Moise v. Bennett
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10033
District Judge George A. OToole, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2017 at 3:35 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mr. Michael Moise, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lambert & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary Ervery Lambert +1 617 720 0091 lambert@lambertpatentlaw.com
Space Gary Ervery Lambert +1 617 720 0091 lambert@lambertpatentlaw.com
v.
No Logo Mr. Kyle J. Bennett, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael Moise (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support of Notice# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Edge, Eugenia) (Entered: 06/06/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None
    MOTION to Dismiss by Michael Moise. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lambert, Gary) (Entered: 06/05/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
      COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgement of Patent Infringement against Kyle J. Bennett Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 1360944, filed by Michael Moise. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Text of Proposed Order # 3)(Lambert, Gary) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 98 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?