Abbott Laboratories v. Imclone Systems, Incorporated
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10216
District Judge Richard G. Stearns, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2017 at 12:37 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Abbott Laboratories, Inc. Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Abbott Laboratories"

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah J. Chickos +1 202 662 5890 +1 202 778 5890 schickos@cov.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Taylor M. Hoffman +1 202 662 5585 +1 202 662 5285 thoffman@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Geoffrey E Hobart +1 202 662 6000 +1 202 662 5281 ghobart@cov.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Lawrence Rainey +1 202 662 5441 +1 202 778 5441 rrainey@cov.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward C. Rippey +1 202 662 5171 +1 202 662 6291 erippey@cov.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary Rubman +1 202 622 5465 +1 202 778 5465 grubman@cov.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher N. Sipes +1 202 662 5525 +1 202 778 5525 csipes@cov.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blair E. Taylor +1 520 877 7211 +1 520 229 4216 btaylor@cov.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William D.A. Zerhouni wzerhouni@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alissa Keely Lipton +1 617 646 1600 alissa.lipton@finnegan.com
No Logo Imclone Systems Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Imclone Systems, Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Bond, Schoeneck & King PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy P Oczek +1 716 566 2800 +1 716 566 2808 jpoczek@bsk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/14/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony J. Fitzpatrick +1 857 488 4200 +1 857 488 4201 ajfitzpatrick@duanemorris.com
TERMINATED: 08/14/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony J. Fitzpatrick +1 857 488 4200 +1 857 488 4201 ajfitzpatrick@duanemorris.com
TERMINATED: 08/14/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Gottfried +1 857 488 4212 +1 857 488 4201 mrgottfried@duanemorris.com
TERMINATED: 08/14/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Gottfried +1 857 488 4212 +1 857 488 4201 mrgottfried@duanemorris.com
TERMINATED: 08/14/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Gottfried +1 857 488 4212 +1 857 488 4201 mrgottfried@duanemorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nolan M. Goldberg +1 212 969 3050 +1 212 969 2900 ngoldberg@proskauer.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nolan M. Goldberg +1 212 969 3050 +1 212 969 2900 ngoldberg@proskauer.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nolan M. Goldberg +1 212 969 3050 +1 212 969 2900 ngoldberg@proskauer.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Holman Shalek +1 212 969 3000 +1 212 969 2900 jshalek@proskauer.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Holman Shalek +1 212 969 3000 +1 212 969 2900 jshalek@proskauer.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Holman Shalek +1 212 969 3000 +1 212 969 2900 jshalek@proskauer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Turner Broadcasting System, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa A. Siegelman +1 404 878 8567 melissa.siegelman@turner.com
v.
No Logo Imclone Systems Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Imclone Systems, Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Bond, Schoeneck & King PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy P Oczek +1 716 566 2800 +1 716 566 2808 jpoczek@bsk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/05/2007, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Scheffel +1 212 415 9200 scheffel.david@dorsey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/14/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony J. Fitzpatrick +1 857 488 4200 +1 857 488 4201 ajfitzpatrick@duanemorris.com
TERMINATED: 08/14/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Gottfried +1 857 488 4212 +1 857 488 4201 mrgottfried@duanemorris.com
TERMINATED: 08/14/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher S. Kroon +1 857 488 4276 +1 857 488 4201 cskroon@duanemorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nolan M. Goldberg +1 212 969 3050 +1 212 969 2900 ngoldberg@proskauer.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Holman Shalek +1 212 969 3000 +1 212 969 2900 jshalek@proskauer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Turner Broadcasting System, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa A. Siegelman +1 404 878 8567 melissa.siegelman@turner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiley Rein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin P. Anderson +1 202 719 7000 +1 202 719 7049 kanderson@wileyrein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark A. Pacella +1 202 719 7398 +1 202 719 7049 mpacella@wileyrein.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J Scheffel +1 202 719 7423 +1 202 719 7049 rscheffel@wileyrein.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James H. Wallace, Jr. +1 202 719 7000 +1 202 719 7207 jwallace@wileyrein.com
Abbott Laboratories, Inc. Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Abbott Laboratories"

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah J. Chickos +1 202 662 5890 +1 202 778 5890 schickos@cov.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Geoffrey E Hobart +1 202 662 6000 +1 202 662 5281 ghobart@cov.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Geoffrey E Hobart +1 202 662 6000 +1 202 662 5281 ghobart@cov.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Taylor M. Hoffman +1 202 662 5585 +1 202 662 5285 thoffman@cov.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Lawrence Rainey +1 202 662 5441 +1 202 778 5441 rrainey@cov.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward C. Rippey +1 202 662 5171 +1 202 662 6291 erippey@cov.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary Rubman +1 202 622 5465 +1 202 778 5465 grubman@cov.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher N. Sipes +1 202 662 5525 +1 202 778 5525 csipes@cov.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blair E. Taylor +1 520 877 7211 +1 520 229 4216 btaylor@cov.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William D.A. Zerhouni wzerhouni@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alissa Keely Lipton +1 617 646 1600 alissa.lipton@finnegan.com
No Logo Dr. Stephen D Gillies, Deponent

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinckley Allen & Snyder, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY TTAB Attorney Placeholder cscott@hinckleyallen.com
No Logo Marianne B. Bowler, Mediator
