Bio Pure Technology Ltd. v. Thermoplastic Biologic Corp.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-11006
District Judge Rya W. Zobel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2017 at 6:33 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bio Pure Technology Ltd., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lambert & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary Ervery Lambert +1 617 720 0091 lambert@lambertpatentlaw.com
Space Gary Ervery Lambert +1 617 720 0091 lambert@lambertpatentlaw.com
v.
No Logo Rubber Fab Gasket & Molding, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Thermoplastic Biologic Corp., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None
AGREEMENT FOR JUDGMENT by Bio Pure Technology Ltd.. (Lambert, Gary) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
    SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Notice of Settlement Agreement by Bio Pure Technology Ltd.. (Lambert, Gary) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
      Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein Referred for: assessment of damages (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None
        MEMORANDUM in Support re 15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Thermoplastic Biologic LLC filed by Bio Pure Technology Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Affidavit)(Lambert, Gary) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None
          MOTION for Default Judgment as to Thermoplastic Biologic LLC by Bio Pure Technology Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lambert, Gary) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None
            MEMORANDUM in Support re 13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Rubberfab Gasket & Molding, Inc. filed by Bio Pure Technology Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Affidavit)(Lambert, Gary) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None
              MOTION for Default Judgment as to Rubberfab Gasket & Molding, Inc. by Bio Pure Technology Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lambert, Gary) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: None
                Withdrawal of motion: 8 MOTION for Default Judgment for failure to Answer Complaint as to Rubberfab Gasket & Molding Inc. filed by Bio Pure Technology Ltd., 9 MOTION for Default Judgment for Failure to Answer Complaint as to Thermoplastic Biologic LLC filed by Bio Pure Technology Ltd... (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lambert, Gary) (Entered: 01/25/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                  NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Rubberfab Gasket & Molding, Inc. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                    NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Thermoplastic Biologic Corp. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Default Judgment for Failure to Answer Complaint as to Thermoplastic Biologic LLC by Bio Pure Technology Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Reasons in Support of Motion for Notice of Default, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lambert, Gary) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Default Judgment for failure to Answer Complaint as to Rubberfab Gasket & Molding Inc. by Bio Pure Technology Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Reasons in Support of Motion for Notice of Default, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lambert, Gary) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Default Judgment for Failure to Answer Complaint as to Rubberfab Gasket & Molding, Inc. by Bio Pure Technology Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Reasons in Support of Motion# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lambert, Gary) (Entered: 12/06/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Default Judgment for Failure to Answer Complaint as to Thermoplastic Biologic LLC by Bio Pure Technology Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Reasons in Support of Motion# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lambert, Gary) (Entered: 12/06/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: None
                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Thermoplastic Biologic Corp. served on 10/10/2007, answer due 10/30/2007. (Lambert, Gary) (Entered: 10/23/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: None
                                SUMMONS Returned Executed Rubberfab Gasket & Molding, Inc. served on 10/15/2007, answer due 11/5/2007. (Lambert, Gary) (Entered: 10/23/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None
                                  First AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Bio Pure Technology Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-H)(Lambert, Gary) (Entered: 07/05/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None
                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed Thermoplastic Biologic Corp. served on 6/8/2007, answer due 6/28/2007. (Lambert, Gary) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None
                                      COMPLAINT against Thermoplastic Biologic Corp. Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 1539647, filed by Bio Pure Technology Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lambert, Gary) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 80 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?