Fontaine v. Engineered Tooling, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 3:02-cv-30001
District Judge Michael A Ponsor, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 22, 2016 at 12:27 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo William R. Fountaine, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D. Giarratana +1 860 275 6719 +1 860 560 5919 mgiarratana@mccarter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric E. Grondahl +1 860 275 6704 +1 860 560 5987 egrondahl@mccarter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trustees of Dartmouth College

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin D. O'Leary +1 603 646 2444 +1 603 646 2447 Kevin.d.o'leary@dartmouth.edu
No Logo Engineered Tooling Corp., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mirick, O'Connell, DeMallie & Lougee, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian M Dingman +1 508 791 8500 +1 508 791 8502 bmdingman@modl.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jenifer E. Haeckl +1 508 898 1501 +1 508 898 1502 jehaeckl@mirickoconnell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Odlin Mirick +1 508 791 8500 +1 508 791 8502 jomirick@modl.com
No Logo Robert S. Snyder, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mirick, O'Connell, DeMallie & Lougee, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian M Dingman +1 508 791 8500 +1 508 791 8502 bmdingman@modl.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jenifer E. Haeckl +1 508 898 1501 +1 508 898 1502 jehaeckl@mirickoconnell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Odlin Mirick +1 508 791 8500 +1 508 791 8502 jomirick@modl.com
v.
No Logo Engineered Tooling Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mirick, O'Connell, DeMallie & Lougee, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian M Dingman +1 508 791 8500 +1 508 791 8502 bmdingman@modl.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jenifer E. Haeckl +1 508 898 1501 +1 508 898 1502 jehaeckl@mirickoconnell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Odlin Mirick +1 508 791 8500 +1 508 791 8502 jomirick@modl.com
No Logo Robert S. Snyder, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mirick, O'Connell, DeMallie & Lougee, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian M Dingman +1 508 791 8500 +1 508 791 8502 bmdingman@modl.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jenifer E. Haeckl +1 508 898 1501 +1 508 898 1502 jehaeckl@mirickoconnell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Odlin Mirick +1 508 791 8500 +1 508 791 8502 jomirick@modl.com
No Logo William R. Fountaine, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by #2c

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/18/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin D. O'Leary +1 603 646 2444 +1 603 646 2447 Kevin.d.o'leary@dartmouth.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Cummings & Lockwood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric E. Grondahl +1 860 275 6704 +1 860 560 5987 egrondahl@mccarter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D. Giarratana +1 860 275 6719 +1 860 560 5919 mgiarratana@mccarter.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (58) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge Michael A Ponsor : PROCEDURAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL entered without prejudice to either party moving to restore it to the docket if any further action is required; cc/cl. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 03/16/2005)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 11/5/2004 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Honorable Michael A Ponsor. (French, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/11/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: None
      Ptf's Letter re: STATUS REPORT by William R. Fountaine. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 06/28/2004)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: None
        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Kevin D. O'Leary Counsel for Ptf. William R. Fountaine.(Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 01/22/2004)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: None
          Letter MOTION to Extend Stay, (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 12/19/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
            Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered. This case was stayed pending reexamination of patents by the Patent and Trademark Office on 1/16/03. Since that time, the court has heard nothing from counsel. Counsel are hereby ordered to report to this court in writing regarding the status of this matter no later than 12/22/03. See order for complete details. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark D. Giarratana, Eric E. Grondahl (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 10/23/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: None
                Joint motion by William R. Fountaine, Engineered Tooling, Robert S. Snyder for stay of litigation pending reexamination of patents by patent and trademark office , filed. c/s. (mgl) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: None
                  Memorandum by William R. Fountaine in opposition to [47-1] motion to dismiss Counts II - V of the Pltf's amended complaint , filed. (mef) (Entered: 01/07/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: None
                    Motion by William R. Fountaine to ext. time to 1/06/2003 to file its opp. to D's motion to dismiss filed. (mef) (Entered: 01/06/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: None