No Logo Stephen D. Gillies, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinckley Allen & Snyder, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder cscott@hinckleyallen.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (257) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None
Receipt for sealed documents filed by Alex Firassia of Proskauer Rose,LLP. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10216-RGS, 1:08-cv-10749-RGS(Johnson, Mary) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Abbott Laboratories. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None
      NOTICE issued regarding sealed pleadings currently in the possession of the Court. "pleadings shall be retrieved on 9-24-08 at 12:00 Noon in Courtroom#21, 7th Floor, John Joseph Moakley Courthouse, Boston, MA. A signed release of documents is required before pleadings will be released to counsel." Mary Johnson, Deputy Clerk. Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-10749-RGS, 1:07-cv-10216-RGS(Johnson, Mary). (Entered: 09/17/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
        Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL.(Johnson, Mary) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
          Joint MOTION to Stay All Case Deadlines Due to Settlement, filed by Abbott Laboratories and by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Oczek, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None
            AFFIDAVIT of Geoffrey Hobart in Support re 249 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File A Reply In Support of Abbott's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit H)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None
              NOTICE by Abbott Laboratories re Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,, Notice of Manual Filing Of Abbott's Reply to Imclone Systems, Inc.s Opposition to Abbotts Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement and Exhibits B, C, E, F, G, I, and J (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None
                Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by Abbott Laboratories.(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None
                  Assented to MOTION for Leave to File A Reply In Support of Abbott's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement by Abbott Laboratories.(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                    REPLY to Response to 236 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File UNOPPOSED MOTION BY IMCLONE SYSTEMS FOR LEAVE TO (1) FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL (DOCKET 215) AND (2) FILE ITS REPLY AND CORRESPONDING EXHIBITS UNDER SEALAssented to MOTION for Leave to File UNOPPOSED MOTION BY IMCLONE SYSTEMS FOR LEAVE TO (1) FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL (DOCKET 215) AND (2) FILE ITS REPLY AND CORRESPONDING EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL filed by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. FILED UNDER SEAL. Forwarded to Magistrate Judge Dein (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 07/29/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: None
                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment That ImClone Cannot Prove Inequitable Conduct By Clear and Convincing Evidence filed by Abbott Laboratories FILED UNDER SEAL (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 07/29/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: None
                        NOTICE by Imclone Systems, Incorporated re 215 MOTION to Compel Production of Concealed and Withheld Documents Related to the Asserted '578 Patent (Notice of Manual Filing of ImClone's Reply in Support of its Motion to Compel Production of Concealed and Withheld Documents Related to the Asserted '578 Patent) (Oczek, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/29/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
                          AFFIDAVIT in Support re 239 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief In Support of Abbott Laboratories' Cross Motion For Summary Judgment That Plaintiff's Patent Rights Have Not Been Exhausted And That ImClone Has No Implied License To The '578 Patent Declaration of Geoffrey Hobart In Support of Abbott's Reply Brief In Support of Abbott Laboratories' Cross Motion For Summary Judgment That Plaintiff's Patent Rights Have Not Been Exhausted And That ImClone Has No Implied License To The '578 Patent filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
                            NOTICE by Abbott Laboratories re Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Notice of Manual Filing Of Abbott's Sur-Reply in Opposition to ImClone's Motion for Summary Judgment That Abbott Cannott Prove Willfulness By Clear and Convincing Evidence (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
                              NOTICE by Abbott Laboratories re Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Notice of Manual Filing of Abbott's Reply in Support of Its Cross Motion for Summary Judgment that Plaintiff's Patent Rights Have Not Been Exhausted And That ImClone Has No Implied License To The '578 Patent (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
                                NOTICE by Abbott Laboratories re Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Notice of Manual Filing of Abbott's Memorandum in Support of Abbott's Motion for Summary Judgment that ImClone Cannot Prove Inequitable Conduct By Clear and Convincing Evidence (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Leave to File reply Documents Under Seal by Abbott Laboratories.(Hobart, Geoffrey) Modified on 7/28/2008 (Flaherty, Elaine). (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None
                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to File A Sur-Reply In Opposition To ImClone's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment That Abbott Cannot Prove Willfulness By Clear And Convincing Evidence by Abbott Laboratories.(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None
                                      Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief In Support of Abbott Laboratories' Cross Motion For Summary Judgment That Plaintiff's Patent Rights Have Not Been Exhausted And That ImClone Has No Implied License To The '578 Patent by Abbott Laboratories.(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None
                                        AFFIDAVIT in Support re 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment That ImClone Cannot Prove Inequitable Conduct By Clear and Convincing Evidence filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit List of exhibits filed under seal)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment That ImClone Cannot Prove Inequitable Conduct By Clear and Convincing Evidence by Abbott Laboratories.(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None
