Trump Marks LLC v. D.T. Drinks, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-01741
District Judge P. Kevin Castel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 28, 2017 at 6:10 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Trump Marks LLC Trump Marks LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Belkin Burden Wenig & Goldman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey L. Goldman +1 212 867 4466 +1 212 297 1859 jgoldman@bbwg.com
v.
No Logo D.T. Drinks, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Drinks Americas Holdings, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Drinks Americas, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Drinks Americas Ltd., Defendant
No Logo J. Patrick Kenny, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332bc
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Because the Court does not have subject matter jurisdiction over this action, the Complaint is dismissed, and the Clerk is directed to close the case. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 7/15/2011) (ab) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
    LREF
    Blank 10 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
    AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against All Defendants.Document filed by Trump Marks LLC. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Trump Marks LLC.(mbe) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: that an Initial Conference is set for 7/12/2011 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/17/11) (pl) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jeffrey L. Goldman dated 6/16/11 re: counsel for plaintiff respectfully request that the Court rescind its May 9, 2011 Order and afford Plaintiff twenty (20) days from today to file an amended Complaint in accordance with the Court's March 17, 2011 Order. No prejudice will accrue to any defendant since no defendant has yet appeared. ENDORSEMENT: The burden of complying with ECF is with the attorney. Apparently, no one from plaintiffs firm has looked at the docket in months. I will vacate the dismissal and reopen the case on condition the requirements of my Order of March 17 are satisfied by July 6, 2011. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/17/11) (pl) Modified on 6/17/2011 (pl). (Entered: 06/17/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons in a Civil Action and Verified Complaint served on Drinks Americas Holdings, Ltd and Drinks Americas, Inc. on May 19, 2011. Service was made by FEDERAL EXPRESS. Document filed by Trump Marks LLC. (Cruz, Magda) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Trump Marks LLC served on 5/24/2011, answer due 6/14/2011. Service was accepted by J. Patrick Kenny. Document filed by Trump Marks LLC. (Cruz, Magda) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 3 Order. ENDORSEMENT: No amendment having been filed, the complaint is dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/9/2011) (jar) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/9/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/17/2011) (laq) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER: Within twenty days of the date of this Order, plaintiff shall amend its complaint to allege the citizenship of each constituent person or entity comprising Trump Marks LLC and D.T. Drinks, LLC (including the state of incorporation and principal place of business of any corporate entity member). Plaintiff shall amend the complaint to identify both the principal places of business and states of incorporation for each corporate defendant, and to identify the state of citizenship of defendant Kenny. If, by the foregoing date, plaintiff is unable to amend to truthfully allege complete diversity of citizenship, then the complaint will be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction without further notice to any party. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/17/2011) (jar) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Trump Marks LLC.(ama) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                      COMPLAINT against D.T. Drinks, LLC, Drinks Americas Holdings, Ltd., Drinks Americas Inc., Drinks Americas Ltd., J. Patrick Kenny. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 931821)Document filed by Trump Marks LLC.(ama) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 1,653 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?