Judson v. 11thHour.com, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-10257
District Judge Robert E. Keeton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 27, 2017 at 4:20 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DAVID H. JUDSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by David H. Judson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David H. Judson
v.
No Logo 11thHour.com, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: None
Notice of voluntary dismissal by David H. Judson as to 11thHour.com, Inc. , filed. c/s (kf) (Entered: 03/18/2002)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
    Complaint filed. Case assigned to Judge: Keeton. Receipt #: 37066 Amount:$ 150.00. Fee Status: paid (kf) (Entered: 02/21/2002)
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 12 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?