                                            Assented to MOTION for Leave to File UNOPPOSED MOTION BY IMCLONE SYSTEMS FOR LEAVE TO (1) FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL (DOCKET 215) AND (2) FILE ITS REPLY AND CORRESPONDING EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Oczek, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/24/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Transcript of Markman Hearing held on May 8, 2008, before Judge Stearns. Court Reporter: Richard H. Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 8/11/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/24/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION to Continue Hearing on ImClone Motion to Compel to Date to be Determined by the Court by Abbott Laboratories.(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Christopher S. Kroon (Gottfried, Michael) Modified on 9/16/2008 (Flaherty, Elaine). (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Anthony J. Fitzpatrick (Gottfried, Michael) Modified on 9/16/2008 (Flaherty, Elaine). (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Michael R. Gottfried Michael R. Gottfried (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Nolan M. Goldberg Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002039266. by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Nolan M. Goldberg)(Ganz, Melissa) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE by Imclone Systems, Incorporated re Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,, Imclone's Notice of Manual Filing of 1) Combined Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition Memorandum to Abbott's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement; 2) Imclone's Response to Plaintiff's Statement fo Material Facts; and 3) Declaration of Kevin P. Anderson in Support of and Exhibit A-E Attached Thereto (Oczek, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for Leave to File UNOPPOSED MOTION BY IMCLONE SYSTEMS FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS COMBINED REPLY AND OPPOSITION MEMORANDUM IN EXCESS OF 20 PAGES by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Oczek, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Leave to File under seal UNOPPOSED MOTION BY IMCLONE SYSTEMS FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL ITS COMBINED REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT AND OPPOSITION TO ABBOTTS CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INFRINGEMENT, AND RELATED DOCUMENTS by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Oczek, Jeremy) Modified on 7/16/2008 (Flaherty, Elaine). (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  DECLARATION re 224 Opposition to Motion by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/14/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    Opposition re 215 MOTION to Compel Production of Concealed and Withheld Documents Related to the Asserted '578 Patent filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/14/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa A. Ganz on behalf of Imclone Systems, Incorporated (Ganz, Melissa) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        DECLARATION of Geoffrey Hobart In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to ImClone's Motion For Summary Judgment of Noninfringement and Plaintiff's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment of Infringement by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List of Exhibits To Be Filed Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit F, # 4 Exhibit I, # 5 Exhibit L, # 6 Exhibit M, # 7 Exhibit N)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Plaintiff's Opposition to ImClone's Motion For Summary Judgment of Noninfringement and Plaintiff's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment of Infringement by Abbott Laboratories.(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Opposition to ImClone's Motion For Summary Judgment of Noninfringement and Plaintiff's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment of Infringement by Abbott Laboratories.(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              EXHIBITS re 217 Declaration, filed by Imclone Systems, Incorporated by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 215 MOTION to Compel Production of Concealed and Withheld Documents Related to the Asserted '578 Patent filed by Imclone Systems, Incorporated FILED UNDER SEAL. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  DECLARATION re 215 MOTION to Compel Production of Concealed and Withheld Documents Related to the Asserted '578 Patent of Kevin P. Anderson by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE by Imclone Systems, Incorporated re 215 MOTION to Compel Production of Concealed and Withheld Documents Related to the Asserted '578 Patent of Manual Filing (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Production of Concealed and Withheld Documents Related to the Asserted '578 Patent by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James H. Shalek Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002013281. by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Declaration))(Oczek, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy P. Oczek on behalf of Imclone Systems, Incorporated (Oczek, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              DECLARATION re 208 Notice (Other), 209 Notice (Other), 210 Declaration,, of John Campbell by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                DECLARATION re 208 Notice (Other), 209 Notice (Other) Michael Gottfried by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q (1 OF 2), # 18 Exhibit Q (2 OF 2), # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE by Imclone Systems, Incorporated re 203 Response of Manual Filing (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE by Imclone Systems, Incorporated re 203 Response of Manual Filing (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to 162 MOTION for Summary Judgment that Abbott Cannot Prove Willfulness by Clear and Convincing Evidence LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED ON 6/16/08 filed by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Michael Gottfried, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Michael Gottfried, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Michael Gottfried)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 06/16/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          EXHIBITS 1-9,12,13,15,17-21,23025,26-41 and 44-48 to the declaration of Geffrey E. Hobart by Abbott Laboratories, FILED UNDER SEAL (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Response