                      Notice of withdrawal of counsel by attorney Kevin D. O'Leary for William R. Fountaine, attorney Kevin D. O'Leary for Fountaine R. William filed. (mef) (Entered: 12/18/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: None
                        Motion by Engineered Tooling, Robert S. Snyder to dismiss Counts II - V of the Pltf's amended complaint with memorandum in support, filed. (mef) (Entered: 12/17/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: None
                          Joint motion by William R. Fountaine, Engineered Tooling, Robert S. Snyder for extension of pretrial deadlines , filed. c/s. (mgl) (Entered: 12/12/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: None
                            Answer by William R. Fountaine to amended counterclaim, [44-1] by Deft. Engineered Tooling Corp. filed. (mef) (Entered: 09/18/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: None
                              Answer by Engineered Tooling, Robert S. Snyder to amended complaint, counterclaims, and jury demand, filed. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 09/09/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                Judge Michael A. Ponsor. Protective Order re: confidential research, development or commerical information entered; cc/cl. [EOD Date 8/28/02] (mef) (Entered: 08/28/2002)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/26/2002, Entered: None
                                  Motion by William R. Fountaine for stipulated protective order , filed. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 08/26/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/26/2002, Entered: None
                                    Amended complaint by William R. Fountaine filed. (Answer due 9/5/02 for Robert S. Snyder, for Engineered Tooling ) . Amended complaint amends [1-1] complaint ; adding . (mgl) (Entered: 08/26/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: None
                                      Dft's Response by Engineered Tooling, Robert S. Snyder in opposition to Ptf's [37-1] motion for leave to file amended complaint, filed. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 07/29/2002)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: None
                                        STIPULATION (Motion) by Engineered Tooling, and Robert S. Snyder , to extend time to 7/26/02 to respond to pft's motion for leave to file amended complaint , filed. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 07/19/2002)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/5/2002, Entered: None
                                          Memorandum of law by William R. Fountaine in support of [37-1] motion for leave to file amended complaint, filed. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 07/05/2002)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/5/2002, Entered: None
                                            Ptf's Motion by William R. Fountaine for leave to file amended complaint , filed. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 07/05/2002)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: None
                                              Declaration of John Auburger , re: [35-1] reply , filed. (laf) (Entered: 05/30/2002)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                Surreply/response by William R. Fountaine to [31-1] reply , filed. (laf) (Entered: 05/30/2002)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                  Motion by William R. Fountaine for leave to file surreply to Etco's response to Fountaine's reply memorandum filed. (bah) (Entered: 05/24/2002)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                    Certificate of service by Engineered Tooling re: [32-1] affidavit, [31-1] reply , filed. (mgl) (Entered: 05/21/2002)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                      Supplemental Affidavit of Robert S. Snyder, re: , filed. (mgl) (Entered: 05/21/2002)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                        Reply/response by Engineered Tooling to [29-1] reply, filed. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 05/21/2002)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: None
                                                          Supplemental Declaration of William R. Fountaine, re: [29-1] reply, filed. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 05/14/2002)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: None
                                                            Ptf's Reply by William R. Fountaine to dft's memorandum in opposition to motion for preliminary injunction, filed. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 05/14/2002)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              Judge Michael A. Ponsor . Procedural Order entered re: Pretrial Conference set for 2:00 P.M. on 5/20/2003; cc/cl. [EOD Date 5/7/02] (mef) (Entered: 05/07/2002)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                Judge Michael A. Ponsor. Pretrial Scheduling Order entered. P's reply to resp. to their [5-1] motion for P.I. due 5/13/2002. D's resp. to P's reply due 5/20/2002. The motion for P.I, will then be taken under advisement after 5/20/2002. P's Expert witness list due on 1/31/3003, Ds' due 2/28/2003. Reset discovery due for 2/28/2003. Set Dispositive motions, involving Markman issues filing deadline for 3/31/3003. Resp. to motions due 4/30/3003. Replies to resp. to motions due 5/15/3003. Motion hearing before Judge Michael A. Ponsor and Pretrial Conf. set for 2:00 P.M. on 5/20/3003; cc/cl. . [EOD Date 5/7/02] (mef) Modified on 05/07/2002 (Entered: 05/07/2002)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  Judge Michael A. Ponsor . Clerk's Notes: re: motion hearing Court Reporter: Susan Mitchell (laf) (Entered: 05/07/2002)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: None
