Cricket Productions, Inc. et al v. Aroa Marketing, Inc, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10143
District Judge William Young, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2017 at 12:37 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cricket Productions, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aceto, Bonner & Prager, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory J. Aceto +1 617 728 0888 +1 617 338 1923 aceto@abplawyers.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin J. Brennan +1 617 728 0888 +1 617 338 1923 ebrennan@johnsonaceto.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cesari & McKenna, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin J. O'Donnell +1 617 951 3046 +1 617 951 3927 mod@c-m.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Reinemann +1 617 951 2500 +1 617 951 3927 mreinemann@c-m.com
No Logo Dtr Advertising Far East Ltd., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aceto, Bonner & Prager, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory J. Aceto +1 617 728 0888 +1 617 338 1923 aceto@abplawyers.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin J. Brennan +1 617 728 0888 +1 617 338 1923 ebrennan@johnsonaceto.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cesari & McKenna, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Reinemann +1 617 951 2500 +1 617 951 3927 mreinemann@c-m.com
v.
No Logo Aroa Marketing, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lambert & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary Ervery Lambert +1 617 720 0091 lambert@lambertpatentlaw.com
Walgreen Company Walgreen Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Walgreen Co."
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. AGREEMENT FOR FINAL JUDGMENT. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None
    AGREEMENT FOR JUDGMENT by DTR Advertising Far East, LTD, AROA Marketing, Inc., Cricket Productions, Inc.. (Aceto, Gregory) (Entered: 04/24/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None
      Assented to MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference to 05/02/2007 by AROA Marketing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Lambert, Gary) (Entered: 03/30/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
        Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. re 19 JOINT STATEMENT is SO ORDERED AS MODIFIED as the Case Management Scheduling Order. DISCOVERY DUE November 30, 2007 and DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE January 4, 2008. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 03/27/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None
          JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Aceto, Gregory) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by all plaintiffs (Aceto, Gregory) (Entered: 03/13/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
              NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 4/2/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
                ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by AROA Marketing, Inc..(Lambert, Gary) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to March 5, 2007 to File Answer by AROA Marketing, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion# 2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Lambert, Gary) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                    Opposition re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by AROA Marketing, Inc.. (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Gary E. Lambert on behalf of AROA Marketing, Inc. (Lambert, Gary) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION.(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None
                          STIPULATION re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Proposed Order by Cricket Productions, Inc.. (Aceto, Gregory) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None
                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Cricket Productions, Inc.. AROA Marketing, Inc. served on 1/30/2007, answer due 2/19/2007. Acknowledgement filed by Cricket Productions, Inc.. (Aceto, Gregory) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                              Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by all plaintiffs.(Aceto, Gregory) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Cricket Productions, Inc.. Walgreen Co. served on 1/30/2007, answer due 2/19/2007. Acknowledgement filed by Cricket Productions, Inc.. (Aceto, Gregory) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Martin J. O'Donnell on behalf of Cricket Productions, Inc. (O'Donnell, Martin) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Reinemann on behalf of DTR Advertising Far East, LTD, Cricket Productions, Inc. (Reinemann, Michael) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None
                                      AFFIDAVIT of Samir Nayfeh in Support re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by all plaintiffs. (Costello2, Helen) (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None
                                        AFFIDAVIT of Victor N. Grillo, Jr. in Support re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by all plaintiffs. (Costello2, Helen) (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None
                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by all plaintiffs. (Costello2, Helen) (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None
                                            EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by DTR Advertising Far East, LTD, Cricket Productions, Inc..(Costello2, Helen) (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None
                                              COMPLAINT against AROA Marketing, Inc., Walgreen Co. , filed by DTR Advertising Far East, LTD, Cricket Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Errata D)(Costello2, Helen) (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 165 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?