by Abbott Laboratories to ImClone's Statemetn of Undisputed facts offered in support of Imclone's Motion for Summary Judgment that Abbott Cannot prove willfulness by clear and convincing evidence, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Response by Abbott Laboratories to ImClone's statement of undisputed facts offered in support of ImClone's Motion for Summary Judgment in View of ImClone's Sublicense to the '578 patent, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 166 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages/Injunctive Relief Based on License filed by Abbott Laboratories, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Combined Response by Abbott Laboratories to ImClone's Statement of facts and concise statement of Material Facts in support oftheir cross motion for summary judgment, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File ImClone's Reply Memorandum in Support of ImClone's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Abbott Cannot Prove Willfulness by Clear and Convincing Evidence by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Michael Gottfried, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Michael Gottfried, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Michael Gottfried)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's Combined response to Imclone's Motion for Summary Judgment in statement of facts and in support of their cross motion for summary judgment, FILED UNDER SEAL re: 197 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 164 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based Upon Implied License and Exhaustion filed by Abbott Laboratories, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment on the issue of Patent Exhaustion by Abbott Laboratories, FILED UNDER SEAL.(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 1, 2008 to file opposition to summary judgment motion of non-infringement by Abbott Laboratories.(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 19, 2008 to to File a Combined Opposition to Abbotts Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment that Plaintiffs Patent Rights Have Not Been Exhausted and that ImClone Has No Implied License to the 578 Patent and Reply in Support of ImClones Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based Upon Implied License and Exhaustion by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re 191 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Michael Gottfried by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Imclone Systems, Incorporated re 191 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Manual Filing (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: Electronic ORDER entered denying 170 Imclone's Motion to Use Documents in Connection With Separate Litigation. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          APPENDIX/EXHIBIT B to the declaration of Michael Gottfried in support of Imclone's Reply to Abbott's Opposition to Motion for leave to use documents in connection with separate litigation against Abbott, FILED UNDER SEAL by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Flaherty, Elaine) Modified on 5/30/2008 (Flaherty, Elaine).(hard copy of docket #178) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            APPENDIX/EXHIBIT A by Imclone Systems, Incorporated in support of Imclone's reply to Abbott's opposition to motion for leave to use documents in connection with separate litigation against Abbott, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Flaherty, Elaine) Modified on 5/30/2008 (Flaherty, Elaine)(Hard copy of 178) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 184 Notice (Other) Declaration of Howard Bremer in support of Abbott's opposition to ImClone's motion for summary judgment and Abbott's cross-motion for Summary Judgment regarding patent exhaustion and implied license by Abbott Laboratories. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File under Seal by Abbott Laboratories.(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Geoffrey Hobart in Support re 164 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based Upon Implied License and Exhaustion, 162 MOTION for Summary Judgment that Abbott Cannot Prove Willfulness by Clear and Convincing Evidence in Support of Abbott's oppositions thereto filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 10, # 2 Exhibit 11, # 3 Exhibit 14, # 4 Exhibit 16, # 5 Exhibit 22, # 6 Errata 42, # 7 Exhibit 43)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Abbott Laboratories re 164 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based Upon Implied License and Exhaustion (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Abbott Laboratories re 162 MOTION for Summary Judgment that Abbott Cannot Prove Willfulness by Clear and Convincing Evidence (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for combined brief in Opposition to ImClone Summary Judgment Motion and in support of Abbott Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by Abbott Laboratories.(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Abbott Laboratories re 166 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages/Injunctive Relief Based on License (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to 170 MOTION to Use Documents in Connection With Separeate Litigation Against Abbott Leave to File Granted on 5/29/08 filed by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 177 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits A and B to the Declaration of Michael Gottfried Under Seal filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re 177 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits A and B to the Declaration of Michael Gottfried Under Seal, 176 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to Abbott's Opposition to Motion for Leave to Use Documents in Connection with Separate Litigation Against Abbott of Michael Gottfried by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits A and B to the Declaration of Michael Gottfried Under Seal by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to Abbott's Opposition to Motion for Leave to Use Documents in Connection with Separate Litigation Against Abbott by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Richard G. Stearns: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER on Claim Construction, ENTERED.(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re 170 MOTION to Use Documents in Connection With Separeate Litigation Against Abbott filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider. (Duffy, Marc) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            First MOTION for Extension of Time to May 29, 2008 to File Oppositions to Summary Judgment Motions by Abbott Laboratories.