                                                                    Rule 16.1 Certification filed by Engineered Tooling, Robert S. Snyder. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 05/06/2002)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                      Rule 26 (f) Report of the parties /Agenda of planning meeting, filed. (mgl) (Entered: 04/30/2002)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                        Ptf's Reply by Fountaine R. William to [19-1] counterclaims , filed. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 04/09/2002)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                                          Certificate of service by Engineered Tooling, Robert S. Snyder re: [21-1] stipulation motion for continue , filed. (mgl) (Entered: 04/05/2002)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                                            STIPULATION (Motion) by Fountaine R. William, Engineered Tooling, Robert S. Snyder, for continue , filed. (mgl) (Entered: 04/05/2002)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              Judge Michael A. Ponsor . Notice of Hearing/conference: Motion hearing set for 11:00 4/23/02 for [7-1] motion for order to show cause, [5-1] motion for P.I. . (laf) (Entered: 03/28/2002)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                Answer to complaint; jury demand and Counterclaim by Engineered Tooling, Robert S. Snyder against Fountaine R. William , filed. (mgl) (Entered: 03/18/2002)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                  Certificate of service by Engineered Tooling, Robert S. Snyder re: correct copy of substitute pages 11 and 12 of dft's [13-1] opposition response , filed. (mgl) (Entered: 03/13/2002)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    Senior Judge Frank H. Freedman. Order entered. The case is transferred to Judge Michael A. Ponsor for all furhter proceedings; cc/cl. [EOD Date 3/12/02] (mef) (Entered: 03/12/2002)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                      Ds' Affidavit of Karl Bacon in support of re: [13-1] opposition response , filed. (mef) (Entered: 03/12/2002)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                        Ds' Affidavit of Gary M. Gray in support of [13-1] opposition response , filed. (mef) (Entered: 03/12/2002)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                          Ds' Affidavit of Robert S. Snyder in support of [13-1] opposition response , filed. (mef) Modified on 03/12/2002 (Entered: 03/12/2002)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                            Resp. by Engineered Tooling, Robert S. Snyder in opposition to [5-1] motion for P.I. , filed. (mef) (Entered: 03/12/2002)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                              Notice of appearance of attorney for Engineered Tooling, Robert S. Snyder by John O. Mirick, Jenifer E. Haeckl, filed. (mgl) (Entered: 03/07/2002)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                Certificate of service by Engineered Tooling, Robert S. Snyder re: [10-1] Magistrate refusal, [9-1] appear/appearance notice , filed. (mgl) (Entered: 03/06/2002)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  Not all parties consenting to assignment to Magistrate Judge Neiman. Case to be redrawn for random assignment to District Judge. (mgl) (Entered: 03/06/2002)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Notice of appearance of attorney for Engineered Tooling, Robert S. Snyder by Brian M. Dingman, Jenifer E. Haeckl, filed. c/s (mgl) (Entered: 03/06/2002)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Affidavit of Fountaine R. William , re: [7-1] motion for order to show cause, [5-1] motion for P.I. , filed. (sealed) (Entered: 02/25/2002)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Motion by Fountaine R. William for order to show cause , filed. (sealed) (Entered: 02/25/2002)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Memorandum by Fountaine R. William in support of [5-1] motion for P.I. , filed. (sealed) (Entered: 02/25/2002)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Motion by Fountaine R. William for P.I. filed. (sealed) (Entered: 02/25/2002)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Consent to trial by Magistrate by Fountaine R. William , filed. (mef) (Entered: 01/28/2002)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Motion by Fountaine R. William for Eric E. Grohdahl. to appear pro hac vice. Fee Status: Paid. Fee Amt: $50.00. Receipt #: 304762. filed. (mef) (Entered: 01/28/2002)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Motion by Fountaine R. William for Mark D. Girrantana to appear pro hac vice. Fee Status: Paid. Fee Amt: $50.00. Receipt #: 304762. filed. (mef) (Entered: 01/28/2002)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    Complaint filed. Case assigned to Judge: Neiman. Receipt #: 304739 Amount:$ 150.00. Fee Status: Paid (mgl) (Entered: 01/03/2002)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 44 times.

                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?