AFFIDAVIT of Jeanette M. Bazis in SUPPORT OF 128 MOTION for Settlement Enforce Settlement Agreement and Approve Written Settlement Agreement filed by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC. FILED CONVENTIAONLLY FILED UNDER SEAL. (Bazis, Jeanette) RECEIVED COPIES IN CLERK'S OFFICE 7/20/05 Modified on 7/20/2005 (VEM). (Entered: 07/19/2005)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: None
                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 128 MOTION for Settlement Enforce Settlement Agreement and Approve Written Settlement Agreement filed by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC. FILED CONVENTIONALLY UNDER SEAL. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bazis, Jeanette) RECEIVED COPIES IN CLERK'S OFFICE 7/20/05 Modified on 7/20/2005 (VEM). (Entered: 07/19/2005)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                      NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 128 MOTION for Settlement Enforce Settlement Agreement and Approve Written Settlement Agreement: Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2005 12:30 PM in St Paul - Courtroom 628B before Magistrate Judge Janie S Mayeron. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 07/19/2005)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Settlement Enforce Settlement Agreement and Approve Written Settlement Agreement by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC.. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 07/19/2005)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: None
                          Declaration of Eric H. Chadwick in Support of 124 MOTION for Settlement to be Enforced filed by Cardiac Science, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (FILED UNDER SEAL)# 2 Exhibit B (FILED UNDER SEAL))SEALED DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 7/12/05(Chadwick, Eric) Modified on 7/13/2005 (mkc). (Entered: 07/12/2005)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: None
                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 124 MOTION for Settlement to be Enforced (FILED UNDER SEAL) filed by Cardiac Science, Inc. SEALED DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 7/12/05.(Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Chadwick, Eric) Modified on 7/13/2005 (mkc). (Entered: 07/12/2005)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                              NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 124 MOTION for Settlement to be Enforced: Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2005 12:30 PM in St Paul - Courtroom 628B before Magistrate Judge Janie S Mayeron. (Chadwick, Eric) (Entered: 07/12/2005)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: None
                                MOTION for Settlement to be Enforced by Cardiac Science, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Chadwick, Eric) (Entered: 07/12/2005)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER DENYING 120 Motion to Amend/Correct. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 07/12/05. (rhks) (Entered: 07/12/2005)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None
                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC. re 120 MOTION to Amend/Correct 115 Order Dismissing Case, 121 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 07/08/2005)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None
                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 120 MOTION to Amend/Correct 115 Order Dismissing Case filed by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC.. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 07/08/2005)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None
                                        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 115 Order Dismissing Case to Provide for Continuing Jurisdiction over the Parties' Settlement agreement by Cardiac Science, Inc. and Defibtech, LLC.. (Bazis, Jeanette) Modified filers and text on 7/11/2005 (LJD). (Entered: 07/08/2005)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          TRANSCRIPT of Settlement Conference held on 6/22/05 before Judge Magistrate Judge Mayeron. Tape Number: Unknown. (Unknownpgs) FILED CONVENTIONALLY SEALED AND SEPARATE pursuant to 118 Order on Stipulation. (JVN) (Entered: 07/07/2005)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER re 116 Stipulation filed by Cardiac Science, Inc,, Defibtech, LLC.. The transcript of the June 22, 2005, settlement proceedings before this Court is confidential and is to be filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S Mayeron on 6/30/05. (LJD) (Entered: 06/30/2005)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: None
                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defibtech, LLC. re 116 Stipulation (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 06/27/2005)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                STIPULATION re 114 Settlement Conference Stipulation to File Under Seal the Transcript of 6/22/05 Settlement Proceedings by Cardiac Science, Inc. and Defibtech, LLC.. (Bazis, Jeanette) Modified filers on 6/28/2005 (LJD). (Entered: 06/27/2005)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER DISMISSING CASE - case settled counsel have 60 days to file stipulated form of final judgment. Signed by Judge Richard H Kyle on 6/23/05. (ds) (Entered: 06/24/2005)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Janie S Mayeron : Settlement Conference held on 6/22/2005. Settlement reached. (LJD) (Entered: 06/23/2005)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER re 108 Stipulation to Amend Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S Mayeron on 6/15/05. (LJD) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defibtech, LLC., re Proposed Order (Luger, Andrew) Modified links and text on 6/14/2005 (LJD). (Entered: 06/13/2005)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC. re 110 Notice of Appearance Constantine John Gekas (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 06/13/2005)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Luger on behalf of Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC. (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 06/13/2005)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC. re 108 Stipulation (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 06/13/2005)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                STIPULATION re 11 Order to Amend Stipulated Protective Order by Cardiac Science, Inc. and Defibtech, LLC. (Luger, Andrew) Modified filers on 6/14/2005 (LJD). (Entered: 06/13/2005)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC. re 106 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Constantine John Gekas (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 06/13/2005)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Constantine John Gekas by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC.. (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 06/13/2005)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER for Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 6/22/2005 10:03 AM in St Paul - Courtroom 628B before Magistrate Judge Janie S Mayeron. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S Mayeron on 5/23/05. (LJD) (Entered: 05/23/2005)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defibtech, LLC. re [103 NOTICE of Markman Hearing (Bazis, Jeanette) Modified text on 5/16/2005 (LJD). (Entered: 05/13/2005)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          Notice of Markman hearing by Defibtech, LLC.. Markman Hearing set for 6/14/2005 08:00 AM in St Paul - Courtroom 4 before Judge Richard H Kyle. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Sixth Amended Pretrial Scheduling ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2004. Joinder of Parties due by 10/1/2004. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S Mayeron on 5/13/05. (LJD) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER taking under advisement 85 Motion for Order to Show Cause, granting in part and denying in part 89 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S Mayeron on 5/13/05. (LJD) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC. re 99 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Passamaneck, Nora) (Entered: 05/06/2005)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 89 MOTION to Compel Discovery Amended filed by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC.FILED UNDER SEAL. (Passamaneck, Nora) Modified on 5/9/2005 (VEM). RECEIVED SEALED DOCUMENT IN CLERK'S OFFICE 5/6/05. (Entered: 05/06/2005)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Janie S Mayeron : Motion Hearing held on 5/3/2005 re 85 MOTION for Order to Show Cause 89 MOTION to Compel Discovery. Motions taken under advisement as of 5/3/05. Order to be issued. (Tape #104/2206 to 104/3196) (LJD) (Entered: 05/03/2005)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 89 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Cardiac Science, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Chadwick, Eric) (Entered: 04/29/2005)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC. re 94 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for an Order to Show Cause (Passamaneck, Nora) (Entered: 04/26/2005)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT in Support re 94 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for an Order to Show Cause. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List# 2 Exhibit A)(Passamaneck, Nora) (Entered: 04/26/2005)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 85 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC.. (Passamaneck, Nora) (Entered: 04/26/2005)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 89 MOTION to Compel Discovery: Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2005 09:30 AM in St Paul - Courtroom 628B before Magistrate Judge Janie S Mayeron. (Souto, Victor) (Entered: 04/22/2005)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defibtech, LLC., re 89 MOTION to Compel Discovery 90 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 91 Affidavit in Support of motion, 93 Notice of motion(Souto, Victor) Modified text and links on 4/26/2005 (MKC). (Entered: 04/22/2005)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Alexis Gorton in SUPPORT OF 89 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Defibtech, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# FILED UNDER SEAL (8) Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I # 11 Exhibit J FILED UNDER SEAL # 12 Exhibit K FILED UNDER SEAL # 13 Exhibit L FILED UNDER SEAL # 14 Exhibit M FILED UNDER SEAL )(Souto, Victor) SEAL DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE 4/25/05 Modified on 4/25/2005 (vem). Modified text on 5/4/2005 (vem). (Entered: 04/22/2005)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 89 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Defibtech, LLC. (Souto, Victor)FILED UNDER SEAL. SEAL DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE 4/25/05 Modified on 4/25/2005 (vem). (Entered: 04/22/2005)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Discovery by Defibtech, LLC., . (Souto, Victor) Modified text on 4/26/2005 (MKC). (Entered: 04/22/2005)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Declaration of Tye Biasco in Support of 85 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Cardiac Science, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Filed Under Seal# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H)(Chadwick, Eric). SEALED DOCUMENTS RECEIVED ON 4/19/05. Modified text on 4/20/2005 (LJD). (Entered: 04/19/2005)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 85 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Cardiac Science, Inc. (Chadwick, Eric) (Entered: 04/19/2005)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 85 MOTION for Order to Show Cause: Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2005 09:30 AM in St Paul - Courtroom 628B before Magistrate Judge Janie S Mayeron. (Chadwick, Eric) (Entered: 04/19/2005)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Cardiac Science, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Chadwick, Eric) (Entered: 04/19/2005)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                DECLARATION re 83 Markman Brief by Cardiac Science, Inc (Second). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Dickson, Thomas) (Entered: 03/29/2005)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MARKMAN BRIEF Surrebuttal to Defendant's Proposed Claim Constructions [Court Docket No. 65] filed by Cardiac Science, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Dickson, Thomas) (Entered: 03/29/2005)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 03/22/2005)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Alexis Gorton by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC.. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 03/22/2005)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Nora Q.E. Passamaneck by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC.. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 03/22/2005)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          Fifth Amended Pretrial Scheduling ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2004. Joinder of Parties due by 10/1/2004. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S Mayeron on 3/9/05. (LJD) (Entered: 03/10/2005)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion to Strike Defendant's Amended Preliminary Non-Infringement and 35 U.S.C. sec. 101 and sec. 112 invalidity Claim Charts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S Mayeron on 3/8/05. (LJD) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC. re 76 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,, 75 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Souto, Victor) (Entered: 03/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Victor F. Souto in OPPOSITION TO 71 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Amended Preliminary Non-Infringement and 35 USC Section 101 and Section 112 Invalidity Claim Charts filed by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B)(Souto, Victor) (Entered: 03/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 71 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Amended Preliminary Non-Infringement and 35 USC Section 101 and Section 112 Invalidity Claim Charts filed by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC.. (Souto, Victor) (Entered: 03/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Thomas G. Dickson in Support of 71 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Amended Preliminary Non-Infringement and 35 USC Section 101 and Section 112 Invalidity Claim Charts filed by Cardiac Science, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Dickson, Thomas) Modified text on 2/23/2005 (LJD). (Entered: 02/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 71 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Amended Preliminary Non-Infringement and 35 USC Section 101 and Section 112 Invalidity Claim Charts filed by Cardiac Science, Inc. (Dickson, Thomas) (Entered: 02/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 71 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Amended Preliminary Non-Infringement and 35 USC Section 101 and Section 112 Invalidity Claim Charts: Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2005 10:30 AM in St Paul - Courtroom 628B before Magistrate Judge Janie S Mayeron. (Dickson, Thomas) (Entered: 02/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike Defendant's Amended Preliminary Non-Infringement and 35 USC Section 101 and Section 112 Invalidity Claim Charts by Cardiac Science, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Dickson, Thomas) (Entered: 02/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            Notice of Markman hearing by Cardiac Science, Inc. Markman Hearing set for 5/20/2005 08:00 AM in St Paul - Courtroom 4 before Judge Richard H Kyle. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Dickson, Thomas) (Entered: 02/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Edward A. Schroeppel in Support of 68 Markman Brief filed by Cardiac Science, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Dickson, Thomas) (Entered: 02/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MARKMAN BRIEF Rebuttal Claim Construction Brief filed by Cardiac Science, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Dickson, Thomas) (Entered: 02/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC. re 65 Markman Brief, 66 Affidavit,, for Rebuttal Claim Construction Brief and Supplemental Affidavit of Victor F Souto (Souto, Victor) (Entered: 02/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT re 65 Markman Brief Supplemental Affidavit of Victor F. Souto in Support of Rebuttal Claim Construction Brief by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2-1# 4 Exhibit 2-2# 5 Exhibit 3-1# 6 Exhibit 3-2# 7 Exhibit 3-3# 8 Exhibit 4# 9 Exhibit 5# 10 Exhibit 6-1# 11 Exhibit 6-2# 12 Exhibit 6-3# 13 Exhibit 6-4# 14 Exhibit 7# 15 Exhibit 8-1# 16 Exhibit 8-2# 17 Exhibit 9# 18 Exhibit 10# 19 Exhibit 11)(Souto, Victor) (Entered: 02/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MARKMAN BRIEF Rebuttal Claim Construction Brief filed by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC.. (Souto, Victor) (Entered: 02/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cardiac Science, Inc re 61 Markman Brief AMENDED (Dickson, Thomas) (Entered: 01/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC. re 59 Brief, 60 Affidavit in Support,,, of Defibtech, LLC's Opening Claim Construction Brief (Souto, Victor) (Entered: 01/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Thomas G. Dickson in Support of 61 Markman Brief filed by Cardiac Science, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit Part 1# 3 Exhibit Part 2# 4 Exhibit Part 3# 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit)(Dickson, Thomas) (Entered: 01/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Cardiac Science's Proposed Claim Constructions. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Dickson, Thomas) Modified text on 1/11/2005 (LJD). (Entered: 01/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT in Support re 59 Brief by Victor F. Souto for Defendant Defibtech, LLC Opening Claim Construction Brief. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B Part 1# 4 Exhibit B Part 2# 5 Exhibit B Part 3# 6 Exhibit C# 7 Exhibit D# 8 Exhibit E Part 1# 9 Exhibit E Part 2# 10 Exhibit F Part 1# 11 Exhibit F Part 2# 12 Exhibit F Part 3# 13 Exhibit G Part 1# 14 Exhibit G Part 2# 15 Exhibit G Part 3# 16 Exhibit G Part 4# 17 Exhibit G Part 5# 18 Exhibit G Part 6# 19 Exhibit G Part 7# 20 Exhibit G Part 8# 21 Exhibit G Part 9# 22 Exhibit H# 23 Exhibit I# 24 Exhibit J# 25 Exhibit K# 26 Exhibit L# 27 Exhibit M# 28 Exhibit N Part 1# 29 Exhibit N Part 2# 30 Exhibit N Part 3# 31 Exhibit O# 32 Exhibit P# 33 Exhibit Q# 34 Exhibit R)(Souto, Victor) (Entered: 01/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF by Defendant Defibtech, LLC Opening Claim Construction Brief. (Souto, Victor) (Entered: 01/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 55 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; each party may file a total of 45 pages for their respective claim construction briefs (opening and rebuttal). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 01/07/05. (rhks) (Entered: 01/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC. re 56 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 55 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Claim Construction Briefs (Souto, Victor) (Entered: 01/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 55 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Claim Construction Briefs filed by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC.. (Souto, Victor) (Entered: 01/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Claim Construction Briefs by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC.. (Souto, Victor) (Entered: 01/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            ***FILING ERROR - DOCUMENT TO BE RE-FILED*** MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Claim Construction Briefs by Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3)(Souto, Victor) Modified on 1/6/2005 (GJS). (Entered: 01/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              REPORT Joint Claim Construction Statement by Cardiac Science, Inc, Defibtech, LLC., Defibtech, LLC., Cardiac Science, Inc. (Souto, Victor) (Entered: 12/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                FOURTH AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2004. Fact discovery due by 5/20/2005. See attached order for more specific deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S Mayeron on 12/2/04. (LJD) (Entered: 12/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defibtech, LLC. re 49 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for William P. DiSalvatore, 50 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Victor F. Souto, 48 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 10/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Victor F. Souto by Defibtech, LLC.. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 10/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for William P. DiSalvatore by Defibtech, LLC.. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 10/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Defibtech, LLC. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 10/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          THIRD AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/20/2005. Motions (non-disp) due 10/1/2004. Motions (disp) due by 8/18/2005. Ready for trial due by 10/18/2005. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S Mayeron on 10/20/04. (JMM) (Entered: 10/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defibtech, LLC. re 45 MOTION to Amend/Correct 35 Order (Second Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order) (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 10/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend/Correct 35 Order (Second Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order) by Defibtech, LLC.. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 10/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL FROM CASE of Michelle Paninopoulos by Defibtech, LLC. (JMM) (Entered: 09/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 13 Motion to Compel filed by Defibtech, LLC. granted. Signed by Judge Janie S Mayeron on 9/7/04. Separate and under seal(VEM) (Entered: 09/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Defibtech, LLC.. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 07/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Defibtech, LLC.. (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 07/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from Thomas G. Dickson requesting a change of e-mail address. 1pg (DFL) (Entered: 02/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply to Defendants' Amended Counterclaim by Cardiac Science, Inc. 9 pg(s)(LJD) (Entered: 02/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER AND AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Cardiac Science, Inc , filed by Defibtech, LLC..16pg(s)(DFL) (Entered: 02/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Janie S Mayeron on 2/12/04 that defendant is granted permission to amend its counterclaim to change paragraph 39. (DFL) (Entered: 02/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER by Cardiac Science, Inc to Counterclaim. [5-2] 9pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 02/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SECOND AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron / 2/2/04) ready for trial set for 10/18/05. 9pg(s) (cc: counsel) (DFL) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2004 (akl). (Entered: 02/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT and counterclaim by defendant. 17pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 01/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron / 1/12/04) amendments and adding prties set for 10/1/04; discovery set 5/20/05; non-dispositive motions set for 5/25/05; dispositive motions set for 8/18/05; ready for trial set for 8/18/05. 9pg(s) (cc: counsel) (DFL) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2004 (akl). (Entered: 01/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFIRNGEMENT [1-1] by plaintiff; jury demand. (43 pgs) (Entered: 01/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER (Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron / 12/18/03) motion to compel responses to discovery requests with respect to Zoll litigation documments and settlement documents is RESOLVED {13-1] and taken under advisement with regards to Interrogatory No. 4 {13-2}, granted part, denied in part motion to amend pretrial scheduling order [16-2], granting motion to amend complaint [16-1], granted in part, denied in part motion to amend pretrial order [19-1]. 3pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (GJS) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2004 (akl). (Entered: 12/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron / 12/18/03) granted in part, denied in part motion to amend pretrial order ( to Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron ) [19-1], granted in part, denied in part motion to amend complaint [16-1], granted in part, denied in part motion to amend pretrial scheduling order ( to Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron ) [16-2], granted in part, denied in part motion to compel responses to discovery requests ( to Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron ) [13-1] pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (GJS) (Entered: 12/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Alexas D. Skucas re motion to amend complaint [16-1], re motion to amend pretrial scheduling order. [16-2] 2pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 12/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Alexas D. Skucas re motion to amend complaint [16-1], re motion to amend pretrial scheduling order. [16-2] 2+pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 12/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by defendant in opposition to motion to amend complaint [16-1], to motion to amend pretrial scheduling order. [16-2] 12pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 12/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Aaron W. Davis re motion to amend pretrial order. [19-1] 5pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 12/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in opposition to motion to amend pretrial order. [19-1] 5pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 12/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Aaron W. Davis re motion to compel responses to discovery requests. [13-1] 4+pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 12/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in opposition to defendant's motion to compel responses to discovery requests. [13-1] 13pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 12/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED NOTICE by defendant setting hearing for motion to compel responses to discovery requests ( to Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron ) [13-1] at 1:00 p.m. on 12/17/03. 3pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 12/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Alexas D. Skucas re motion to amend pretrial order. [19-1] 11pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 12/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by defendant in support of motion to amend pretrial order. [19-1] 5pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 12/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by defendant to amend pretrial order ( to Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron ) , ret. 12/17/03 at 1:00 p.m. 2pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 12/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Aaron W. Davis re motion to amend complaint [16-1] and to amend pretrial scheduling order. [16-2] 32pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 12/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in support of motions to amend complaint [16-1] and to amend pretrial scheduling order. [16-2] 10pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 12/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by plaintiff to amend complaint and to amend pretrial scheduling order ( to Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron ) , ret. 12/17/03 1:00 p.m. 19pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 12/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Alexas D. Skucas re motion to compel responses to discovery requests. [13-1] separate and sealed (DFL) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by defendant in support of motion to compel responses to discovery requests. [13-1] separate and sealed (DFL) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by defendant to compel responses to discovery requests ( to Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron ) , ret. 12/8/03 at 3:30 p.m. 3pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by defendant that none exist. 1pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 10/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron )(15 pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (MKC) (Entered: 09/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron / 9/18/03) amendments and adding parties set for 2/13/04 ; discovery set 10/1/03 ; non-dispositive motions set for 10/6/04 ; dispositive motions set for 1/1/05 ; ready for trial set 3/1/05. 9pg(s) (cc: counsel) (DFL) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2005 (jlv). (Entered: 09/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT RULE 26(f)REPORT. 7 pg(s) (HLL) (Entered: 09/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney Michelle A Paninopoulos for Defibtech, LLC., attorney Jonathan William Dettmann for Defibtech, LLC., attorney Lori Ann Wagner for Defibtech, LLC. and substituting attorney Andrew Luger, Jeanette M Bazis. 2pg(s) (GJS) (Entered: 08/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/14/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ( Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron / 8/14/03) ; pretrial status conference set for 9:00am. on 9/16/03 . 5pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (GJS) (Entered: 08/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PETITION AND ORDER for admission pro hac vice (Clerk Richard D. Sletten) on behalf of defendant Defibtech, LLC. by Richard Delucia, John F Petrsoric and Alexas D Skucas 3pg(s) (Receipt #'s 428273, 428274, 428275)(cc: all counsel) (BLW (Entered: 08/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to complaint [1-1] and COUNTERCLAIM by defendant Defibtech, LLC. against plaintiff Cardiac Science, Inc. 4 pg(s) (JMM) (Entered: 07/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER ( Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan ) that defendant has to and including 7/28/03 to answer the complaint. 3pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (DFL) (Entered: 07/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by defendant Defibtech, LLC. of association of counsel of Lori Ann Wagner and Jonathan W. Dettmann. 1pg(s) (GJS) (Entered: 07/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT executed upon defendant Defibtech, LLC. on 5/30/03. 2pg(s) (GJS) (Entered: 06/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - Summons issued. Assigned to Judge Richard H. Kyle per Patent list and referred to Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. Receipt No. 427442. 5+pg(s) (GJS) (Entered: 04/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 70 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?