(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 170 MOTION to Use Documents in Connection With Separeate Litigation Against Abbott of Michael R. Gottfried by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Use Documents in Connection With Separeate Litigation Against Abbott by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re 164 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based Upon Implied License and Exhaustion, 162 MOTION for Summary Judgment that Abbott Cannot Prove Willfulness by Clear and Convincing Evidence, 166 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages/Injunctive Relief Based on License by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Errata H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Imclone Systems, Incorporated re 166 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages/Injunctive Relief Based on License of Manual Filing (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages/Injunctive Relief Based on License by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Imclone Systems, Incorporated re 164 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based Upon Implied License and Exhaustion of Manual Filing (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based Upon Implied License and Exhaustion by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Imclone Systems, Incorporated re 162 MOTION for Summary Judgment that Abbott Cannot Prove Willfulness by Clear and Convincing Evidence of Manual Filing (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment that Abbott Cannot Prove Willfulness by Clear and Convincing Evidence by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal Document by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Imclone Systems, Incorporated of Manual Filing (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Document by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File under Seal Abbott Laboratories' Responsive Claim Construction Memorandum by Abbott Laboratories.(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 04/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION to reschedule oral argument on Abbott's Motion Under the Protective Order [Docket no. 140] to April 18, 2008 at 3:00 p.m. by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Imclone Systems, Incorporated re 140 MOTION for Order to Enforce the Protective Order of Manual Filing (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 03/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Hearing on, and Leave to File A Sur-Reply in Opposition to, Abbott's Motion Under the Protective Order by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of ADR Conference: Mediation Hearing set for 5/9/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. All PARTIES and trial counsel are REQUIRED to attend and must have full binding settlement authority. Leave of court is REQUIRED for any exceptions. Any further confidential mediation briefs are to be submitted to the court VIA FACSIMILE at (617) 204-5833 at least TWO BUSINESS DAYS prior to the hearing. (Duffy, Marc) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter/request (non-motion) from Michael Gottfried re mediation. (Duffy, Marc) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Michael R. Gottfried by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Imclone Systems, Incorporated of Manual Filing (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal, ImClone's Opening Claim Construction Memorandum by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Abbott Laboratories.(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File , Under Seal, a Reply in Support of its Emergency Motion by Abbott Laboratories.(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Document under Seal by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Michael R. Gottfried by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Imclone Systems, Incorporated of Manual Filing (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Abbott Laboratories.(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 140 MOTION for Order to Enforce the Protective Order by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 140 MOTION for Order to Enforce the Protective Order filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Order to Enforce the Protective Order by Abbott Laboratories.(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 89 Imclone's Second Motion to Compel, 111 Abbott's Second Motion to Compel, and 116 Abbott's Motion for Leave to Depose. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) (Entered: 03/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to 111 MOTION to Compel filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support of Abbott's Second Motion to Compel by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Abbott's Reply In Support of Second Motion to Compel)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to 116 MOTION Leave to depose Thomas Gallagher, Dale Ludwig, and Daniel Velez (LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED ON 2-27-08) filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Abbott Laboratories' Motion for Leave to Depose Thomas Gallagher, Dale Ludwig, and Daniel Velez by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Reply)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered granting 115 Imclone's Motion for Protective Order Concerning Claim Construction Expert Depositions. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re 131 Reply to Response to Motion Of MARK PACELLA by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to 115 MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Claim Construction Expert Depositions (LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED ON 02.14.2008) filed by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to Abbott's Opposition to ImClone's Motion for a Protective Order Concerning Claim Construction Expert Depositions by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Reply, # 2 Declaration of Mark Pacella in Support of Reply, # 3 Exhibit A to Mark Pacella's Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Mark Pacella's Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C to Mark Pacella's Declaration, # 6 Exhibit D to Mark Pacella's Declaration)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 02/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re 124 Opposition to Motion for a Protective Order Concerning Claim Construction Expert Depositions by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re 126 Response to Motion OF MARK PACELLA by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL), # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Errata D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 116 MOTION Leave to depose Thomas Gallagher, Dale Ludwig, and Daniel Velez filed by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re 123 Opposition to Motion OF MARK PANCELLA by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re 115 MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Claim Construction Expert Depositions filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re 111 MOTION to Compel filed by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter/request (non-motion) from Abbott Laboratories Submission Regarding the February 5, 2008 Hearing and Briefing Schedule for Pending Motions. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter/request (non-motion) from ImClone System's Inc. regarding potential Markman dates in response to Magistrate Judge Judith Dein's revised Scheduling Order. (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Document 116 MOTION Leave to depose Thomas Gallagher, Dale Ludwig, and Daniel Velez, 118 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 119 Affidavit in Support of Motion by Abbott Laboratories.(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Geoffrey E. Hobart in Support re 116 MOTION Leave to depose Thomas Gallagher, Dale Ludwig, and Daniel Velez filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 116 MOTION Leave to depose Thomas Gallagher, Dale Ludwig, and Daniel Velez filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Mark Pacella in Support of Imclone's Motion for a Protective Order Concerning Claim Construction Expert Depostions by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Errata B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION Leave to depose Thomas Gallagher, Dale Ludwig, and Daniel Velez by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Claim Construction Expert Depositions by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Abbott Laboratories.(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Geoffrey Hobart in Support re 111 MOTION to Compel filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Errata M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 111 MOTION to Compel filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to 89 Second MOTION to Compel Discovery Leave to File Granted on 2/5/08 filed by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered granting 106 Imclone's Emergency MOTION Concerning the Deposition of Stephen Gillies. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to Abbott's Opposition to ImClone's Second Motion to Compel Discovery by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Reply to Abbott's Opposition to ImClone's Second Motion to Compel Discovery, # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order Granting ImClone's Second Motion to Compel Discovery)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Imclone Systems, Incorporated re 106 Emergency MOTION Concerning the Deposition of Stephen Gillies SUPPLEMENTAL. (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Emergency MOTION Concerning the Deposition of Stephen Gillies by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Geoffrey Hobart in Opposition re 89 Second MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re 89 Second MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/10/2008 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein.(Dambrosio, Jolyne) (Entered: 01/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 44 Imclone's First Motion to Compel Discovery; denying without prejudice 73 Abbott's Motion to Take Deposition of Samuel Waksal; granting in part and denying in part 79 Imclone's Motion for Protective Order; and granting in part and denying in part 84 Imclone's Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) (Entered: 01/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File A Combined Reply In Response To Dr. Gillies And Abbotts Oppositions To Imclones Motion For A Protective Order Concerning The Deposition Of Stephen Gillies by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 ImClone's [Proposed] Combined Reply In Response To Dr. Gillies And Abbotts Oppositions To Imclones Motion For A Protective Order Concerning The Deposition Of Stephen Gillies)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT Concerning the January 23, 2008 Status Conference by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Fitzpatrick, Anthony) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Geoffrey Hobart in Opposition re 84 MOTION Motion Requesting a Status Conference and Amendment to Scheduling Order filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 84 MOTION Motion Requesting a Status Conference and Amendment to Scheduling Order filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re 79 MOTION for Protective Order Concerning the Deposition of Stephen Gillies filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response by Abbott Laboratories to 86 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re 93 Opposition to Motion for Protective Order and Request for Attorneys' Fees by Stephen D Gillies. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Scott, Craig) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 79 MOTION for Protective Order Concerning the Deposition of Stephen Gillies filed by Stephen D Gillies. (Scott, Craig) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re 79 MOTION for Protective Order Concerning the Deposition of Stephen Gillies filed by Stephen D Gillies. (Scott, Craig) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Craig M. Scott on behalf of Stephen D Gillies (Scott, Craig) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 89 Second MOTION to Compel Discovery of Mark Pacella by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 89 Second MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Second MOTION to Compel Discovery by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION to Continue Status Conference to 1/23/2008 by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 73 MOTION to Take Deposition from Samuel Waksal Leave to File Granted on 1/10/08 filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 01/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims, COUNTERCLAIM leave to file granted on 1/4/2008 against Abbott Laboratories by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re 84 MOTION Motion Requesting a Status Conference and Amendment to Scheduling Order of Mark Pacella by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 01/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION Motion Requesting a Status Conference and Amendment to Scheduling Order by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 01/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Abbott's Motion to Depose Prisoner Samuel Waksal by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A [Proposed] Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Depose Prisoner Samuel Waksal)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 01/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein Referred for: per RGS (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 01/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re 79 MOTION for Protective Order Concerning the Deposition of Stephen Gillies of Mark Pacella by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 79 MOTION for Protective Order Concerning the Deposition of Stephen Gillies filed by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Protective Order Concerning the Deposition of Stephen Gillies by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Gary M. Rubman, Sarah J. Chickos, and Taylor M. Hoffman Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 01010000000001801166. by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re 76 Response to Motion of Mark Pacella by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Fitzpatrick, Anthony) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 73 MOTION to Take Deposition from Samuel Waksal filed by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Fitzpatrick, Anthony) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion for Leave to File; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document.; denying 38 Motion for Leave to File; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document.; granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion for Leave to File; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2008: # 1 order) (Flaherty, Elaine). (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 73 MOTION to Take Deposition from Samuel Waksal filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Take Deposition from Samuel Waksal by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider. (Duffy, Marc) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re 68 Reply to Response to Motion, of Michael R. Gottfried by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fitzpatrick, Anthony) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 51 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend its Answer to Add an Inequitable Conduct Defense and Counterclaim leave to file granted on 12/17/07 filed by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Fitzpatrick, Anthony) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 44 MOTION to Compel leave to file granted on 12/17/07 filed by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Fitzpatrick, Anthony) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 48 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to ImClone's Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims filed by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Fitzpatrick, Anthony) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 66 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of its Motion for Leave to Amend its Answer to Add an Inequitable Conduct Defense and Counterclaim by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of its Motion for Leave to Amend its Answer to Add an Inequitable Conduct Defense and Counterclaim by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal Document by Abbott Laboratories.(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re 63 Opposition to Motion by Abbott Laboratories. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re 51 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend its Answer to Add an Inequitable Conduct Defense and Counterclaim filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Abbott Laboratories of Issuance of Subpoena (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Abbott Laboratories re 60 Notice (Other) of Correction of Notice of Issuance of Subpoena (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Abbott Laboratories of Issuance of Subpoena (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 12/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Imclone Systems, Incorporated re 52 Notice (Other), 54 Declaration, 56 Declaration, of Correction of Certificate of Service (Kroon, Christopher) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of its First Motion to Compel Discovery by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 11/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re 55 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of its First Motion to Compel Discovery of Michael R. Gottfried by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Document a Reply in Support of its First Motion to Compel Discovery by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gottfried, Michael) Modified on 11/29/2007 (Flaherty, Elaine). (Entered: 11/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 51 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend its Answer to Add an Inequitable Conduct Defense and Counterclaim of Michael R. Gottfried by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Imclone Systems, Incorporated re 51 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend its Answer to Add an Inequitable Conduct Defense and Counterclaim (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File to Amend its Answer to Add an Inequitable Conduct Defense and Counterclaim by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re 49 Opposition to Motion by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 11/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re 44 MOTION to Compel filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 11/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to ImClone's Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to ImClone's Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims# 2 Exhibit B - [Proposed] Declaration of Michael R. Gottfried in Support of ImClone's Reply)(Kroon, Christopher) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT re 46 Declaration, Q to the Declaration of Mark Pacella in Support of ImClone's Motion to Compel by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Fitzpatrick, Anthony) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 44 MOTION to Compel of Mark Pacella by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Errata A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit P)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 44 MOTION to Compel filed by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Exhibit H and J to the Declaration of Mark Pacella in Support of Motion to Compel by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re 41 Opposition to Motion by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 11/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re 38 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Answer filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 11/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of ADR Conference. Mediation Hearing set for 12/20/2007 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. All PARTIES and trial counsel are REQUIRED to attend and must have full binding settlement authority. Leave of court is REQUIRED for any exceptions. All confidential mediation briefs are to be submitted to the court VIA FACSIMILE at (617) 204-5833 at least TWO BUSINESS DAYS prior to the hearing. (Duffy, Marc) (Entered: 11/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 38 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Answer filed by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Fitzpatrick, Anthony) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Answer by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fitzpatrick, Anthony) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 30 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend its Answer and for a Limited Extension of the Deadline for Amending Pleadings Leave to File Granted on October 25, 2007 filed by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Fitzpatrick, Anthony) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of its Motion for a Limited Extension of the Deadline for Amending Pleadings by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fitzpatrick, Anthony) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Richard G. Stearns : ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution.(Johnson, Mary) (Entered: 10/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 30 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend its Answer and for a Limited Extension of the Deadline for Amending Pleadings filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Richard G. Stearns : Memorandum and Order entered.(Giannotti, Diane) (Entered: 10/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of Reasons Supporting Abbott Laboratories' First Motion to Compel by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 30 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend its Answer and for a Limited Extension of the Deadline for Amending Pleadings filed by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Fitzpatrick, Anthony) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File to Amend its Answer and for a Limited Extension of the Deadline for Amending Pleadings by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Fitzpatrick, Anthony) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re 28 Response to Motion of Mark Pacella by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Fitzpatrick, Anthony) (Entered: 09/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 26 First MOTION to Compel Discovery from ImClone filed by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Fitzpatrick, Anthony) (Entered: 09/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 26 First MOTION to Compel Discovery from ImClone filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Compel# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J# 12 Exhibit K# 13 Exhibit L# 14 Exhibit M# 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First MOTION to Compel Discovery from ImClone by Abbott Laboratories.(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Edward H. Rippey and William D. A. Zerhouni Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 1651319. by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Imclone Systems, Incorporated Change of Firm Name (Fitzpatrick, Anthony) (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Pacella on behalf of Imclone Systems, Incorporated (Pacella, Mark) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF COUNSEL of Abbott Laboratories re: June 4 Special Order on Patent Litigation by Abbott Laboratories. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Withdraw of Kenyon & Kenyon LLP by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Fitzpatrick, Anthony) (Entered: 07/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Abbott Laboratories Request for Third Party Documents (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 06/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Blair Elizabeth Taylor Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1566631. by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 06/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Re: Proposed Schedule. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 06/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Richard G. Stearns : PROTECTIVE ORDER, ENTERED.(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 06/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Richard G. Stearns : Special ORDER on Patent Litigation, entered. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION for Protective Order by Abbott Laboratories, Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James H. Wallace, Jr., Robert J. Scheffel and Kevin P. Anderson Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 1543708. by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response by Abbott Laboratories to Defendant's Counterclaim. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 05/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Abbott Laboratories.(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 05/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 05/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Abbott Laboratories by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Fitzpatrick, Anthony) (Entered: 05/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Scheduling Conference entered: Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2007 02:45 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Johnson, Mary) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Imclone Systems, Incorporated. (Fitzpatrick, Anthony) (Entered: 04/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM S against Abbott Laboratories by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Fitzpatrick, Anthony) (Entered: 04/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 24, 2007 to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Imclone Systems, Incorporated.(Gottfried, Michael) (Entered: 03/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of CHRISTOPHER N. SIPES, RICHARD L. RAINEY, AND ALISSA K. LIPTON Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 1421370. by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPORT on the filing/termination of patent/trademark case. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Abbott Laboratories. (Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Imclone Systems, Incorporated Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 1397537, filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Civil Cover Sheet # 3 Local Category Form# 4 Summons)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 48 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?